M.A. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: M.A.
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Brandy Scarberry
Case Number: 7:2023cv00095
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: WHR's motion to compel compliance (DE #1 ) is GRANTED as follows: 1) WHR shall obtain a new subpoena in the Southern District of Ohio pursuantto FRCP 45(a)(2); 2) the new subpoena must require Scarberry's appearance at a deposition within the Eastern District of Kentucky and advise her of her rights to quash or modify the subpoena pursuant to FRCP 45(d)(3); and 3) WHR shall serve Scarberry with the new subpoena in a manner that will allow her reasonable time to comply pursuant to FRCP 45(d)(3)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/4/2024. (TDA)cc: COR & Scarberry via US Mail. Modified cc: on 1/4/2024 (TDA).
January 3, 2024 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #3 Order - nothing filed. (TDA)
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Fowles, Justin)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scarberry shall have 30 days to file either: (1) a notice of intent to comply with the subpoena or (2) a motion to quash or modify the subpoena. If Scarberry fails to respond to this order, Court will issue an order granting WHR's motion. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/29/2023. (TDA)cc: COR & Scarberry at address listed on motion
November 22, 2023 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
November 22, 2023 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance Subpoena Ad Testificandum by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (TDA)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance Subpoena Ad Testificandum, filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5703402). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Subpoena & Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Deposition of Brandy Scarberry, #4 Exhibit C - Email dated 11/1/2023, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(TDA) Modified text on 11/22/2023 (TDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.A. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Walker Weyand
Represented By: Justin S. Fowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Brandy Scarberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?