Hawkins et al v. National Home Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Guy, Sr., Marlon Bordelon, Reginald Allen, Jr., Jean Guerrier, Trichina Williams, Carol L. Barnes, Allison Weber, Nicki Garnier, Charles Coleman, Anthony Synigal, Stephanie Myles, Alma Franco, Alton Roche, Thu Do, David Wright, Delton Burris, Daysi Crespo, Carletta Brown, August Johnson, III, Adam Prout, Gayle Stansbury, Cory P. Simoneaux, Aurelia Sentmore, Peter Mosby, Nhan H. Luong, Derrick Houston, Hong Huyen Nguyen, Thomas Dright, Phat Tran, Brian Stansbury, Christie Sapp, S. N. Murthy, Hang Nguyen, Gerard Walker, Kavita Mansukhani, Lawrence Terrel, III, Daniel T. Brown, III, Pamela Kinberger, Michael Jones, Kishore Mansukhani, Valeria Borne, Jonas Escarment, Jose D. Vasquez, Chuen Tsang, Quoc Nguyen, Herbert Watler, My Le, Saed Abunaser, Anndrea LaSalle-Irons, Nirmila P. Mansinghani, Darrell Sullivan, Eric L. Avant, Jaquetta Wright, Michelle Myers, Jennifer Pugh, Tiffany Barnes, Toya Baptiste, Reginald Smith, Rickey Lee, Arshad Aziz Tahir, Pamela Arbuthnot, Sonji Skipper, Shana Davis, Joseph Wilson, Gilberto Franco, Desiree J. Jones, Krista Moore, Ruth Smith, Sherline Varmall, Milton Carter, Micanor Camille, David Quinn, Marvin Williams, Brenda Quarles, Stephen Tran, Brenda Payne, Sharon Poleate, Earl Robin, Jr., Gayle M. Polite, Shandra Banks, Keith Taranto, Dwight Payne, Sr., Long Nguyen, Tham Do, Charles Jackson, Jennifer Le, Thiet Nguyen, Vu Xuan Nguyen, Karen Lockwood, David Kinberger, Darnell Lee, Irvin A Joseph, Clarence Jackson, Juan Jones, Amelia Donald, Huda Khelik, Robert Narcisse, Shelva Davis, Michelle Bartholomew, Ngoc Huynh, Chanda Camese, Anise Garnier, Rodrigue Guerrier, KiTami Parker Johnson, Myeshia Conner, Jeanne Brocks, Elsie Johnson, Dana Thomas, Larry Guilford, Ulysses A. Barnes, Debra Colar-Hughes, Candy Rogers, Warren Dupre, Jr., Rigoberto Rendon, Raquia Compass, Caryl Hatfield, Nliu Phuong Nguyen, James B N Dao, Krista Lawrence, Sabrina Smith, Celine Fang, Bich Ngo, Ramona Hill, Heather Royer, Todd Royer, Monica T. Cordier, Monica Smallwood, Keela Hawkins, Loc Xuan Nguyen, Gary Poleate, Ronald Beverly, Mohammed Amin, Conrad Wyre, Kevin Hill, Cathy Toni Chase, Charlene Simms, Tracy Hatfield, Mary Andry, Felicia Wiley, Dexter Varmall, Troy Brown, John Kemp, Rose Thong, Wendi Lagasse, Ronald Skipper, Cynthia A. Bush, Jimmie McGowane, Julie S. Firstley, Kent Smith, Cherlyn Smith, Devon Richardson, David B. Collins, Jose Perez, Cleavon Williams, Jonathan Shirley, Ronald Yost, Truong Xuan Dinh, Howard Irving, Binh T. Dieu, Janice Michelle Walker, Hana Jabbar, Lucces Sataille, Kenneth Mendez, Linh Do, Nicole Jefferson, Rochon Barthelemy, Janice Burris, Philpatrick Walker, Gwendolyn Morris, Felix Chambers, Corey Mitchell, Deborah Abunaser, Shannon Taranto, Demetria Quinn, Christopher Williams, Anna Vu, Augustave Moise, Troy D. Banks, Oai Tu Tran, Sharon Irving, Diane Walker, Catina Smith, Zachary Washington, Joshua Lawrence, Henrietta Dupre, Maria Schaefer, Tara Randle, Fitzpatrick S. Nedd, Darril Prout, Jr., Charles Arbuthnot, Wendy Justo, Van May Le, Lisa Smith, Duke Novick, Jimmi Ng, Termeka McGowane, Derek Meyers, Juana Perez, Donald R. Fisher, Theodis Quarles, Julius Myers, Audrey Prout, Bellal A. Kattoum, Tung Phan, Kip Smith, Soirile Pierre, Richard Yesnach, Jr., Johnny Walker, Nghia Nguyen, Clara Ochoa, Edward Sapp, Tyrone Myles, Robert Stewart, Eunice Sylvest, Candida Veras, Sholian Freeman, Norwood Borne, Kimberly Thai, Jessica Robin, Dinh Chu, Christopher Pugh, Ashley Keith, Barbara Weary, Theodore Smith, Blanche Jenkins, Jihad S. Kattoum, Earl Donald, Terry Gaddis, Jr., Latoya Sterling, Reynelle Celestaine, Sandra Richardson, Crystal Faulkner, Mayda Escarment, LaNell Guilford, Garry Rolland, James Milazzo, Del Mosby, Qlle Van Le, Lionel Simms, Jr., Steven Andry, Ebert Joachin, Alba Rendon, Darah Jones, Ike Sterling, Damosthenis Modriaga, Kalisa Synigal, Shanelle Sullivan, Jamie Barnes, Tiffany Nguyen, Damon Adams, LeBaron Fisher, Wanda Bergeron, Kaye Rolland, Jahmal Tillman, Jarvis M. Jones, RaedOtham AbdelMgeed, Rondalyn Beverly, Tung Nguyen, Tracy Coleman, Emilio Crespo, Tiffany Barthelemy, Kevin Barnes, Mary S. Harris, Prentiss Martin, Trang Cao, Stephen Cirfus, JoMarie Stewart, Abdel Abdel, Twana Smith, Germaine Carter, Ralph Morris, Dinh X. Nguyen, Tina Jones, Joshua Darensburg, Margie Keys Britton, Asyecha Anderson, Michael Cummings, Toya Bordelon, Darlene Irving, Christopher Fletcher, Willie Smith, Jr., Lisa Jefferson, Jon L. Smith, Anita Guy, Donald Sipp, Kyalynseia Harrison, Shari Rodgers, Vincent Nguyen, Terrence James, Inez Williams, Karen Williams, Thuy Linh Le, Rhona Dright, Joann Tillman, George Walker, Jr., Jason Poplin and Charles Harrison, III
Defendant: Willow Incorporated, National Home Insurance Company and American Arbitration Association
Case Number: 2:2014cv00354
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kurt D Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JUDGMENT - For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order and Reasons dated February 24, 2015 (Rec. Doc. No. 95); accordingly, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that there be judgment in favor of defendants, National Home Insurance Company (A Risk Retention Group) and Willow, Inc., and against plaintiffs, dismissing plaintiffs' complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 2/25/2015.(Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER and REASONS - Presently before the Court are several motions filed by Defendants National Home Insurance Company (A Risk Retention Group) ("NHIC") and Willow, Inc. (Rec. Docs. 15, 28, 37, 44, 78 and 81). IT IS ORDERED that the motions (Rec. Docs. 15, 28, 78, and 81) are GRANTED to the extent that dismissal is sought for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims in these consolidated actions are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED, however, that Defendant NHIC's motions (Rec. Docs. 37 and 44) seeking to recover attorney's fees and costs from Plaintiffs' counsel, as a monetary sanction pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and/or 28 U.S.C. 1927, are DENIED, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 2/24/2015. (Reference: 13-354, 14-449)(cbs)
September 10, 2014 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #78 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8, #2 Exhibits 9-17)(Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Leave to File RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Excess Pages re 78 & 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 9/10/2014. (Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
September 10, 2014 Filing 92 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #90 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Clerk took corrective action. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
September 9, 2014 Filing 91 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #78 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Reference: 14-354)(Shields, James)
September 9, 2014 Filing 90 EXPARTE MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Excess Pages re 78 & 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibits 1-8, #5 Exhibits 9-17)(Reference: 14-449)(Shields, James) Modified text/event on 9/10/2014 (mmm).
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits to Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 9/8/2014. (Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
September 2, 2014 Filing 88 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits to Motions to Dismiss by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit)(Reference: All Plaintiffs)(Clade, Susan)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 8/12/2014. (Reference: 14-449)(cbs)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 8/12/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
August 12, 2014 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motions filed by National Home Insurance Company re #37 MOTION for Sanctions, #44 MOTION for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 8/12/2014. (Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
July 23, 2014 Filing 83 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2014 re #64 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Appeal of Arbitration Decision Under the Federal Arbitration Act, et. seq., Particularly Sections 10 and 11 and #72 MOTION to Stay Discovery MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Improper Discovery Requests. ORDERED that the #64 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Appeal of Arbitration Decision Under the Federal Arbitration Act, et. seq., Particularly Sections 10 and 11 is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the #72 MOTION to Stay Discovery; for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions; and to Strike Plaintiffs' Improper Discovery Requests is GRANTED. (Reference: 14-354)(plh)
July 21, 2014 Filing 82 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #77 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION AND MEMORANDUM WITH EXCESS PAGES. This is a duplicate filing of document 80 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (Reference: 14-354)(mmm)
July 18, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Willow Incorporated. Motion set for 9/17/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-449)(Starr, J.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 80 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 79 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-449)(Starr, J.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Willow Incorporated. Motion set for 9/17/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 77 ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT 80. EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File MOTION AND MEMORANDUM WITH EXCESS PAGES by Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.) Modified on 7/21/2014 (mmm).
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on #72 MOTION to Stay Discovery MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Improper Discovery Requests. ORDERED that the #72 MOTION to Stay Discovery MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Improper Discovery Requests is SET FOR ORAL HEARING 7/23/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 7/18/14.(Reference: 14-354)(plh)
July 17, 2014 Filing 75 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss Case 14-449 by Willow Incorporated, Willow Incorporated. Motion set for 9/17/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 14-449)(Starr, J.) Modified on 7/17/2014 (mmm).
July 17, 2014 Filing 74 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss Case 14-354 by Willow Incorporated, Willow Incorporated. Motion set for 9/17/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.) Modified on 7/17/2014 (mmm).
July 16, 2014 Filing 73 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by National Home Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(Lane, Michael)
July 16, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Stay Discovery, MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions, MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Improper Discovery Requests by National Home Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion set for 8/6/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(Lane, Michael)
July 14, 2014 Filing 71 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by National Home Insurance Company re #64 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Appeal of Arbitration Decision Under the Federal Arbitration Act, et. seq., Particularly Sections 10 and 11 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 14-449)(Lane, Michael)
July 10, 2014 Filing 70 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #69 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Sanctions. Corrected image subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
July 9, 2014 Filing 69 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Sanctions by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A through C)(Reference: All Plaintiffs)(Clade, Susan) (Main Document 69 replaced on 7/10/2014) (mmm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2014) (mmm).
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying #55 Motion to Adopt Pleadings. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 7/9/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #54 Motion to Adopt Pleadings. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 7/8/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the #64 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Appeal of Arbitration Decision Under the Federal Arbitration Act, et. seq., Particularly Sections 10 and 11 is SET FOR ORAL HEARING 7/23/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/27/14.(Reference: 14-449)(plh)
June 27, 2014 Filing 65 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #64 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Filing attorney selected incorrect judicial officer for submission. When setting a motion for submission there is a reminder message 'Be sure to select the correct Judge or Magistrate Judge:'. Motion is to be heard before Magistrate Knowles. Clerk took corrective action. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
June 26, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Appeal of Arbitration Decision Under the Federal Arbitration Act, et. seq., Particularly Sections 10 and 11 by Shandra Banks, Carletta Brown, Troy Brown, Daysi Crespo, Emilio Crespo, Michael Cummings, Celine Fang, Christie Sapp, Edward Sapp, Chuen Tsang. Motion referred to Magistrate Knowles. Motion set for 7/23/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Knowles. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 14449)(Shields, James) Modified referral on 6/27/2014 (mmm).
June 25, 2014 Filing 63 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motions for Sanctions by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A through C)(Reference: BOTH CASES)(Clade, Susan) Modified on 7/9/2014 (mmm).
June 25, 2014 Filing 62 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #55 MOTION to Adopt Pleadings . (Reference: 14449)(Shields, James)
June 25, 2014 Filing 61 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #54 MOTION to Adopt Pleadings filed by NHIC with regards to Motion to Dismiss . (Reference: 14354)(Shields, James)
June 25, 2014 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by National Home Insurance Company re their #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of NHIC to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to NHIC's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b). Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/25/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 24, 2014 Filing 58 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Appeal of Arbitration Decision Under the Federal Arbitration Act, et. seq., Particularly Sections 10 and 11 by Shandra Banks, Carletta Brown, Troy Brown, Daysi Crespo, Emilio Crespo, Michael Cummings, Celine Fang, Christie Sapp, Edward Sapp, Chuen Tsang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 14449)(Shields, James) Modified on 6/25/2014 (mmm).
June 24, 2014 Filing 57 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #55 , #54 MOTION to Adopt Pleadings. 1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Y' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to remove submission information and add 'Exparte'. 3. Filing attorney selected the same party multiple times. Selecting the same party multiple times results in duplicate text. Clerk removed duplicate text. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
June 24, 2014 Filing 56 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of NHIC to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to NHIC's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant To Rule 12(b) by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A)(Reference: 14-354)(Clade, Susan)
June 23, 2014 Filing 55 EXPARTE MOTION to Adopt Pleadings, by Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-449)(Starr, J.) Modified text/referral/submission on 6/24/2014 (mmm).
June 23, 2014 Filing 54 EXPARTE MOTION to Adopt Pleadings filed by NHIC with regards to Motion to Dismiss, by Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.) Modified text/referral/submission on 6/24/2014 (mmm).
June 20, 2014 Filing 53 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss Case ADOPT PLEADINGS OF NHIC by Willow Incorporated, Willow Incorporated. Motion set for 6/25/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Reference: 14-449)(Starr, J.) Modified on 6/20/2014 (mmm).
June 20, 2014 Filing 52 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss Case AND ADOPT PLEADINGS OF NHIC by Willow Incorporated, Willow Incorporated. Motion set for 6/25/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.) Modified on 6/20/2014 (mmm).
June 19, 2014 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #37 MOTION for Sanctions and #44 MOTION for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-354)(cbs) Modified on 7/9/2014 to edit linkage (cbs).
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/19/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 18, 2014 Filing 49 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #47 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary at this time. (Reference: 14-0354)(caa)
June 17, 2014 Filing 48 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memo Opp NHIC Supplemental Memorandum (Document 39). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-354)(Shields, James)
June 17, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit)(Reference: 14354)(Shields, James) Modified on 6/18/2014 (caa).
June 13, 2014 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re National Home Insurance Company's #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Sanctions, by National Home Insurance Company. Motion set for 6/25/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Part 1, #2 Memorandum in Support Part 2, #3 Exhibit A-1 and A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5 to A-7, #7 Exhibit A-8, #8 Exhibit A-9, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit B-1 to B-6, #11 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-354)(cbs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2014: #12 Exhibit B-8 to B-15) (cbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2014: #13 Exhibit B-7) (cbs).
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Enroll Attorney Michael David Lane as Additional Counsel of Record for National Home Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by National Home Insurance Company re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B). Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (Reference: 14-354, 14-449)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Filing 39 Supplemental Memorandum filed by National Home Insurance Company, in Support of #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B). Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (Reference: 14-354)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION for Sanctions, by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1 and A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5 and A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit B-1 to B-6, #10 Exhibit B-7, #11 Exhibit B-8 to B-12, #12 Exhibit C and D, #13 Exhibit E and F, #14 Exhibit G)(Reference: 14-449)(cbs)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (Reference: 14-449)(cbs)
June 10, 2014 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-354; 14-449)(Kern, Jay)
June 10, 2014 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B) by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Reference: 14-354; 14-449)(Kern, Jay)
June 9, 2014 Filing 33 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, #24 Amended Complaint by Willow Incorporated.(Reference: 14-354)(Starr, J.) Modified duplicate text on 6/10/2014 (mmm).
June 6, 2014 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B) by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit)(Reference: 14-354)(Clade, Susan)
June 5, 2014 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A-1 and A-2, #6 Exhibit A-3, #7 Exhibit A-4, #8 Exhibit A-5 and A-6, #9 Exhibit A-7, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit B-1 to B-6, #12 Exhibit B-7, #13 Exhibit B-8 to B-12, #14 Exhibit C and D, #15 Exhibit E and F, #16 Exhibit G)(Reference: 14-449)(Clade, Susan)
June 4, 2014 Filing 30 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Filing attorney should have selected 'Y' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to remove submission information and add 'Exparte'. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
June 3, 2014 Filing 29 EXPARTE MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit)(Reference: 14354)(Shields, James) Modified text on 6/4/2014 (mmm).
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - It having come to the Court's attention that C.A. 14-354, Keela Hawkins, et al vs. National Home Insurance Company, et al, is related to C.A. 14-449, Michael Cummings, et al. vs National Home Insurance Company, et al; accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the above matters are hereby consolidated. Pursuant to the court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/3/2014.(cbs)
June 3, 2014 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Willow Incorporated.Attorney J. William Starr added to party Willow Incorporated(pty:dft).(Starr, J.)
June 2, 2014 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to National Home Insurance Company, Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2)(blg)
June 2, 2014 Filing 24 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Arbitration Association, National Home Insurance Company, Willow Incorporated filed by All Plaintiffs.(blg)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/2/2014. (blg)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party American Arbitration Association dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/2/2014. (blg)
June 2, 2014 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party The American Arbitration Association by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shields, James) Modified text on 6/3/2014 (mmm).
May 29, 2014 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Sanctions by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Memorandum in Support Part 1, #4 Memorandum in Support Part 2, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit A1 and A-2, #7 Exhibit A-3, #8 Exhibit A-4, #9 Exhibit A-5 to A-7, #10 Exhibit A-8, #11 Exhibit A-9, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit B-1 to B-6, #14 Exhibit B-7, #15 Exhibit B-9 to B-15, #16 Notice of Submission)(Clade, Susan) Modified text/event on 5/30/2014 (plh).
May 13, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by National Home Insurance Company. Motion set for 6/11/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G-I, #7 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-449)(cbs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2014: #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K) (cbs).
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Continue Defendant National Home Insurance Company, A Risk Retention Group's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b). #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim reset for 6/11/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 5/12/2014.(mmm)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Continue Defendant AAA's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim reset for 6/11/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 5/12/2014.(mmm)
May 5, 2014 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Defendant National Home Insurance Company, A Risk Retention Group's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Shields, James) Modified text on 5/5/2014 (mmm).
May 5, 2014 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Defendant AAA's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Shields, James) Modified text on 5/5/2014 (mmm).
April 28, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b) by National Home Insurance Company. Motion set for 5/14/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Notice of Submission)(Caruso, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2014: #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G) (cbs).
April 23, 2014 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. Clerk modified docket text to remove submission information and add 'Exparte'.(mmm)
April 22, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Arbitration Association. Motion set for 5/14/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Michael David Kurtz added to party American Arbitration Association(pty:dft).(Kurtz, Michael)
April 22, 2014 Filing 12 EXPARTE MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shields, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2014: #9 Proposed Order) (mmm). Modified text on 4/23/2014 (mmm).
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 4/9/2014. (mmm)
April 2, 2014 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by National Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Susan Faye Clade added to party National Home Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Clade, Susan)
March 5, 2014 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to American Arbitration Association, National Home Insurance Company, Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mmm)
March 3, 2014 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Shields, James)
February 26, 2014 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENTS AND TRO AND TEMPORARY INJUNCTION against American Arbitration Association, National Home Insurance Company, Willow Incorporated filed by All Plaintiffs .(Shields, James) Modified text on 2/27/2014 (cml, ).
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Amend. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 2/18/2014.(mmm)
February 18, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Arbitration Association, National Home Insurance Company, Willow Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mmm)
February 18, 2014 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (mmv, )
February 17, 2014 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Shields, James) Modified text on 2/18/2014 (mmm).
February 17, 2014 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION File Proposed Order and Exhibits with Complaint for TRO by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Shields, James) Modified on 2/18/2014 (mmm). Modified text on 3/5/2014 (mmm).
February 14, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4345297) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James E. Shields, Sr added to party: All Plaintiffs(pty:pla).(Shields, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2014: #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1-2) (mmm). Modified text on 3/5/2014 (mmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins et al v. National Home Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Guy, Sr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Bordelon
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Allen, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Guerrier
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trichina Williams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L. Barnes
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Weber
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicki Garnier
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Coleman
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Synigal
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Myles
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Franco
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Roche
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thu Do
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wright
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delton Burris
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daysi Crespo
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carletta Brown
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August Johnson, III
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Prout
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Stansbury
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory P. Simoneaux
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelia Sentmore
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mosby
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhan H. Luong
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Houston
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Huyen Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dright
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phat Tran
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Stansbury
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Sapp
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. N. Murthy
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hang Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Walker
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kavita Mansukhani
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Terrel, III
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Brown, III
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kinberger
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishore Mansukhani
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Borne
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Escarment
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose D. Vasquez
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuen Tsang
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quoc Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Watler
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Le
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saed Abunaser
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anndrea LaSalle-Irons
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nirmila P. Mansinghani
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Sullivan
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Avant
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquetta Wright
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Myers
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pugh
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Barnes
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toya Baptiste
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Lee
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arshad Aziz Tahir
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Arbuthnot
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonji Skipper
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Davis
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Franco
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree J. Jones
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Moore
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherline Varmall
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Carter
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micanor Camille
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Quinn
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Williams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Quarles
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Tran
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Payne
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Poleate
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Robin, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle M. Polite
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandra Banks
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Taranto
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Payne, Sr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tham Do
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jackson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Le
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thiet Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vu Xuan Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lockwood
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kinberger
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Lee
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin A Joseph
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Jackson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jones
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Donald
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huda Khelik
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Narcisse
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelva Davis
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Bartholomew
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ngoc Huynh
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanda Camese
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anise Garnier
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigue Guerrier
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KiTami Parker Johnson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myeshia Conner
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Brocks
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Johnson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Thomas
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Guilford
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses A. Barnes
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Colar-Hughes
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Rogers
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Dupre, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Rendon
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquia Compass
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl Hatfield
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nliu Phuong Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B N Dao
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Lawrence
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celine Fang
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bich Ngo
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Hill
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Royer
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Royer
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica T. Cordier
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Smallwood
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keela Hawkins
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loc Xuan Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Poleate
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Beverly
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Amin
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Wyre
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hill
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Toni Chase
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Simms
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Hatfield
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Andry
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Wiley
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Varmall
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Brown
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kemp
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Thong
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendi Lagasse
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Skipper
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A. Bush
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie McGowane
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie S. Firstley
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherlyn Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Richardson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Collins
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Perez
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleavon Williams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Shirley
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Yost
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truong Xuan Dinh
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Irving
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Binh T. Dieu
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Michelle Walker
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hana Jabbar
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucces Sataille
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mendez
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linh Do
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Jefferson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochon Barthelemy
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Burris
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philpatrick Walker
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Morris
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Chambers
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Mitchell
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Abunaser
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Taranto
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetria Quinn
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Vu
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustave Moise
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy D. Banks
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oai Tu Tran
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Irving
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Walker
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catina Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Washington
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lawrence
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Dupre
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Schaefer
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Randle
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzpatrick S. Nedd
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darril Prout, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Arbuthnot
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Justo
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van May Le
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duke Novick
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmi Ng
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Termeka McGowane
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Meyers
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Perez
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Fisher
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodis Quarles
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Myers
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Prout
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellal A. Kattoum
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tung Phan
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soirile Pierre
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Yesnach, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Walker
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nghia Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Ochoa
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Sapp
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Myles
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stewart
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Sylvest
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candida Veras
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sholian Freeman
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwood Borne
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Thai
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Robin
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinh Chu
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pugh
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Keith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Weary
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Jenkins
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jihad S. Kattoum
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Donald
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Gaddis, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Sterling
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynelle Celestaine
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Richardson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Faulkner
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayda Escarment
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaNell Guilford
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Rolland
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Milazzo
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Mosby
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qlle Van Le
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Simms, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Andry
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebert Joachin
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba Rendon
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darah Jones
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ike Sterling
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damosthenis Modriaga
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalisa Synigal
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanelle Sullivan
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Barnes
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Adams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeBaron Fisher
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Bergeron
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Rolland
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahmal Tillman
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis M. Jones
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RaedOtham AbdelMgeed
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondalyn Beverly
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tung Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Coleman
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Crespo
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Barthelemy
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Barnes
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S. Harris
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentiss Martin
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trang Cao
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Cirfus
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoMarie Stewart
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdel Abdel
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twana Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Carter
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Morris
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinh X. Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Jones
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Darensburg
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Keys Britton
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asyecha Anderson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cummings
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toya Bordelon
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Irving
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Fletcher
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Smith, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jefferson
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon L. Smith
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Guy
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Sipp
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyalynseia Harrison
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Rodgers
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Nguyen
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence James
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Williams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Williams
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy Linh Le
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhona Dright
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Tillman
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Walker, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Poplin
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Harrison, III
Represented By: James E. Shields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Incorporated
Represented By: J. William Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglass F. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Jay Hirsch Kern
Represented By: Daniel J. Caruso
Represented By: Michael David Lane
Represented By: Susan Faye Clade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arbitration Association
Represented By: Matthew R. Emmons
Represented By: Michael David Kurtz
Represented By: Mark W. Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?