Fischer v. Douglas et al
Plaintiff: David Michael Fischer, Mike and Slick Rock
Defendant: Judge Ann Ruttle, Judge Summe, Judge Grothaus Douglas and Judge Ken Easterling
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: (1) Plaintiff's Complaint filed in this matter #1 is DISMISSED; and (2) This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/23/2020.(ECO)cc: COR and David Michael Fischer by US Mail
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: (1) The complaint filed in this matter [1) is DISMISSED; (2) Any pending request for relief is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket;(4) A Judgment will be entered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/23/2020.(ECO)cc: COR and David Michael Fischer by US Mail
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 PROGRESS NOTE filed by David Michael Fischer, PRO SE (KRB)
October 1, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (KRB)
October 1, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Caption page)(KRB)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/06/2016.(KRB)cc: CORand David Michael Fischer by US Mail
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 26805344231), filed by David Michael Fischer, Pro Se (Attachments: #1 various attachments, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(KRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Douglas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slick Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ann Ruttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Summe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Grothaus Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ken Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?