Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital and T.J. Samson Community Hospital
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty. Ltd., Watson Pharma Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Henry Schein, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic, LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Abbvie, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Practice Fusion, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, KVK-Tech, Inc., Specgx LLC, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00102
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. The parties' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #21 is GRANTED; 2. Dfts Allscripts Health Care Solutions, Inc.'s and Practice Fusion, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plfs' Complaint is EXTENDED 45 days from the later of (1) a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer to MDL No 2804, or (2) entry of an order from this Court ruling on Plf's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/9/2020. (RCB)cc: COR
September 9, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (RCB)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stansbury, Casey) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (RCB).
September 4, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (RCB)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Marion Hospital)(Sparks, Andrew)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Caitlin McQueen re #19 Notice of Appearance; Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RCB)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey C. Stansbury, Caitlin L. McQueen on behalf of Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (McQueen, Caitlin) Modified text on 9/2/2020 (RCB).
August 28, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #8 MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Commun (RCB)
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Joseph Kramer re #18 REPLY; Error: a link was created to the Response instead of the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RCB)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to #8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand filed by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital. (Kramer, Joseph) Modified link on 8/28/2020 (RCB).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1. The partie' Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time #16 is GRANTED; 2. Dft Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED 45 days from the later of (1) a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer to MDL No 2804, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, or (2) entry of an order from this Court ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/26/2020. (RCB)cc: COR
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: 1. Dft H.D. Smith's Motion to Join Motion #7 is GRANTED; 2. Dfts Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Amneal Pharaceuticals of New York, LLC's Motion to Join #11 is GRANTED; 3. Wal-Mart's Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED; and 4. The deadline for properly served dfts to answer or otherwise respond to Plf's complaint is EXTENDED to 45 days from the later of (1) a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer of this case to the Opiate MDL, or (2) entry of an order from this Court ruling on Plf's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/25/2020. (RCB)cc: COR
August 21, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #14 Notice re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (RCB)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Sparks, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Commun filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - City of Orlando, #2 Exhibit J - City of Fairfax)(Sparks, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Order regarding remands, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Order on Remand, #3 Exhibit 3- Remand Order County of Dallas, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - Weber County UT, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - Unitah County UT, #6 Exhibit 6 - Remand Order County of Greenville, #7 Exhibit 7 - Remand Order County of Spartanburg, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - Brooke Co. Comm., #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - City of Worcester, #10 Exhibit 10 - Remand Order - County of Van Zandt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Remand Order - County of Lexington, #12 Exhibit 12 - Transcript of 12.13.17 Teleconference re Remands)(Kramer, Joseph)
August 14, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #11 MOTION for Joinder #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (RCB)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Joinder #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Thomas)
August 10, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (RCB)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Questions, #2 Exhibit B - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order, #4 Exhibit D - Memorandum & Order, #5 Exhibit E - Noble City Order, #6 Exhibit F - Jim Hogg Order, #7 Exhibit G - Takoma Order, #8 Exhibit H - Seminole County Order, #9 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; #7 MOTION for Joinder by H.D. Smith, LLC (RCB)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
July 30, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital (RCB)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Joseph) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (RCB).
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by H.D. Smith, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (RCB).
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Andrew)
July 28, 2020 Clerk's Note re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel & S. Vrolijk notified by e-mail with a copy of notice of removal, complaint & docket sheet. (RCB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Simpson, W.)
July 24, 2020 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (RCB)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00151, filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4730656) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Pleading, #4 Exhibit D - Stay Order, #5 Exhibit E - Transfer Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Brandan J. Montminy
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Ana Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Arlington
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lana A. Olson
Represented By: Jackson E. Knouse
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis
Represented By: Caitlin McQueen Tubbesing
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Fusion, Inc.
Represented By: Lana A. Olson
Represented By: Jackson E. Knouse
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis
Represented By: Caitlin McQueen Tubbesing
Represented By: Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine A. Stivers
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Earl Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Louis Sparks
Represented By: Erin Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Earl Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Earl Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Elisa P. McEnroe
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Coleen M. Meehan
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny A. Hergenrother
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Cari K. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Earl Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Andrew Louis Sparks
Represented By: Erin Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Joseph Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital of Louisa, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flaget Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardin Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J. Samson Community Hospital
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kramer
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Richard Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?