First Health Group Corp v. West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital
Defendant: Tracy Richardson, Michael Cavanaugh, Nosser Chiropractic Clinic, Lourdes P H O, Neurosurgery Center L L C, Joseph Turnipseed, Achievement Therapeutics, Shaine E Rider, HealthPro Wellness Center, A M D Center, St Tammany Hospital Foundation, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of Eunice Inc, Physical Therapy Associates, Gary Porubsky, Neck & Back Institute of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Eastman Chiropractic Clinic, Central Louisiana Anesthesia & Pain Management Centre, Teche Regional Medical Center, Kaplan Chiropractic Clinic, Acadiana Physicians Network, Surgicare of Lake Charles, Jihad Jila, Louis Blanda, Masse Chiropractic Clinic, Family Chiropractic Clinic, Natures Way Chiropractic Center, Robert Shackleton, West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital, James Knecht, Agilus Health Inc, Ortho Imaging, Carol Beutler, Lakewood Medical Center, John E Daigle, Opelousas Trust Authority, Chiropractic U S A, Kevin Gorin, Alexandria Chiropractic Clinic, Anthon Chiropractic Clinic, Preferred Therapy Providers, Neurosurgical Consultants L L C, Central Louisiana Ambulatory Surgical Center Inc, Acadiana P H O of Opelousas, Dauterive Hospital P H O, Commercial Chiropractic Center, Ponchartrain Bone & Joint, Bone & Joint Clinic of Marrero, John Brasswell, Musculoskeletal Institute of Louisiana, Lynn E Foret, Opelousas General Hospital Foundation Inc, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of New Iberia Inc, John Burdine, Shell Family Chiropractic Inc, P H C Morgan City L P, Scott Mills, Millervillage Chiropractic Center, Radiology Associates of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Daniel Wickiser, Physical Therapy Associates Inc, James Shoemaker, Neil Clinic L L C, Lake Charles Physician Hospital Organization, Bryant Chiropractic, Open Air M R I of N W Louisiana, Cardiac Thoracic & Vascular Surgery Inc, David Miller, Yoon Nofsinger, Damon Cormier, R A Boisvert, Pain Management, Premier Medical Rehab, R Dale Bernauer, Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic L L C, Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic, Opelousas Orthopaedic Clinic, Thomas Medical Group, Robert Kevin Mayo, St Tammany Parish Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Spine Diagnostic & Pain Treatment Center, Calcasieu Rehab & Sports Therapy L L C, Spine Diagnostic Center of Baton Rouge Inc, David Duhon, St Francis Medical Center Inc, Thomas Butaud, Radiology Specialists L L C, Malcolm Stubbs, C O L Management L L C and Louisiana Physical Therapy
Petitioner: First Health Group Corp
Case Number: 2:2008cv01630
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Clerk under LR41.3. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown. Signed by Pam Mitchell, Clerk's Office Staff Attorney, on 02/08/13. (crt,Yocum, M)
January 23, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to prosecute within 6 months. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss P H C Morgan City L P with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/20/11. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss St Francis Medical Center Inc and Lourdes P H O with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/20/11. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 18, 2011 Filing 36 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss P H C Morgan City L P by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Staub, Perry) Modified event and text on 10/19/2011 (Yocum, M).
October 18, 2011 Filing 35 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss St Francis Medical Center Inc and Lourdes P H O by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Staub, Perry) Modified event and text on 10/19/2011 (Yocum, M).
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Acadiana Physician's Network and Dauterive Hospital P H O with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/18/11. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 17, 2011 Filing 33 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Acadiana Physician's Network and Dauterive Hospital P H O by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Staub, Perry) Modified text on 10/17/2011 (Yocum, M).
June 17, 2010 Filing 32 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2010. Sent copy of Minutes signed this date to Judge Trimble. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 21, 2010 Filing 31 REQUEST by counsel to no longer receive notice and waiver of right to receive service of all documents in this case, including entry of final judgment under Fed.R.Civ.P 54(b) by Roland Virgil McKneely, III on behalf of Physical Therapy Associates Inc. Reason: no. (aty,McKneely, Roland)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Rule 16 Conference previously scheduled in this matter is continued. The Rule 16 conference will be held by telephone at 10:00 AM on Friday 6/11/2010 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 05/21/10. (crt,Nations, Sue)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: A Rule 16 conference will be held in this case on 6/9/2010 at 1:30 p.m. by telephone. Counsel for plaintiffs shall initiate the call to chambers. At least one attorney for each party shall participate in the conference. The attorney participating in the conference shall have authority to enter into stipulations and to make admissions regarding all matters involved in this litigation. ( Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 6/9/2010 01:30 PM in by phone before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/18/10. (crt,Kennedy, T)
April 19, 2010 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by P H C Morgan City L P incorrectly named as Lakewood Medical Center and Teche Regional Medical Center.(aty,Baudouin, Robert) Modified filer on 4/20/2010 (Yocum, M).
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of twenty days to file responsive pleadings to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 03/30/10. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
March 29, 2010 Filing 26 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Teche Regional Medical Center. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Rule 7.9 Certificate, #3 Text of proposed order)(aty,Baudouin, Robert)
March 17, 2010 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Health Group Corp. Calcasieu Rehab & Sports Therapy L L C served on 3/17/2010, answer due 4/7/2010. (aty,Staub, Perry)
March 17, 2010 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Health Group Corp. Preferred Therapy Providers served on 3/17/2010, answer due 4/7/2010. (aty,Staub, Perry)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #21 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss as to defendants Rehabilitation Medicine Services of Eunice, Inc., Rehabilitation Medicine Services of New Iberia, Inc., AMD Services, and Yoon Nofsinger in their entirety, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/11/10. (crt,Harrison, U)
March 10, 2010 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A M D Center, Acadiana P H O of Opelousas, Acadiana Physicians Network, Achievement Therapeutics, Agilus Health Inc, Alexandria Chiropractic Clinic, Anthon Chiropractic Clinic, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, R Dale Bernauer, Carol Beutler, Louis Blanda, R A Boisvert, Bone & Joint Clinic of Marrero, John Brasswell, Bryant Chiropractic, John Burdine, Thomas Butaud, C O L Management L L C, Calcasieu Rehab & Sports Therapy L L C, Cardiac Thoracic & Vascular Surgery Inc, Michael Cavanaugh, Central Louisiana Ambulatory Surgical Center Inc, Central Louisiana Anesthesia & Pain Management Centre, Chiropractic U S A, Commercial Chiropractic Center, Damon Cormier, John E Daigle, Dauterive Hospital P H O, David Duhon, Eastman Chiropractic Clinic, Family Chiropractic Clinic, Lynn E Foret, Kevin Gorin, HealthPro Wellness Center, Jihad Jila, Kaplan Chiropractic Clinic, James Knecht, Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic, Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic L L C, Lake Charles Physician Hospital Organization, Lakewood Medical Center, Louisiana Physical Therapy, Lourdes P H O, Masse Chiropractic Clinic, Robert Kevin Mayo, David Miller, Millervillage Chiropractic Center, Scott Mills, Musculoskeletal Institute of Louisiana, Natures Way Chiropractic Center, Neck & Back Institute of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Neil Clinic L L C, Neurosurgery Center L L C, Neurosurgical Consultants L L C, Yoon Nofsinger, Nosser Chiropractic Clinic, Opelousas General Hospital Foundation Inc, Opelousas Orthopaedic Clinic, Opelousas Trust Authority, Open Air M R I of N W Louisiana, Ortho Imaging, Pain Management, Physical Therapy Associates, Physical Therapy Associates Inc, Ponchartrain Bone & Joint, Gary Porubsky, Preferred Therapy Providers, Premier Medical Rehab, Radiology Associates of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Radiology Specialists L L C, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of Eunice Inc, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of New Iberia Inc, Tracy Richardson, Shaine E Rider, Robert Shackleton, Shell Family Chiropractic Inc, James Shoemaker, Spine Diagnostic & Pain Treatment Center, Spine Diagnostic Center of Baton Rouge Inc, St Francis Medical Center Inc, St Tammany Hospital Foundation, St Tammany Parish Hospital, Malcolm Stubbs, Surgicare of Lake Charles, Teche Regional Medical Center, Thomas Medical Group, Joseph Turnipseed, West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital, Daniel Wickiser (crt,Yocum, M)
March 10, 2010 Filing 21 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss defendants Rehabilitation Medicine Services of Eunice Inc, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of New Iberia Inc, Commercial Chiropractic Center, A M D Services, and Yoon Nofsinger by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Staub, Perry) Modified text to include defendant names to be dismissed on 3/10/2010 (Yocum, M).
March 10, 2010 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned by First Health Group Corp. (aty,Staub, Perry) Modified text to remove answer deadline and service executed on 3/10/2010. See Notice of Corrective Action issued 3/10/2010. (Yocum, M)
March 10, 2010 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned by First Health Group Corp. (aty,Staub, Perry) Modified text to remove answer deadline and service executed on 3/10/2010. See Notice of Corrective Action issued 3/10/2010. (Yocum, M)
March 10, 2010 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by First Health Group Corp. (aty,Staub, Perry)
March 10, 2010 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A M D Center, Acadiana P H O of Opelousas, Acadiana Physicians Network, Achievement Therapeutics, Agilus Health Inc, Alexandria Chiropractic Clinic, Anthon Chiropractic Clinic, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, R Dale Bernauer, Carol Beutler, Louis Blanda, R A Boisvert, Bone & Joint Clinic of Marrero, John Brasswell, Bryant Chiropractic, John Burdine, Thomas Butaud, C O L Management L L C, Calcasieu Rehab & Sports Therapy L L C, Cardiac Thoracic & Vascular Surgery Inc, Michael Cavanaugh, Central Louisiana Ambulatory Surgical Center Inc, Central Louisiana Anesthesia & Pain Management Centre, Chiropractic U S A, Commercial Chiropractic Center, Damon Cormier, John E Daigle, Dauterive Hospital P H O, David Duhon, Eastman Chiropractic Clinic, Family Chiropractic Clinic, Lynn E Foret, Kevin Gorin, HealthPro Wellness Center, Jihad Jila, Kaplan Chiropractic Clinic, James Knecht, Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic, Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic L L C, Lake Charles Physician Hospital Organization, Lakewood Medical Center, Louisiana Physical Therapy, Lourdes P H O, Masse Chiropractic Clinic, Robert Kevin Mayo, David Miller, Millervillage Chiropractic Center, Scott Mills, Musculoskeletal Institute of Louisiana, Natures Way Chiropractic Center, Neck & Back Institute of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Neil Clinic L L C, Neurosurgery Center L L C, Neurosurgical Consultants L L C, Yoon Nofsinger, Nosser Chiropractic Clinic, Opelousas General Hospital Foundation Inc, Opelousas Orthopaedic Clinic, Opelousas Trust Authority, Open Air M R I of N W Louisiana, Ortho Imaging, Pain Management, Physical Therapy Associates, Physical Therapy Associates Inc, Ponchartrain Bone & Joint, Gary Porubsky, Preferred Therapy Providers, Premier Medical Rehab, Radiology Associates of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Radiology Specialists L L C, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of Eunice Inc, Rehabilitation Medicine Services of New Iberia Inc, Tracy Richardson, Shaine E Rider, Robert Shackleton, Shell Family Chiropractic Inc, James Shoemaker, Spine Diagnostic & Pain Treatment Center, Spine Diagnostic Center of Baton Rouge Inc, St Francis Medical Center Inc, St Tammany Hospital Foundation, St Tammany Parish Hospital, Malcolm Stubbs, Surgicare of Lake Charles, Teche Regional Medical Center, Thomas Medical Group, Joseph Turnipseed, West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital, Daniel Wickiser, requested by First Health Group Corp. (aty,Staub, Perry)
March 10, 2010 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Perry R Staub on behalf of First Health Group Corp regarding #19 Summons Returned Executed and #20 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: summons' were not signed and sealed by the Court; therefore, service of the complaint is not considered properly executed. SEE RULE 4 of the FRCP. The answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,Yocum, M)
February 23, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss for Failure to effect service within 120 days. (crt,Yocum, M)
December 16, 2009 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY REASSIGNING CASE: At the direction of Chief Judge Robert G James, the above-captioned and numbered case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Magistrate Judge Methvin E Methvin is no longer assigned to case. All pending deadlines and/or hearings are hereby adopted and remain in effect. All future filings should bear the name of the newly assigned Judge. Signed by Tony R Moore, Clerk on 12/16/09. (crt,Williams, L)
November 9, 2009 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lourdes P H O, St Francis Medical Center Inc identifying Corporate Parent Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System Inc for Lourdes P H O, St Francis Medical Center Inc. (aty,Kaiser, F)
November 2, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to F Scott Kaiser on behalf of Lourdes P H O and St Francis Medical Center Inc. (crt,Yocum, M)
November 2, 2009 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lourdes P H O, St Francis Medical Center Inc.(aty,Kaiser, F)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss claims against Physical Therapy Associates Inc without prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 04/02/09. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 1, 2009 Filing 11 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Physical Therapy Associates Inc by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Staub, Perry) Modified text on 4/1/2009 (Yocum, M).
March 27, 2009 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Physical Therapy Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(aty,McKneely, Roland)
March 27, 2009 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Physical Therapy Associates Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. No pdf image attached. Corporate Disclosure Statement attached to #10 Answer to Complaint (attachment #1)(crt,Yocum, M)
March 18, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency to Physical Therapy Associates Inc regarding #8 Answer to Complaint. Reason: An individual has signed on behalf of a corporation. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 18, 2009 REMARK: A copy of the Notice of Deficiency and a copy of the deficient document has been mailed to Janet S Hoppe at the address listed on the deficient documents filed March 17, 2009. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 17, 2009 Filing 8 DEFICIENT ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Physical Therapy Associates Inc.(crt,Yocum, M) Modified to remove "?" text on 3/27/2009. Answer signed by attorney electronically filed as Doc No #10 (Yocum, M).
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to #1 Complaint. Responsive pleading due 30 days from the date that Counsel for Plaintiffs informs Counsel for Defendants that all Defendants have been served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mildred E Methvin on 03/06/09. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 5, 2009 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Responsive Pleadings with consent by Lake Charles Physician Hospital Organization, Masse Chiropractic Clinic, Natures Way Chiropractic Center, Neurosurgery Center L L C, Radiology Specialists L L C, Nosser Chiropractic Clinic, Achievement Therapeutics, Carol Beutler, Louis Blanda, Michael Cavanaugh, James Knecht, Shaine E Rider, James Shoemaker, Damon Cormier, Spine Diagnostic & Pain Treatment Center, West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital, Radiology Associates of Southwest Louisiana Inc, Opelousas Orthopaedic Clinic, Cardiac Thoracic & Vascular Surgery Inc, C O L Management L L C, Chiropractic U S A, Opelousas General Hospital Foundation Inc, Millervillage Chiropractic Center, A M D Center, Malcolm Stubbs. Motions referred to Mildred E Methvin. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Bradford, John) Modified event and text on 3/5/2009 (Yocum, M).
March 4, 2009 Filing 5 JUDGMENT granting #3 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss St. Tammany Hospital Foundation without prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/04/09. (crt,Harrison, U)
March 3, 2009 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by First Health Group Corp re #3 Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary. (aty,Staub, Perry)
March 3, 2009 Filing 3 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss St. Tammany Hospital Foundation Without Prejudice by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Incomplete pdf image of Text of proposed order) See Document No #4 for Proposed Order (aty,Staub, Perry) Modified to indicate incomplete pdf image of proposed order on 3/3/2009 (Yocum, M).
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr. Judge Tucker L Melancon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 11/04/08. (crt,Yocum, M)
October 30, 2008 REMARK: Attorney Staub is aware of the fact that some defendants that are named in the case caption are not named in the body of the complaint and some defendants that are named in the body of the complaint are not named in the case caption. (crt,Dean, S)
October 30, 2008 Judge Tucker L Melancon and Magistrate Judge Mildred E Methvin added. (crt,Dean, S)
October 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $350, receipt number 05360000000000946336) filed by First Health Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Staub, Perry) Modified on 11/4/2008 to change who the complaint is against (Dean, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Health Group Corp v. West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cavanaugh
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nosser Chiropractic Clinic
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes P H O
Represented By: F Scott Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurosurgery Center L L C
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Turnipseed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Achievement Therapeutics
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaine E Rider
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthPro Wellness Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A M D Center
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Tammany Hospital Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehabilitation Medicine Services of Eunice Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physical Therapy Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Porubsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neck & Back Institute of Southwest Louisiana Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Chiropractic Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Louisiana Anesthesia & Pain Management Centre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teche Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert I Baudouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan Chiropractic Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadiana Physicians Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgicare of Lake Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jihad Jila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Blanda
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masse Chiropractic Clinic
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Chiropractic Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natures Way Chiropractic Center
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shackleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Calcasieu Cameron Hospital
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Knecht
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilus Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho Imaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Beutler
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Medical Center
Represented By: Robert I Baudouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opelousas Trust Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiropractic U S A
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Gorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Chiropractic Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthon Chiropractic Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Therapy Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurosurgical Consultants L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Louisiana Ambulatory Surgical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadiana P H O of Opelousas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauterive Hospital P H O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Chiropractic Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponchartrain Bone & Joint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bone & Joint Clinic of Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brasswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Musculoskeletal Institute of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn E Foret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opelousas General Hospital Foundation Inc
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehabilitation Medicine Services of New Iberia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burdine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Family Chiropractic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P H C Morgan City L P
Represented By: Robert I Baudouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millervillage Chiropractic Center
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Associates of Southwest Louisiana Inc
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wickiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physical Therapy Associates Inc
Represented By: Roland Virgil McKneely, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Shoemaker
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Clinic L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Charles Physician Hospital Organization
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Chiropractic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Air M R I of N W Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardiac Thoracic & Vascular Surgery Inc
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoon Nofsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Cormier
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R A Boisvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Medical Rehab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Dale Bernauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Charles Medical & Surgical Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opelousas Orthopaedic Clinic
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kevin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Tammany Parish Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baton Rouge General Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spine Diagnostic & Pain Treatment Center
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calcasieu Rehab & Sports Therapy L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spine Diagnostic Center of Baton Rouge Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Duhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Francis Medical Center Inc
Represented By: F Scott Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Butaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Specialists L L C
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Stubbs
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C O L Management L L C
Represented By: John S Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Physical Therapy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: First Health Group Corp
Represented By: Perry R Staub, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?