White et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Co
Plaintiff: Jody White, Gregory W Albert, Patricia Albert, Patricia B Albert, Wanda M Allen, Joselyn Thibodeaux-Anderson, John Ardoin, Susaimanickam Justin Arcokiasamy, St Ann Catholic Church, Holy Family Catholic Church, James Ashley, Sr, Bernice Auzenne, Theresa Ann Auzenne, Demetric Thomas, Kali Babino, Rachel Babino, Clara Batiste, Tamika Batiste, Kennedie Batiste, Shane Beard, Alexis J Beard, Harley A Beard, Shaina Beard, Olan Beinvenue, Austin Bell, III, Breanna C Bell, Kelly J Ned, David Bellard, Mary C Bellard, Clayton J Bias, Courtney Bias, Diana Bias, Julian Bias, Ronald Q Bias, Ronald Bias, Lawrence Bias, Lougenia Bias, Bridgette A Thomas-Bell, Randy Bias, Tonya Bias, Jerry Bourque, Priscilla Ann Boutte, Lorita Brisco, Alice Brooks, Danielle Brown, Eddie Brown, Arianna C Brown, Christopher Lee Brown, Eddie Desmond Brown, Jr, Elvera Brown, Ronald Brown, Martin Brown, Brenda C Carmouche, Ruby Carroll, Dexter Ceaser, Marie Chautin, Amanda Citizen, Ariana Fontenot, James C Citizen, Leroy Citizen, Wilson Citizen, O'non Coleman, Courtney Colomb, Lauren Lazare, Edward Colomb, Kaleel Colomb, Myles Colomb, Laila Charlot, Natacha Colomb, Patricia Colomb, Amos Patrick Cravins, III, Donald R Cravins, Sr, Dustin Cravins, John Credeur, Norma Cretian, Juneice Delores Cuny, Colton A Cuny, Jessica Darbonne, Joyce Darbonne, Randall Darbonne, Shawn Darbonne, Sherril F Darbonne, Sierra Darbonne, Lyla Darbonne, James W Davidson, Tabitha Davidson, Alvin Christopher Declouette, Chris Declouette, Alvin Declouette, Laura Declouette, Armand Declouette, Jr, Martha Denton, Michelle DePrimo, Lionel Derousseau, Feroel Derousseau, Ariana Derousseau, Lionel Derousseau, Jr, Shannon Harden Derousseau, John Deville, Julie Doucet, Glenda J Duplechain, Bonnie Dupre, Elvin Dupre, Jr, Hilma Dupre, Inola Dupre, John K Durosseau, Odelia Durosseau, Howard Joseph Espree, Jr, Katherine Kaye Espree, Alyssa Kaye Espree, John Fernandez, Ezabell Fernandez, Lena May Fernandez, Albertha G Fontenot, Coral Fontenot, Dianne Fontenot, Darryl Fontenot, Hilda Fontenot, Lucille Joubert Fontenot, Ryan Fontenot, Ariel Frank, Jevin Allen Frank, Kenneth Frank, Lionel Frank, Jr, Vertina R Frank, Elta M Gallien, Sterling Gallien, Rita Gallow, Ashley Gobert, David Gobert, Lundyn Gobert, James Rogers Gobert, Sandra Ann Gobert, Diamond Rochelle Jordan, Emerald Mone' Jordan, Crystal Goodly, Joycelyn Goodly, Keshanna Grier, Diante Grier, Alycia Grier, Kylin Harris, Olivia Guidry, Leo Guilbeau, Alenna Guillory, Alisha M Guillory, Jayden Patrick Ledet, Alonzo James Guillory, Antoinette Guillory, Cassey Guillory, Catren Guillory, Cinderella Guillory, Annelisa Guillory, Claudia Guillory, LaNeisha Guillory, Eldine Mary Guillory, Hubert Guillory, Jared Demarcus Guillory, Julian Ray Guillory, Peter Guillory, Katherine Guillory, Kenyon Guillory, Macey Guillory, Manella A Guillory, Marla Guillory, Wilfred Citizen, Mary J Guillory, Mary Melissa Guillory, Megan D Guillory, Jayden Sonnier, Jaxton Sonnier, Michael J Guillory, Myron Guillory, Norma Jean Guillory, Paul R Guillory, Raymond Guillory, Jr, Ashley Guillory, Amessia Guillory, Rhonda R Guillory, Deonte Blair, Tyler Price, Kierston Hinds, Richard J Guillory, Ronda Guillory, Ruby Guillory, Shirley Ann Citizen Guillory, Shirley A Citizen-Guillory, Deondre Guillory, Shirley Marie Guillory, Stanley Guillory, Tara Guillory, Camron Guillory, Wilda M Guillory, Zoway Guillory, Lurdy Henry, Dorothy Hicks, Darryl Hinds, John L Hubbard, Steven B Hubbard, Bella Innocent, Priscilla M James, Earvin Jenkins, Christine Johnson, Charles A Jones, Nell R Jones, Shirley Jones, Tonya T Jones, April Allison, Ulacia Allison, Wilbert Jones, Jr, Dolores M Jordan, Earl J Jordan, Jonathan J Jordan, Karl Jordan, Kelbe Jordan, Richard Joubert, Wilfred Kennerson, Jr, Jane Ladoux, Cody Ladoux, Kaylep Ladoux, Chuck Ladoux, Danielle B Langley, Gregory K Langley, II, Gregory K Langley, Scarlett Rose Langley, Dayton Lee Langley, James E Lastrapes, Mary Nell Lastrapes, Joseph M Lavergne, Karen Kaye Lavergne, Priscilla A Lavergne, Gwen E LeBlanc, Kim LeBlanc, Raymond LeBlanc, James M LeBlanc, Virgie S LeBlanc, Eddie LeCompte, Travis Leday, Fleming LeDee, Jr, Angela M Lemon, Burley James Lemon, Debbie Lopushansky, John Lopushansky, Elaine B Mayeux, Jonathan Mayeux, Terrell A Mayeux, Christopher Mazzurco, Arielle Mazzurco, Brandon Miller, Clarissa Miller, Brielle Celestine, Courtney Miller, Justin Chavis, Jayden Chavis, Deanna Miller, Randy T Noel, Brandon P Noel, Dustin Miller, N D Miller L L C, Keith Miller, Melinda Miller, Colin Hardison, Caiden Bellard, Michael W Miller, Nazie Dean Miller, Patricia Miller, Gary Miller, Travis K Miller, Christina Morman, Douglas Kelly, II, Dustyn Morman, Luis Negron, Luis Negron, Jr, Albert D Olivier, Albert J Olivier, Andrew Casey Olivier, James Kenneth Olivier, Judie G Olivier, Lester Owens, Bernella Papillion, Debra Papillion, Hilton Papillion, John D Papillion, Joseph F Papillion, Norma Papillion, Casey Patterson, Ruby Pete, Steven Pete, Florence Pierite, Terry Pitre, Mitchell Portier, Jr, Effie Rene, Norman Rene, Ann R Richard, Joseph L Richard, Kermon J Richard, Jr, Khristopher J Richard, Michelle Richard, Nadine Dezil-Richard, Franklin Richard, Robert P Richard, Samatha Richard, Harmony Richard, Hartlec Richard, Haylec Richard, Sharon Richard, Theresa Richard, Vanessa M Richard, Willie Mae Richard, Reita Riggs, Woodrow Riggs, Sandie Roan, Avery Roan, Alyssa Roan, Alana Roan, Eula Mae Roberts, Grace Roy, Nichole Ryder, Alfred J Sam, Miranda Sam, Alfred K Sam, Brandley R Sam, Candace R Sam, Taylor Jones, Chase Sam, Felicia LeBlanc Sam, James Sam, Larry B Sam, Larry J Sam, Linda Sam, Kendall Sam, Michael Sam, Ranal Sam, Tamie Sam, Terry D Sam, Wilma Sam, Gabrielle Semien, Gilford H Semien, Jr, Jennifer Semien, Matthew Semien, Albert Simien, Robert Simien, Eddie Simmons, Gertrude Simmons, Lourie Singleton, Anthony Smith, Christopher S Smith, Sr, Frankie Olivier Smith, Adam Smith, Angela M Sonnier, Jeremy Sonnier, Theresa Sonnier, Brenda Sonnier-Thibeaux, Joevocus St Andre, Laura D St Andre, Lucille St Andre, Anthony Standberry, Johnathan Standberry, Joseph C Standberry, Linda Standberry, Claudia Stelly, Mildred G Tate, Alex Taylor, Odell Thibodeaux, William G Thibodeaux, Denzel M Thomas, Milton Tyler, Clara C Tyler, Susie Ann Bradley-Vallaire, Walter Vallaire, John Vallian, Joseph Vallian, Leah Vallian, Sharon Patterson-Vallian, Veronica Vallian, John Victorian, Sr, Joshua Vidrine and Johnathan Castille
Case Number: 6:2014cv02536
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Landry
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2014 Filing 23 RECEIPT of Record received by Clerk, 27th JDC, St Landry Parish. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 13, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 27th Judicial District Court. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; denying #11 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/12/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 7, 2014 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY: re ORAL ARGUMENT #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees is hereby CANCELED.. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/7/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
October 14, 2014 Filing 19 AMENDED MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER held on 10/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: IT IS ORDERED that: Deadline for filing briefs on class certification is 11/14/2014. Deadline for filing opposition to the class certification briefs is 12/5/2014. Deadline for filing any reply briefs, limited to 10 pages, is 12/19/2014. The hearing on the Class Certification issue remains on 1/6/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Two days are reserved for the hearing. (crt,GregorySld, C)
October 14, 2014 Filing 18 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER held on 10/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: IT IS ORDERED that: Deadline for filing briefs on class certification is 11/14/2014. Deadline for filing opposition to the class certification briefs is 12/5/2014. Deadline for filing any reply briefs, limited to 10 pages, is 12/19/2014. The hearing on the Class Certification issue remains on 1/6/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Two days are reserved for the hearing. (crt,GregorySld, C)
October 10, 2014 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Union Pacific Railroad Co. (aty,Carlisle, Laura)
October 8, 2014 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 10/14/2014 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 10/8/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
September 22, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. Motion day set for 11/13/2014 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 22, 2014 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Union Pacific Railroad Co . (aty,Allison, Alissa)
September 22, 2014 Filing 13 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Table of Contents and Table of Authority filed by All Plaintiffs regarding #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees . (aty,Trosclair, Frank)
September 19, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency to Frank P Trosclair, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs regarding #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 19, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gregory W Albert, Patricia Albert, Patricia B Albert, Wanda M Allen, April Allison, Ulacia Allison, Susaimanickam Justin Arcokiasamy, John Ardoin, James Ashley, Sr, Bernice Auzenne, Theresa Ann Auzenne, Kali Babino, Rachel Babino, Clara Batiste, Kennedie Batiste, Tamika Batiste, Harley A Beard, Shane Beard, Alexis J Beard, Shaina Beard, Olan Beinvenue, Austin Bell, III, Breanna C Bell, Caiden Bellard, David Bellard, Mary C Bellard, Courtney Bias, Julian Bias, Lawrence Bias, Lougenia Bias, Randy Bias, Ronald Q Bias, Tonya Bias, Clayton J Bias, Diana Bias, Deonte Blair, Jerry Bourque, Priscilla Ann Boutte, Susie Ann Bradley-Vallaire, Lorita Brisco, Alice Brooks, Arianna C Brown, Eddie Desmond Brown, Jr, Christopher Lee Brown, Danielle Brown, Eddie Brown, Elvera Brown, Martin Brown, Ronald Brown, Brenda C Carmouche, Ruby Carroll, Johnathan Castille, Dexter Ceaser, Brielle Celestine, Laila Charlot, Marie Chautin, Jayden Chavis, Justin Chavis, Leroy Citizen, Amanda Citizen, James C Citizen, Wilfred Citizen, Wilson Citizen, Shirley A Citizen-Guillory, O'non Coleman, Kaleel Colomb, Myles Colomb, Patricia Colomb, Courtney Colomb, Edward Colomb, Natacha Colomb, Amos Patrick Cravins, III, Donald R Cravins, Sr, Dustin Cravins, John Credeur, Norma Cretian, Colton A Cuny, Juneice Delores Cuny, Jessica Darbonne, Joyce Darbonne, Lyla Darbonne, Randall Darbonne, Shawn Darbonne, Sherril F Darbonne, Sierra Darbonne, James W Davidson, Tabitha Davidson, Michelle DePrimo, Alvin Declouette, Armand Declouette, Jr, Chris Declouette, Laura Declouette, Martha Denton, Ariana Derousseau, Feroel Derousseau, Lionel Derousseau, Jr, Lionel Derousseau, Shannon Harden Derousseau, John Deville, Nadine Dezil-Richard, Julie Doucet, Glenda J Duplechain, Bonnie Dupre, Elvin Dupre, Jr, Hilma Dupre, Inola Dupre, John K Durosseau, Odelia Durosseau, Alyssa Kaye Espree, Howard Joseph Espree, Jr, Katherine Kaye Espree, Ezabell Fernandez, John Fernandez, Lena May Fernandez, Coral Fontenot, Darryl Fontenot, Dianne Fontenot, Hilda Fontenot, Lucille Joubert Fontenot, Ryan Fontenot, Albertha G Fontenot, Ariana Fontenot, Ariel Frank, Kenneth Frank, Lionel Frank, Jr, Vertina R Frank, Jevin Allen Frank, Elta M Gallien, Sterling Gallien, Rita Gallow, Ashley Gobert, David Gobert, James Rogers Gobert, Lundyn Gobert, Sandra Ann Gobert, Crystal Goodly, Joycelyn Goodly, Alycia Grier, Diante Grier, Keshanna Grier, Olivia Guidry, Karoline Guidry, Leo Guilbeau, Alenna Guillory, Alisha M Guillory, Alonzo James Guillory, Amessia Guillory, Annelisa Guillory, Antoinette Guillory, Ashley Guillory, Camron Guillory, Cassey Guillory, Catren Guillory, Cinderella Guillory, Claudia Guillory, Deondre Guillory, Eldine Mary Guillory, Hubert Guillory, Jared Demarcus Guillory, Julian Ray Guillory, Katherine Guillory, Kenyon Guillory, LaNeisha Guillory, Macey Guillory, Manella A Guillory, Marla Guillory, Mary Melissa Guillory, Mary J Guillory, Megan D Guillory, Michael J Guillory, Myron Guillory, Norma Jean Guillory, Paul R Guillory, Peter Guillory, Raymond Guillory, Jr, Raymond Guillory, Jr(as natural tutor & ), Rhonda R Guillory, Richard J Guillory, Ronda Guillory, Ruby Guillory, Shirley Ann Citizen Guillory, Shirley Marie Guillory, Stanley Guillory, Tara Guillory, Wilda M Guillory, Zoway Guillory, Colin Hardison, Kylin Harris, Lurdy Henry, Dorothy Hicks, Darryl Hinds, Kierston Hinds, Holy Family Catholic Church, John L Hubbard, Steven B Hubbard, Bella Innocent, Priscilla M James, Earvin Jenkins, Christine Johnson, Wilbert Jones, Jr, Charles A Jones, Nell R Jones, Shirley Jones, Taylor Jones, Tonya T Jones, Diamond Rochelle Jordan, Dolores M Jordan, Earl J Jordan, Emerald Mone' Jordan, Jonathan J Jordan, Karl Jordan, Kelbe Jordan, Richard Joubert, Douglas Kelly, II, Wilfred Kennerson, Jr, Chuck Ladoux, Jane Ladoux, Cody Ladoux, Kaylep Ladoux, Danielle B Langley, Dayton Lee Langley, Gregory K Langley, II, Gregory K Langley, Scarlett Rose Langley, James E Lastrapes, Mary Nell Lastrapes, Joseph M Lavergne, Karen Kaye Lavergne, Priscilla A Lavergne, Lauren Lazare, Gwen E LeBlanc, James M LeBlanc, Kim LeBlanc, Raymond LeBlanc, Virgie S LeBlanc, Eddie LeCompte, Fleming LeDee, Jr, Travis Leday, Jayden Patrick Ledet, Angela M Lemon, Burley James Lemon, Debbie Lopushansky, John Lopushansky, Elaine B Mayeux, Jonathan Mayeux, Terrell A Mayeux, Arielle Mazzurco, Christopher Mazzurco, Brandon Miller, Clarissa Miller, Courtney Miller, Deanna Miller, Gary Miller, Michael W Miller, Nazie Dean Miller, Patricia Miller, Travis K Miller, Dustin Miller, Keith Miller, Melinda Miller, Christina Morman, Dustyn Morman, N D Miller L L C, Kelly J Ned, Luis Negron, Jr, Luis Negron, Brandon P Noel, Randy T Noel, Albert D Olivier, Albert J Olivier, Andrew Casey Olivier, James Kenneth Olivier, Judie G Olivier, Lester Owens, Bernella Papillion, Debra Papillion, Hilton Papillion, John D Papillion, Joseph F Papillion, Norma Papillion, Casey Patterson, Sharon Patterson-Vallian, Ruby Pete, Steven Pete, Florence Pierite, Terry Pitre, Mitchell Portier, Jr, Tyler Price, Effie Rene, Norman Rene, Hartlec Richard, Haylec Richard, Kermon J Richard, Jr, Khristopher J Richard, Michelle Richard, Robert P Richard, Samatha Richard, Sharon Richard, Theresa Richard, Vanessa M Richard, Willie Mae Richard, Ann R Richard, Franklin Richard, Harmony Richard, Joseph L Richard, Reita Riggs, Woodrow Riggs, Alana Roan, Alyssa Roan, Avery Roan, Sandie Roan, Eula Mae Roberts, Grace Roy, Nichole Ryder, Felicia LeBlanc Sam, Miranda Sam, Alfred J Sam, Alfred K Sam, Brandley R Sam, Candace R Sam, Chase Sam, James Sam, Kendall Sam, Larry B Sam, Larry J Sam, Linda Sam, Michael Sam, Ranal Sam, Tamie Sam, Terry D Sam, Wilma Sam, Gabrielle Semien, Gilford H Semien, Jr, Jennifer Semien, Matthew Semien, Albert Simien, Robert Simien, Eddie Simmons, Gertrude Simmons, Lourie Singleton, Christopher S Smith, Sr, Frankie Olivier Smith, Adam Smith, Anthony Smith, Angela M Sonnier, Jaxton Sonnier, Jayden Sonnier, Jeremy Sonnier, Theresa Sonnier, Brenda Sonnier-Thibeaux, Joevocus St Andre, Laura D St Andre, Lucille St Andre, St Ann Catholic Church, Anthony Standberry, Johnathan Standberry, Joseph C Standberry, Linda Standberry, Claudia Stelly, Mildred G Tate, Alex Taylor, Odell Thibodeaux, William G Thibodeaux, Joselyn Thibodeaux-Anderson, Demetric Thomas(as survivor of & ), Demetric Thomas(as natural tutor & ), Denzel M Thomas, Bridgette A Thomas-Bell, Brigette Thomas-Bell, Clara C Tyler, Milton Tyler, Walter Vallaire, John Vallian, Joseph Vallian, Leah Vallian, Veronica Vallian, John Victorian, Sr, Joshua Vidrine, Mary Herbie T Vidrine, Carolyn S Walls, Jerry Walls, Geraldine R White, Jody White, Jordan White, Mary Margaret White, Stephanie White, Darrion B Williams, Kameron Cy Williams, Kim W Williams, Ruby D Wiltz, Wilbert Wiltz, Mary Ann Portier Woodard, Darren Zachary. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Stipulation)(aty,Trosclair, Frank) Modified on 9/19/2014 to edit text and reflect deficient status (Dauterive, C). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 9/19/2014 (Dauterive, C). Modified on 9/22/2014 to remove deficient status; see #13 Corrective Document/Table of Contents and Table of Authority (Dauterive, C).
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER : Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 10/14/2014 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 9/5/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
September 5, 2014 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #9 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Action taken: Corrected and Replaced pdf document; re-noticed to all counsel of record. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roy L Bergeron, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 9/5/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/8/2014) (Dauterive, C).
September 5, 2014 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Co.(aty,Allison, Alissa)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/4/2014. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 2, 2014 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Pacific Railroad Co identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corp for Union Pacific Railroad Co. (aty,Allison, Alissa) Modified on 9/3/2014 to add Corporate Parent/Other Affiliates Southern Pacific Rail Corp, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Union Pacific Railroad Co and Missouri Pacific Railroad Co (Dauterive, C).
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard T Haik, Sr. Judge Rebecca F Doherty no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/1/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 27, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Roy Bergeron as Attorney by Union Pacific Railroad Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Levine, Steven)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/21/2014. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 21, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Alissa J Allison, Kathlyn G Perez, Laura E Carlisle, Steven Jay Levine, John B Shortess, Roy L Bergeron, Jr, Elena Arcos Pecoraro, Tony M Clayton, William H Howard, III on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/4/2014. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 21, 2014 CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 20, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC, St. Landry Parish, Case Number 14-C-3470-D (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2597139) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney William H Howard, III added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company (pty:dft), Attorney William H Howard, III added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company (pty:dft))(aty,Howard, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody White
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory W Albert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Albert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia B Albert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda M Allen
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joselyn Thibodeaux-Anderson
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ardoin
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susaimanickam Justin Arcokiasamy
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Ann Catholic Church
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holy Family Catholic Church
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ashley, Sr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Auzenne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Ann Auzenne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetric Thomas
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kali Babino
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Babino
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Batiste
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamika Batiste
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedie Batiste
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Beard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis J Beard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley A Beard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaina Beard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olan Beinvenue
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Bell, III
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna C Bell
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly J Ned
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bellard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary C Bellard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton J Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Q Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lougenia Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette A Thomas-Bell
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Bias
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Bourque
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Ann Boutte
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorita Brisco
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Brooks
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianna C Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Desmond Brown, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvera Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Brown
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda C Carmouche
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Carroll
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Ceaser
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Chautin
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Citizen
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Citizen
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Citizen
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Citizen
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'non Coleman
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Colomb
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Lazare
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Colomb
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleel Colomb
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myles Colomb
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila Charlot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natacha Colomb
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Colomb
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Patrick Cravins, III
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Cravins, Sr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Cravins
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Credeur
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Cretian
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juneice Delores Cuny
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton A Cuny
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherril F Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyla Darbonne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Davidson
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Davidson
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Christopher Declouette
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Declouette
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Declouette
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Declouette
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armand Declouette, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Denton
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle DePrimo
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Derousseau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feroel Derousseau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Derousseau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Derousseau, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Harden Derousseau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Deville
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Doucet
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda J Duplechain
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Dupre
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Dupre, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilma Dupre
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inola Dupre
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K Durosseau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odelia Durosseau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Joseph Espree, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Kaye Espree
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Kaye Espree
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fernandez
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezabell Fernandez
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena May Fernandez
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertha G Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Joubert Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Fontenot
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Frank
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jevin Allen Frank
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Frank
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Frank, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertina R Frank
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elta M Gallien
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Gallien
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Gallow
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Gobert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gobert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lundyn Gobert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rogers Gobert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ann Gobert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Rochelle Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerald Mone' Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Goodly
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joycelyn Goodly
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshanna Grier
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diante Grier
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alycia Grier
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylin Harris
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Guidry
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Guilbeau
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alenna Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha M Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayden Patrick Ledet
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo James Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassey Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catren Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinderella Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annelisa Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaNeisha Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldine Mary Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Demarcus Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Ray Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyon Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macey Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manella A Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Citizen
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary J Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Melissa Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan D Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayden Sonnier
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaxton Sonnier
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Jean Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Guillory, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amessia Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda R Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deonte Blair
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Price
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kierston Hinds
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Ann Citizen Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A Citizen-Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deondre Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Marie Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camron Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilda M Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoway Guillory
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lurdy Henry
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hicks
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Hinds
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Hubbard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven B Hubbard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella Innocent
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla M James
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earvin Jenkins
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Johnson
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Jones
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nell R Jones
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Jones
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya T Jones
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Allison
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulacia Allison
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Jones, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores M Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl J Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan J Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelbe Jordan
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Joubert
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Kennerson, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Ladoux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Ladoux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylep Ladoux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Ladoux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle B Langley
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K Langley, II
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K Langley
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlett Rose Langley
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayton Lee Langley
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Lastrapes
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Nell Lastrapes
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Lavergne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Kaye Lavergne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla A Lavergne
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen E LeBlanc
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim LeBlanc
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond LeBlanc
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M LeBlanc
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgie S LeBlanc
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie LeCompte
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Leday
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleming LeDee, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M Lemon
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burley James Lemon
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Lopushansky
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lopushansky
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine B Mayeux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mayeux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell A Mayeux
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mazzurco
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arielle Mazzurco
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brielle Celestine
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Chavis
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayden Chavis
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy T Noel
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon P Noel
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N D Miller L L C
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Hardison
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caiden Bellard
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazie Dean Miller
Represented By: Charles Thaddeus Cravins
Represented By: Frank P Trosclair, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |