Texas Eastern Transmission, LP v. Douglas et al
Plaintiff: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP
Defendant: Patricia Douglas, K.R., E.R., C.R. and P.R.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00347
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re 6 MOTION to Stay by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. MOTION to Dismiss by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. (MDC)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1) Texas Eastern's 3 Motion for Leave to File the Action under Seal is DENIED; 2) The parties are DIRECTED to submit proposed redactions and/or motions to seal w/in 14 days of the date of this Order. 3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to maintain the filings at DE# 1 , 3 , 6 , and 7 under seal; and 4) The Court will enter a separate Order addressing the parties' proposed redactions and/or motions to seal. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/06/2020. (MDC) cc: COR
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Stay by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. MOTION to Dismiss by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. filed by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Deposition of Patricia Douglas)(MDC)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: 1) Dft's #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; AND 2) Adam D. Lewis is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts in the aboce styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 09/16/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Adam D. Lewis by US Mail (Order + ECF Registration Form )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: 1) Dft's #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; and 2) Kurt B. Arnold is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Dft in the above style action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 09/16/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Kurt B. Arnold by US Mail (Order + ECF Registration Form)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Dft's #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED; and 2) J. Kyle Findley is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 09/16/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and J. Kyle Findley by US Mail (Order + ECF Registration Form) Modified text on 9/16/2020 (MDC).
September 11, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re #11 MOTION for J. Kyle Findley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R., #12 MOTION for Adam D. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R., #10 MOTION for Kurt B. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. (MDC)
September 11, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Adam Lewis re #12 MOTION for Adam D. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R.. (MDC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Adam D. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(MDC)
September 11, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to J. Kyle Findley re #11 MOTION for J. Kyle Findley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R.. (MDC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for J. Kyle Findley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing)(MDC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #2 Receipt PHV Fee) (MDC).
September 11, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kurt B. Arnold re #10 MOTION for Kurt B. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R.. (MDC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Kurt B. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C.R., Patricia Douglas, E.R., K.R., P.R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificates of Good Standing)(MDC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #2 Receipt - PHV Fee) (MDC).
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY J. Kyle Findley by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Adam Lewis by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC)
September 9, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: 7 Answer to Complaint. (MDC)
August 17, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re 3 MOTION to Seal Case by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP (MDC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Patricia Douglas ; Summons issued and returned to counsel via pick-up from Office of Clerk (MDC)
August 17, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Eastern Transmission, LP identifying Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Transmission Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent Spectra Energy Transmission Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Enbridge for Texas Eastern Transmission, LP.. (MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP v. Douglas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Douglas
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Adam Lewis
Represented By: J. Kyle Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.R.
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Adam Lewis
Represented By: J. Kyle Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.R.
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Adam Lewis
Represented By: J. Kyle Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R.
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Adam Lewis
Represented By: J. Kyle Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.R.
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Adam Lewis
Represented By: J. Kyle Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Eastern Transmission, LP
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?