Diers v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod Eugene Diers
Defendant: Ted Robinson, Dan Fell, Ottumwa Residential Correctional Facility, Iowa Department of Corrections, Eight District Department of Corrections, State of Iowa, Lisa Houk, Nycole Harbison and Eighth District Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2024cv00110
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 vp Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Eighth District Department of Corrections, Dan Fell, Nycole Harbison, Lisa Houk, Ted Robinson. Replies due by 5/10/2024.(Tice, Andrew)
April 22, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Responses due by 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Motion to Remand)(Stoltze, Bruce)
April 18, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Dan Fell served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of David Hindman, #2 Supplement Emails between David Hindman and Def Dan Fell, #3 Supplement Service Report by David Hindman)(Stoltze, Bruce)
April 18, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Ted Robinson served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
April 18, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Nycole Harbison served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
April 18, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Lisa Houk served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
April 11, 2024 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time. By no later than 5/20/2024, plaintiff shall file responses to #3 and #4 motions to dismiss. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/11/2024. (amp)
April 11, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Jarrod Eugene Diers.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Stoltze, Bruce)
April 10, 2024 Filing 14 Summons: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw)
April 4, 2024 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time. By no later than 4/18/2024, plaintiff shall serve, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e), a complaint and summons on Defendants Robinson, Fell, Houk, and Harbison. By granting this extension, the Court makes no finding regarding the adequacy of previous service as that issue is not before the Court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/4/2024. (amp)
April 2, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Unresisted MOTION to Continue Deadline to Serve Defendants Ted Robinson, Dan Fell, Lisa Houk, and Nycole Harbison in their Individual Capacities filed by Iowa Department of Corrections, State of Iowa. Replies due by 4/9/2024.(Louis, Christine)
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Unresisted MOTION to Continue Deadline to Serve Defendants Ted Robinson, Dan Fell, Lisa Houk, and Nycole Harbison in their Individual Capacities filed by Eighth District Department of Corrections, Dan Fell, Nycole Harbison, Lisa Houk, Ted Robinson. Replies due by 4/8/2024.(Tice, Andrew)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. By no later than 4/3/2024, defendants shall indicate whether they have any objection to #9 motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/1/2024. (amp)
March 29, 2024 Filing 9 Unresisted MOTION to Continue Deadline to Serve Defendants Ted Robinson, Dan Fell, Lisa Houk, and Nycole Harbison in their Individual Capacities by Jarrod Eugene Diers.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Amended Affidavit of Service for Ted Robinson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Amended Affidavit of Service for Dan Fell, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Amended Affidavit of Service for Lisa Houk, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Amended Affidavit of Service for Nycole Harbison)(Stoltze, Bruce)
March 29, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Nycole Harbison served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
March 29, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Lisa Houk served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
March 29, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Dan Fell served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
March 29, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrod Eugene Diers. Ted Robinson served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Stoltze, Bruce)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Eighth District Department of Corrections, Dan Fell, Nycole Harbison, Lisa Houk, Ted Robinson. Responses due by 4/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Tice, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Partial Motion to Dismiss by Iowa Department of Corrections, State of Iowa. Responses due by 4/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Louis, Christine)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Louis on behalf of Iowa Department of Corrections, State of Iowa (Louis, Christine)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eight District Department of Corrections from Iowa District Court for Wapello County, case number CVEQ113983. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5411302., filed by Eight District Department of Corrections. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Rule 81(a) Removal Information Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tice, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diers v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Eugene Diers
Represented By: Bruce H. Stoltze, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Robinson
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Fell
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottumwa Residential Correctional Facility
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Corrections
Represented By: Christine Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight District Department of Corrections
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Represented By: Christine Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Houk
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nycole Harbison
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighth District Department of Corrections
Represented By: Andrew T. Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?