Hardin County Fiscal Court et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Green County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court and Ohio County Fiscal Court
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Rite Aid Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, CVS Health Corporation LLC, Allergan, PLC, Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler, H.D. Smith, LLC, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Kroger Company, Cardinal Health, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Depomed Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International PLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc., Actavis L, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Inc., David Sackler, Walmart Inc., KVK Tech, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Actavis LLC, Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Kentucky Pharmacy Board, Matthew Bevin and Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 3:2019cv00068
Filed: September 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Kentucky of Non-Consent to Removal (Johnstone, C.)
November 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (CBD)
November 27, 2019 Filing 128 REPLY to #101 , #76 in Support of Their Motion for Protective Order filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth)
November 26, 2019 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - West-Ward US Headquarters, #2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Acceptance & Signature, #3 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. filed by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Stopher, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Clerk's Note: Notice to Attorney James E. Looper, Jr. #113 was sent in error and counsel may disregard this notice. (CBD)
November 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Beverly Sackler; MOTION to Continue by Beverly Sackler; MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Beverly Sackler, #16 MOTION to Dismiss; #17 MOTION TO HOLD DISCOVERY IN ABEYANCE; #63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery; #87 MOTION to Expedite. (SCD)
November 25, 2019 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #110 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 124 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anda, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Anda, Inc... (Johnson, Paige)
November 25, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anda, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige)
November 25, 2019 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION to Expedite by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
November 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (SCD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Donald J. Kelly for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Christopher B. Essig for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Scott M. Ahmad for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., added. (CBD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 118 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (White, Jordan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (CBD).
November 21, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Brien O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Sheet)(CBD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andrew O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Sheet)(CBD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY E. Frederick Straub, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James Looper, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD)
November 21, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (CBD)
November 20, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 111 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - MDL Order, #3 Proposed Order tendered Corrected Order Granting Expedited Consideration of Motion to Dismiss)(Johnstone, C.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 110 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - MDL Order, #3 Proposed Order Corrected tendered Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Johnstone, C.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 109 INCORRECTLY FILED - MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order tendered Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing)(Johnstone, C.) See #111 for the correct entry of this pleading. Modified on 11/20/2019 (SCD).
November 19, 2019 Filing 108 INCORRECTLY FILED - MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnstone, C.) See #110 for the correct entry of this pleading. Modified on 11/20/2019 (SCD).
November 18, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Kentucky Complaints Redline, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of S. Ahmad, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Interest of US, #5 Exhibit 5 - J. Polster Withdrawal of Order, #6 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order in Takoma Regional Hospital Case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order in Belcher Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order in Lac Courte Case, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order in Robinson Rancheria Case, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order in Seminole County Case, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order in Alameda County Case, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order in Portland Case, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order in Alexandria Case, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order in Galax Case, #11 Exhibit 11 - Order in San Mateo Case, #12 Exhibit 12 - Order in Melrose Case, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order in Jacksonville Case, #14 Exhibit 14 - Order in Delaware County Case, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order in Pawnee County Case, #16 Exhibit 16 - Order in Osage County Case, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order in Noble County Case, #18 Exhibit 18 - Order in Jim Wells Case, #19 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Expedite by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #73 is GRANTED; and 2. Julia Kavanagh is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/18/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Julia Kavanagh w/ ECF Reg. Form via US Mail
November 13, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 102 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amerisource Bergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Simpson, W.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc., #90 MOTION for Joinder by Depomed Inc. in Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, #97 MOTION for Joinder in #76 Motion for Protective Order by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Joseph A. Wright for H.D. Smith, LLC, added. (CBD)
November 12, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kennedy Simpson on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Simpson, W.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Second Amended Order)(Mauldin, Timothy)
November 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #98 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD)
November 8, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Conor Brendan O'Croinin re #98 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4515171). (CBD)
November 8, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Conor Brendan O'Croinin for CVS Health Corporation LLC, Conor Brendan O'Croinin for CVS Health Corporation LLC, added. (CBD)
November 7, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4515171) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Stopher, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Joinder in #76 Motion for Protective Order by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moad, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/1/2019 (SCD).
October 31, 2019 Filing 96 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John)
October 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #94 NOTICE of MOOTNESS of PENDING MOTIONS re #17 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss, #16 MOTION to Dismiss (CBD)
October 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #93 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO SMITH DRUG COMPANY, INC. (CBD)
October 31, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #81 MOTION for Extension of Time by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services (CBD)
October 30, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of MOOTNESS of PENDING MOTIONS re #17 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss , #16 MOTION to Dismiss by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified text on 10/31/2019 (CBD).
October 30, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO SMITH DRUG COMPANY, INC. by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified text on 10/31/2019 (CBD).
October 30, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION for Extension of Time by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Joinder by Depomed Inc. in Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed as DE #76 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sadler, Kevin) Modified text/link on 10/30/2019 (CBD).
October 29, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney M. Trent Spurlock for Actavis LLC, M. Trent Spurlock for Actavis Pharma, Inc., M. Trent Spurlock for Cephalon, Inc., M. Trent Spurlock for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., M. Trent Spurlock for Watson Laboratories, Inc., added. (CBD)
October 29, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #87 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion 86 to Remand (CBD)
October 28, 2019 Filing 89 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc... (Johnson, Paige)
October 28, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of M. Trent Spurlock and Paige N. Johnson by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (CBD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion #86 to Remand by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (CBD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL County Cases, #2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Service, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 85 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 28, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 28, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (CBD)
October 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (CBD)
October 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by KVK Tech, Inc. (CBD)
October 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #55 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures - No Response (CBD)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD; Error: The notice to a pro se filer was incorretly filed in this case; Entry by docket clerk; Correction: The entry has been deleted; No action is required by counsel. cc: COR (SCD)
October 25, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney John M. Ghaeline for Commonwealth of Kentucky, Charles Wesley Rowland for Commonwealth of Kentucky, added. (CBD)
October 25, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Charles R. Hughes terminated. (CBD)
October 25, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Jeffrey Steven Moad for McKesson Corporation, added. (CBD)
October 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Commonwealth of Kentucky (CBD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Fazal A. Shere on behalf of Kroger Company (Shere, Fazal)
October 24, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Michener, Carolyn)
October 24, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuhn, Matthew) Modified text on 10/25/2019 (CBD).
October 23, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cabinet for Health and Family Services. (Kleinert, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stopher Ltr dated 10-7-2019, #2 Exhibit B - 10-07-2019 Email re Extensions, #3 Exhibit C - E.Gray Ltr dated 10-18-2019 re meet and confer, #4 Exhibit D - Email dated 10-23-2019 from Will Nefzger, #5 Proposed Order)(Gray, Elisabeth) Modified on 10/24/2019 (SCD).
October 23, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered order Extending Time to Answer)(Johnstone, C.) Modified on 10/24/2019 (SCD).
October 23, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Kentucky Special Limited Entry of Appearance (Johnstone, C.)
October 23, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #73 MOTION for Julia Kavanaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD)
October 23, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Julia Kavanaugh re #73 MOTION for Julia Kavanaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (CBD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Julia Kavanaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt, #4 Cover Letter)(CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 71 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Looper, Jr on behalf of Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(CBD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Response to Requests for Admissions by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Harrison, Lucas) Modified on 10/23/2019 (SCD).
October 18, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Purcell, Carolyn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER ENJOINING THE CONTINUATION OF THIS PROCEEDING AS TO THE INDIVIDUAL FORMER DIRECTORS by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Amended Preliminary Injunction Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Excerpted copy of Exhibits to the Complaint for Injunctive)(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (CBD).
October 18, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Enlargement of Time for the Pharmacy Defendants to file Answers or Other Responsive Pleadings)(Stopher, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions and MOTION for Stay of Discovery by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fultz, Benjamin). Added MOTION to Stay on 10/18/2019 (SCD).
October 17, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Bevin. (Kuhn, Matthew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, #4 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas)
October 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond, #32 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. (CBD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. , #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by KVK Tech, Inc. filed by Hardin County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time for the Former Directors to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint, to Oppose Motion for a Temporary Injunction, and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference by Ilene Sackler, et al filed by Hardin County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 60 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC.. (Humphreys, Gene)
October 16, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Gene L. Humphreys. #53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by KVK Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
October 15, 2019 Filing 57 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 56 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Health Corporation LLC.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #48 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4491952), #49 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492074) (CBD)
October 15, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John A. McCauley, James K. O'Connor re #49 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492074), #48 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4491952). (CBD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Charles Hughes. #47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Kroger Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc... (Ogrosky, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Gene L. Humphreys by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC. (Humphreys, Gene) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (CBD).
October 15, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kirk Ogrosky on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Ogrosky, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Lucas Harrison by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Richardson, Melissa) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Melissa Thompson \by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 15, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492074) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4491952) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McCauley, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Charles R. Hughes by Kroger Company. (Hughes, Charles) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 46 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith)
October 14, 2019 Filing 45 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 44 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson. (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Meredith Jones Kingsley by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 42 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Louis Sparks on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Sparks, Andrew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Robert E. Stopher, Robert D. Bobrow by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Stopher, Robert) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 39 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co... (Tremper, Frank)
October 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Mark G. Arnzen and Frank K. Tremper by Walgreen Co.. (Tremper, Frank) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 37 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Other Affiliate Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Fultz, Benjamin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Daniel E. Hancock by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hancock, Daniel) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Scott T. Dickens by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dickens, Scott) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Benjamin C. Fultz by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fultz, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD).
October 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Polczynski on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Polczynski, Ryan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 32 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
October 11, 2019 Filing 31 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Depomed, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Arlington, Scott D. Powers, Kevin M. Sadler on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #29 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #27 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #28 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kevin M. Sadler re #29 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD)
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Scott D. Powers re #28 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD)
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David T. Arlington re #27 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lucas Harrison. #16 MOTION to Dismiss has been filed by Smith Drug Company, Inc without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO HOLD DISCOVERY IN ABEYANCE by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Discovery Requests, #3 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas) Modified on 10/11/2019 (SCD).
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas)
October 10, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Mark S. Fenzel for Rite Aid Corporation, Mark S. Fenzel for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., added. (CBD)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time for the Former Directors to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint, to Oppose Motion for a Temporary Injunction, and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (CBD).
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Mauldin on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler LefCourt. (Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (KJR).
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid Corporation. (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Donald L. Miller, II. #9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by KVK Tech, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Kentucky Pharmacy Board; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Hardin County Fiscal Court re #6 Amended Complaint Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commonwealth, #2 Exhibit B - Matthew Bevin, #3 Exhibit C - Ky Pharmacy Board, #4 Exhibit D - CHFS)(Grabhorn, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court.(Grabhorn, Michael)
October 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 Proposed Stipulation extending Responsive Pleading Time (CBD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #4 Stipulation, Corrected for Document Heading by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME to RESPOND to the COMPLAINT by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) Modified event on 10/3/2019 (CBD).
September 30, 2019 CLERK'S NOTE re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel and S. Vrolijk notified via email with a copy of the complaint and docket sheet. (TDA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: 1. Clerk DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al as 3:17-cv-70 to Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/22/2017. (TDA) cc: COR
September 29, 2019 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by plaintiffs. See state court record #1 Ex. D for pdf. (TDA) Modified filer on 9/30/2019 (TDA).
September 29, 2019 MOTION to Continue Litigation Against Defendants with Pending Bankruptcy by plaintiffs. See state court record #1 Ex. C for pdf. (TDA) Modified filer on 9/30/2019 (TDA).
September 29, 2019 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel by plaintiffs. See state court record #1 Ex. B for pdf. (TDA) Modified filer on 9/30/2019 (TDA).
September 29, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-940. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4476585), filed by Beverly Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Continue Litigation, #4 Exhibit D - Motion for Temporary Injunction, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin County Fiscal Court et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Represented By: Carolyn Purcell Michener
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Arlington
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Charles R. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: John Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Scott T. Dickens
Represented By: Benjamin Cadden Fultz
Represented By: Daniel E. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Scott M. Ahmad
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Kavanagh
Represented By: James E. Looper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith Jones Kingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Represented By: Lucas Ryan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Louis Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Catherine Elaine York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Pharmacy Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bevin
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: John Mohammad Ghaelian
Represented By: Charles Wesley Rowland
Represented By: C. David Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breckinridge County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardin County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?