Combs et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Barm Combs, Patricia Combs, Allen Sexton, Betty Sexton, Luther Sergent, John Paul Carroll, Marlene Carroll, Jimmy Combs, Donnie Akers, Monica Akers, Brenda Lawson, Emett Hamilton, Catherine Ann Hamilton, Larry Tackett, Jennifer Tackett, Joey Maynard, Chandra Maynard, Adam Akers, Heather Akers, Willie Patton, Larry Longworth, Karen Longworth, Donald Howard, Jay Bates, Darrin Newsome, Tracy Newsome, Clifford Pittman, Patsy Pittman, Jimmy Strunk, Theresa Strunk, Harlan Hall, Kasey Hall, Brent Johnson, Johnny Gayheart, Jacqueline Gayheart, Larry Kiser, Jr., Anastasia Kiser, Floyd Taylor, Rosalee Taylor, Donald Johnson, Gleda Johnson, James Thornsberry, Robin Thornsberry, Scotty Pratt, Amelia Pratt, Lenville Newsome, Glenda Newsome, Derrick Martin, Star Martin, Mark Minix, Jennifer Minix, Michael Newsome, Donna Newsome and James Holbrook
Defendant: 3M Company, Network Supply, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC Corporation, Cabot Corporation, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo LLC, Mine Service Company, Inc., Network Supply, Inc., Roswell, Inc., Regina Mine Supply, Inc., Carbon Mine Supply, LLC, M & M Mine Supply, Inc. and Kentucky Mine Supply Company
Case Number: 7:2021cv00084
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
2 Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Akers, Donnie Akers, Heather Akers, Monica Akers, Jay Bates, John Paul Carroll, Marlene Carroll, Barm Combs, Jimmy Combs, Patricia Combs, Jacqueline Gayheart, Johnny Gayheart, Harlan Hall, Kasey Hall, Catherine Ann Hamilton, Emett Hamilton, James Holbrook, Donald Howard, Brent Johnson, Donald Johnson, Gleda Johnson, Anastasia Kiser, Larry Kiser, Jr, Brenda Lawson, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Derrick Martin, Star Martin, Chandra Maynard, Joey Maynard, Jennifer Minix, Mark Minix, Darrin Newsome, Donna Newsome, Glenda Newsome, Lenville Newsome, Michael Newsome, Tracy Newsome, Willie Patton, Clifford Pittman, Patsy Pittman, Amelia Pratt, Scotty Pratt, Luther Sergent, Allen Sexton, Betty Sexton, Jimmy Strunk, Theresa Strunk, Jennifer Tackett, Larry Tackett, Floyd Taylor, Rosalee Taylor, James Thornsberry, Robin Thornsberry. (Givens, Johnny)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE to #26 Joinder in 3M's Response filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Jones, Alice)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand by Adam Akers, Donnie Akers, Heather Akers, Monica Akers, Jay Bates, John Paul Carroll, Marlene Carroll, Barm Combs, Jimmy Combs, Patricia Combs, Jacqueline Gayheart, Johnny Gayheart, Harlan Hall, Kasey Hall, Catherine Ann Hamilton, Joinder in 3M's Response filed by Aearo LLC, American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC Corporation. (Watt, Whitney) Modified text, filer per attorney on 12/15/2021 (RCB).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Remand by Adam Akers, Donnie Akers, Heather Akers, Monica Akers, Jay Bates, John Paul Carroll, Marlene Carroll, Barm Combs, Jimmy Combs, Patricia Combs, Jacqueline Gayheart, Johnny Gayheart, Harlan Hall, Kasey Hall, Catherine Ann Hamilton, filed by 3M Company. (Miller, Byron)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #12 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company (RCB)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company filed by 3M Company. (Miller, Byron)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #24 MOTION to Dismiss by 3M Company Duplicative Suits of Plaintiffs Larry Longworth, Karen Longworth, Billy Ratliff, and Debbie Ratliff (RCB)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Remand by Adam Akers, Donnie Akers, Heather Akers, Monica Akers, Jay Bates, John Paul Carroll, Marlene Carroll, Barm Combs, Jimmy Combs, Patricia Combs, Jacqueline Gayheart, Johnny Gayheart, Harlan Hall, Kasey Hall, Catherine Ann Hamilton, Emett Hamilton, James Holbrook, Donald Howard, Brent Johnson, Donald Johnson, Gleda Johnson, Anastasia Kiser, Larry Kiser, Jr, Brenda Lawson, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Derrick Martin, Star Martin, Chandra Maynard, Joey Maynard, Jennifer Minix, Mark Minix, Darrin Newsome, Donna Newsome, Glenda Newsome, Lenville Newsome, Michael Newsome, Tracy Newsome, Willie Patton, Clifford Pittman, Patsy Pittman, Amelia Pratt, Scotty Pratt, Luther Sergent, Allen Sexton, Betty Sexton, Jimmy Strunk, Theresa Strunk, Jennifer Tackett, Larry Tackett, Floyd Taylor, Rosalee Taylor, James Thornsberry, Robin Thornsberry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brian Adams, et al. Memorandum of Law and Exhibits from 7:21-cv-82, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Hammond, Glenn) Modified text on 11/29/2021 (TDA).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Update. Attorney Johnny T. Givens for Plaintiffs added. (RCB)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company filed by Adam Akers, Donnie Akers, Heather Akers, Monica Akers, Jay Bates, John Paul Carroll, Marlene Carroll, Barm Combs, Jimmy Combs, Patricia Combs, Jacqueline Gayheart, Johnny Gayheart, Harlan Hall, Kasey Hall, Catherine Ann Hamilton, Emett Hamilton, James Holbrook, Donald Howard, Brent Johnson, Donald Johnson, Gleda Johnson, Anastasia Kiser, Larry Kiser, Jr, Brenda Lawson, Karen Longworth, Larry Longworth, Derrick Martin, Star Martin, Chandra Maynard, Joey Maynard, Jennifer Minix, Mark Minix, Darrin Newsome, Donna Newsome, Glenda Newsome, Lenville Newsome, Michael Newsome, Tracy Newsome, Willie Patton, Clifford Pittman, Patsy Pittman, Amelia Pratt, Scotty Pratt, Luther Sergent, Allen Sexton, Betty Sexton, Jimmy Strunk, Theresa Strunk, Jennifer Tackett, Larry Tackett, Floyd Taylor, Rosalee Taylor, James Thornsberry, Robin Thornsberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wilson Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wilson CMO)(Hammond, Glenn)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by 3M Company Duplicative Suits of Plaintiffs Larry Longworth, Karen Longworth, Billy Ratliff, and Debbie Ratliff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Spann, Bryant)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cabot CSC Corporation.(Startsman, Emily)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mine Service Company, Inc.. (Gault, Patrick)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Mine Supply Company. (Gault, Patrick)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING by 3M Company re #12 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Sever)(Miller, Byron)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: this matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Candace Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 11/2/2021. (RCB)cc: COR
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aearo LLC.(Startsman, Emily)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Optical Corporation.(Startsman, Emily)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Optical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Coast Holdings Incorporated for American Optical Corporation.. (Watt, Whitney)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Mine Safety Appliances Company.(Spurlock, M.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holding LLC, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety, Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC.. (Watt, Whitney)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Sever and to Require Repleading by 3M Company Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from 6/9/2020 Deposition of Ollie McGinnis)(Miller, Byron) Modified text on 11/1/2021 (RCB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2021: #2 Proposed Order) (RCB).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cabot CSC Corporation, Cabot Corporation. (Watt, Whitney)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Byron Miller re #12 MOTION to Sever by 3M Company; Error #1: attorney failed to submit a [proposed order] as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. Error #2: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit A." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel as to error #2. cc: COR (RCB)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Whitney Frazier Watt. #5 Notice has been filed by American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC, LLC (formerly known as Cabot CSC Corporation), Aearo Technologies, LLC and Aearo LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mine Safety Appliances Company. (Spurlock, M.)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Michael B. Martin by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (RCB)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Mine Safety Appliances Company (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (RCB)cc: COR
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, American Optical Corporation, Cabot CSC Corporation, Cabot Corporation (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by 3M Company. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company. (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knott Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-197, filed by 3M Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5108151) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - 8710 Approval, #3 Exhibit 3 - 8715 Approval, #4 Exhibit 4 - 8210 Approval, #5 Exhibit 5 - 3M Science of Safety, #6 Exhibit 6 - Complaint Strunk v 3M, #7 Exhibit 7 - Scientific Literature, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sample Dockets, #9 Exhibit 9 - Transcript Williams v 3M, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY SOS Network Supply, #11 Exhibit 11 - KY SOS Regina Mine Supply, #12 Exhibit 12 - KY SOS Carbon Mine Supply, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cox Judgement, #14 Exhibit 14 - 3M Notice of Filing NOR, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Kentucky Mine Supply Company. (State Court pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document.) (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER to Complaint by Mine Service Company, Inc. (State Court pleading, see DE #1 for pdf document.) (RCB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Robert H. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Bryant J. Spann
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Robert H. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: Alice A. Jones
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot CSC Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo LLC
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Emily Larish Startsman
Represented By: Robert M. Connolly
Represented By: Whitney Frazier Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Mine Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Mine Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & M Mine Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Mine Supply Company
Represented By: Patrick W. Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barm Combs
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Combs
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Sexton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Sexton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Sergent
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Carroll
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Carroll
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Combs
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Akers
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Akers
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lawson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emett Hamilton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ann Hamilton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Tackett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tackett
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Maynard
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Maynard
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Akers
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Akers
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Patton
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Longworth
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Longworth
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Howard
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Bates
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Pittman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Pittman
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Strunk
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Strunk
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlan Hall
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Hall
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Johnson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Gayheart
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gayheart
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kiser, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Kiser
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Taylor
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalee Taylor
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gleda Johnson
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thornsberry
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Thornsberry
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Pratt
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Pratt
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenville Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Martin
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Minix
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Minix
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Newsome
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Holbrook
Represented By: Glenn Martin Hammond
Represented By: Michael B. Martin
Represented By: Johnny T. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?