Gaither v. Tussey et al
Plaintiff: Byron Antonio Gaither
Defendant: Jamie Allen, Jones and Steve Tussey
Case Number: 5:2019cv00246
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: 1. Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Action DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from docket. 3. FINAL AND APPEALABLE Judgment and no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/16/2019.(GLD)cc: plaintiff-last known address
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Gaither's complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. 2. Court will enter appropriate Judgment. 3. Matter STRICKEN from docket. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/16/2019.(GLD)cc: Plaintiff-last known address Modified on 7/16/2019 (GLD).
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Byron Antonio Gaither re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (GLD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Byron Antonio Gaither re #5 Redaction Notice w/sample caption. (GLD) Modified on 6/28/2019 (GLD).
June 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #7 Letter for Little Sandy Correctional Complex (KM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Little Sandy Correctional Complex re #6 Order; Inmate no longer incarcerated at Little Sandy Correctional Complex. Facility will not be collecting the litigation fees from Byron Gaither (KM)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Gaither's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. a. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Gaither MUST pay $39.73 to the Clerk as partial filing fee. b. Clerk SHALL open account for receipt of filing fee. Clerk shall complete Form EDKY 525. Clerk shall serve copy of Order and Notice of Payment Form to Jailer/Warden of institution where confined and Office of General Counsel for Dept Corrections, Frankfort, KY; c. Each month custodian SHALL send Clerk payment equal to 20% of income but only if account exceeds $10. Custody shall continue until $350 filing fee is paid. d. Gaither MUST advise Clerk of any change in mailing address. 2. Matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/13/2019. (GLD)cc: Finance, Pro Se Plaintiff, Jailer for Little Sandy Correctional Complex, and Office General Counsel - with Form EDKY 525 Modified on 6/13/2019 (GLD).
June 12, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #1 Complaint (Referred), #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Antonio Gaither (GLD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(GLD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #1 Sample Caption) (GLD). Modified on 6/12/2019 (GLD).
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Byron Antonio Gaither, pro se. (GLD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Assets for Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Antonio Gaither, pro se.(GLD)
June 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (GLD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No process requested), filed by Byron Antonio Gaither, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmark illegible)(GLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaither v. Tussey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Antonio Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?