Henderson, City of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Henderson, City of
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Rite Aid Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, CVS Health Corporation LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Anda, Inc., Richard Sackler, H.D. Smith, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Kroger Company, Cardinal Health, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International PLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc., Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Inc., David Sackler, Walmart Inc., Depomed Inc., KVK Tech, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Kentucky Pharmacy Board, Matthew Bevin, Commonwealth of Kentucky and Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00067
Filed: September 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Kentucky of Non-Consent to Removal (Johnstone, C.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE by Henderson, City of re #85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - West-Ward Service of Process)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - West-Ward US Headquarters, #2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Acceptance & Signature, #3 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Clerk's Note: Notice to Attorney James E. Looper, Jr. #112 was sent in error and counsel may disregard this notice. (CBD)
November 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Henderson, City of; MOTION to Continue Litigation by Henderson, City of; #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond; #15 MOTION to Dismiss; #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer; #60 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; #67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery; #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; #70 Corrected Motion to Extend Time to Answer; #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint; #86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #85 Motion to Remand. (SCD)
November 25, 2019 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky Corrected filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 124 RESPONSE to Motion re #108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #109 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 122 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anda, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Anda, Inc... (Johnson, Paige)
November 25, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anda, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige)
November 25, 2019 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #85 Motion to Remand by Henderson, City of filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of (SCD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 117 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (White, Jordan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan) Modified on 11/22/2019 (SCD).
November 21, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Brien T. O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andrew J. O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY E. Frederick Straub, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James E. Looper, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD)
November 20, 2019 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD: #110 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky was filed in the wrong case; Attorney has filed the "Corrected Motion to Expedite" in 3:19-cv-68 R. 111. *MRS* cc: COR (SCD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 110 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: (Filed in wrong case) PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 11/20/2019. Modified on 11/20/2019 (SCD).
November 19, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order tendered Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing)(Johnstone, C.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum is Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order tendered Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Johnstone, C.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Kentucky Complaints Redline, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of S. Ahmad, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Interest of US, #5 Exhibit 5 - J. Polster Withdrawal of Order, #6 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order in Takoma Regional Hospital Case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order in Belcher Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order in Lac Courte Case, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order in Robinson Rancheria Case, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order in Seminole County Case, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order in Alameda County Case, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order in Portland Case, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order in Alexandria Case, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order in Galax Case, #11 Exhibit 11 - Order in San Mateo Case, #12 Exhibit 12 - Order in Melrose Case, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order in Jacksonville Case, #14 Exhibit 14 - Order in Delaware County Case, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order in Pawnee County Case, #16 Exhibit 16 - Order in Osage County Case, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order in Noble County Case, #18 Exhibit 18 - Order in Jim Wells Case, #19 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #85 Motion to Remand by Henderson, City of filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #79 is GRANTED; and 2. Julia Kavanagh is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/18/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Julia Kavanagh with ECF Reg. Form via US Mail
November 13, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 102 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Simpson, W.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #94 is GRANTED; and 2. Conor Brendan OCroinin is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/12/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, O'Croinin w/ ECF Registration Form
November 12, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Joseph A. Wright for H.D. Smith, LLC, added. (CBD)
November 12, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kennedy Simpson on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Simpson, W.)
November 12, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #96 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commonwealth of Kentucky (JJ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Second Amended Order)(Mauldin, Timothy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Mauldin, Timothy)
November 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #94 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (SCD)
November 8, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Conor Brendan O'Croinin re #94 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (SCD)
November 7, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered order Extending Time to Answer)(Johnstone, C.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Johnstone on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (Johnstone, C.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4515142) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Stopher, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 93 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John)
October 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #50 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures - No Response filed (CBD)
October 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #90 Notice of 41(a) Dismissal as to Smith Drug Company, Inc., #91 Notice of Mootness of Motions (SCD)
October 30, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Mootness of Motions by Henderson, City of re #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. , #60 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2019 (SCD).
October 30, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of 41(a) Dismissal as to Smith Drug Company, Inc. by Henderson, City of (Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2019 (SCD).
October 30, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services filed by Henderson, City of. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 88 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc. ; Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc... (Johnson, Paige)
October 28, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige)
October 28, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #85 Motion to Remand by Henderson, City of (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/29/2019 (SCD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henderson, City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Home Rule Cities, #2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Service, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #5 CORRECTED Exhibit B - West-Ward Service of Process) (CBD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 84 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 28, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 25, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Fazal A. Shere on behalf of Kroger Company (Shere, Fazal) Modified on 10/25/2019 (SCD).
October 24, 2019 Filing 81 Supplemental Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Michener, Carolyn) Modified on 10/25/2019 (SCD).
October 24, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuhn, Matthew) Modified on 10/25/2019 (SCD).
October 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #79 MOTION for Julia Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD)
October 24, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Julia Kavanagh re #79 MOTION for Julia Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD)
October 24, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cabinet for Health and Family Services. (Kleinert, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Julia Kavanagh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt, #4 Cover Letter)(CBD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Amend/Correct by KVK Tech, Inc. Opposition to Corrected Motion for Extension of Time filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 72 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Looper, Jr on behalf of Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 70 Corrected MOTION to Extend Time to Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald) Modified on 10/23/2019 (SCD).
October 18, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Purcell, Carolyn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER ENJOINING THE CONTINUATION OF THIS PROCEEDING AS TO THE INDIVIDUAL FORMER DIRECTORS by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Amended Preliminary Injunction Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Excerpted copy of Exhibits to the Complaint for Injunctive)(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified on 10/18/2019 (CBD).
October 17, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and MOTION for Stay of Discovery by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fultz, Benjamin) Added MOTION to Stay on 10/18/2019 (SCD).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: 1) #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories Inc. is GRANTED. 2) James K. O'Connor is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, James K. O'Connor w ECF Registration Form
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: 1) #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories Inc. is GRANTED. 2) John A. McCauley is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, John A. McCauley w ECF Registration form
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: 1) #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. is GRANTED. 2) Kevin M. Sadler is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, Kevin M. Sadler w ECF Registration form
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: 1) #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. is GRANTED. 2) Scott D. Powers is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, Scott D. Powers w ECF Registration form
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: 1) #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. is GRANTED. 2) David T. Arlington is ADMITTED pro hac vice as COR. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/17/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, David T. Arlington w ECF Registration form
October 17, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Bevin. (Kuhn, Matthew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 60 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, #4 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler filed by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re MT for Ext of Time to File Answer)(Stopher, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 57 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC.. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 16, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Gene L. Humphreys. #51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 55 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 54 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Health Corporation LLC.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 53 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc... (Ogrosky, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kirk Ogrosky on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Ogrosky, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #46 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and, #45 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (SCD)
October 15, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to James K. O'Connor re #46 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (SCD)
October 15, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John A. McCauley re #45 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (SCD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Charles Hughes. #44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Kroger Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Stopher. #35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by CVS Health Corporation LLC, and, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Richardson, Melissa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492108) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492007) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McCauley, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kroger Company. (Hughes, Charles)
October 14, 2019 Filing 43 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith)
October 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith)
October 14, 2019 Filing 41 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 40 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson. (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 39 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Louis Sparks on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Sparks, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 37 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co... (Tremper, Frank)
October 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walgreen Co.. (Tremper, Frank)
October 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Stopher, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 34 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Other Affiliate Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Fultz, Benjamin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hancock, Daniel)
October 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dickens, Scott)
October 14, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fultz, Benjamin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Polczynski on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Depomed, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Sadler, Scott D. Powers and David Arlington on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (CBD).
October 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #27 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #26 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #25 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kevin M. Sadler re #27 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD)
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Scott D. Powers re #26 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD)
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David T. Arlington re #25 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lucas Harrison. #15 MOTION to Dismiss has been filed by Smith Drug Company, Inc without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified on 10/10/2019 (SCD).
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Mauldin on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (KJR).
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid Corporation. (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Donald L. Miller, II. #8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by KVK Tech, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Kentucky Pharmacy Board; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SCD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Proposed Summons by Henderson, City of re #5 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commonwealth, #2 Exhibit B - Matthew Bevin, #3 Exhibit C - Ky Pharmacy Board, #4 Exhibit D - CHFS)(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/8/2019 (SCD).
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Henderson, City of.(Grabhorn, Michael)
October 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judeg Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation extending Responsive Pleading Time (CBD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME to RESPOND to the COMPLAINT by Henderson, City of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) Modified event on 10/3/2019 (CBD).
September 30, 2019 Clerk's Note: JPML notified re #1 Notice of Removal. (CBD)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Henderson, City of, MOTION to Continue by Henderson, City of; Error: Clerk filed motion as to an incorrect party. Clerk has corrected filing information & docket sheet to reflect the correct filer. No further action required. cc: COR (JJ)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: 1. Effective immediately, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. (CBD)cc: COR
September 30, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
September 29, 2019 MOTION to Continue Litigation against Defendants with Pending Bankruptcy by Henderson, City of(JJ) Modified filer & text on 9/30/2019 (JJ).
September 29, 2019 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel by Henderson, City of(JJ) Modified filer & text on 9/30/2019 (JJ).
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Co. Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-941. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4476583), filed by Beverly Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint 1-25, #3 Exhibit Complaint 26-50, #4 Exhibit Complaint 51-75, #5 Exhibit Complaint 76-100, #6 Exhibit Complaint 101-125, #7 Exhibit Complaint 126-150, #8 Exhibit Complaint 151-175, #9 Exhibit Complaint 176-190)(JJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #10 Exhibit B-Motion to Appoint, #11 Exhibit C-Motion to Continue) (JJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson, City of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Represented By: Carolyn Purcell Michener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation LLC
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Arlington
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Charles R. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Perry M. Bentley
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Robert Franklin Duncan
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Scott T. Dickens
Represented By: Benjamin Cadden Fultz
Represented By: Daniel E. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Scott M. Ahmad
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Kavanagh
Represented By: James E. Looper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith Jones Kingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Represented By: Lucas Ryan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Louis Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Catherine Elaine York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Pharmacy Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bevin
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: John Mohammad Ghaelian
Represented By: Charles Wesley Rowland
Represented By: C. David Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henderson, City of
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?