Louisiana et al v.Centers for Disease Control & Prevention et al
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana, State of Arizona, State of Missouri, State of West Virginia, State of South Carolina, State of Florida, State of Mississippi, State of Wyoming, State of Georgia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Utah, State of Tennessee, State of Ohio, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Kansas, State of North Dakota, State of Texas and Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Rochelle Walensky, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, U S Border Patrol, Raul Ortiz, U S Dept of Justice, Merrick Garland, Executive Off of Immigration, David Neal, Joseph R Biden, Jr and USA
Amicus Curiae: Jodey C Arrington, Brian Babin, Jim Banks, Andy Biggs, Dan Bishop, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Michael C Burgess, Kat Cammack, Ben Cline, Michael Cloud, Rodney Davis, Jeff Duncan, Andrew R Garbarino, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Michael Guest, Vicky Hartzler, Yvette Herrell, Clay Higgins, Ashley Hinson, Ronny L Jackson, Mike Johnson, Mike Kelly, Doug Lamborn, David Kustoff, Debbie Lesko, Nancy Mace, Lisa McClain, Tom McClintock, Dan Meuser, Mary E Miller, Markwayne Mullin, Greg Murphy, Ralph Norman, Dan Newhouse, Steven M Palazzo, Scott Perry, August Pfluger, David Rouzer, Austin Scott, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Victoria Spartz, Elise M Stefanik, Tom Tiffany, William Timmons, Beth Van Duyne, Randy K Weber, Roger Williams, Lee M Zeldin, A C L U Foundation of Louisiana, Advocating Opportunity, Al Otro Lado, A L A S, Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Bridges Faith Initiative, Cameroon American Council, Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Community Asylum Seekers Project, Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Doctors for Camp Closure, Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Freedom Network U S A, H I A S, Hispanic Federation, Home is Here N O LA, Human Rights First, Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrants Rights Law Group, Immigration Services & Legal Advocacy, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Justice Action Center, Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Justice in Motion, Kids in Need of Defense, Latin America Working Group, Lawyers for Good Government, Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, L S N Legal L L C, Migrant Center for Human Rights, National Immigration Law Center, National Justice for Our Neighbors, Oasis Legal Services, Refugee & Immigrant Center for Education & Legal Services, Robert F Kennedy Human Rights, Save the Children, Service Employees International Union, S M W Legal L L C, South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Tahirih Justice Center, Advocates for Human Rights, Southern Poverty Law Center, Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, U C S F Health & Human Rights Initiative, V E C I N A, Voces Unidas Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Womens Refugee Commission, Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights, Doctors of the World, Joseph Amon, Bonnie Arzuaga, Jennifer Balkus, Lawrence Belcher, Chris Beyrer, Juliana Bol, Sara Casey, Luz Castellanos, Adriana Cohen, Megan Coffee, Joanne Csete, Thomas Csordas, Fiona Danaher, Ryan Dodge, Mark Eisenberg, Wafaa El-Sadr, Hope Ferdowsian, Paul Fleming, Linda P Fried, Lynn R Goldman, Annekathryn Goodman, Lawrence O Gostin, Claire Greene, Kim Griswold, Jill Guernsey de Zapien, Rohini J Haar, Michele Heisler, Maia Ingram, Felipe A Jain, Radhika Jain, Monik Jimenez, S Patrick Kachur, Jennifer Kasper, Vandana Madhavan, Katherine Miller, Michael Nabil Khoury, William D Lopez, Joseph B McCormick, Terry McGovern, Katherine C McKenzie, Cecilia Menjivar, Michael O Mensah, Ranit Mishori, Rahul Nayak, Parveen Parmar, Anne R Pebley, Katherine R Peeler, Paulina A Rebelledo, Adam Richards, Goleen Samari, John Santelli, Jaime Sepulveda, Joshua M Sharfstein, Leigh H Simmons, Craig Spencer, Steffanie Strathdee, Til Stuermer, Monette Zard, Amy Zeidan, Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab, Center for Human Rights & Constitutional Law and University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration & Deportation Defense Clinic
Case Number: 6:2022cv00885
Filed: April 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 106 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Innovation Law Lab for Hearing held on May 13, 2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter LaRae Bourque (aty,Vogel, Matthew)
June 1, 2022 Filing 105 MOTION for Thomas A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125171) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION for Edmund G. LaCour to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125143) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 103 MOTION for Christopher Robison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125010) by State of Alaska. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 102 MOTION for Cori Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124900) by State of Alaska. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 101 MOTION for Bryan Cleveland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124688) by State of Oklahoma. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION for Andrew N. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124553) by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 99 MOTION for Lucas W.E. Croslow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124456) by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that the Expedited Motion to Stay Nationwide Scope of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal #97 filed by Alicia De Los Angles Duran Raymundo, Kevin Alexi De Leon and Innovation Law Lab is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/27/2022. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
May 26, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding MOTION to Expedite #97 and MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Ruling, #91 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite Pending Appeal filed by Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
May 26, 2022 Filing 97 MOTION to Expedite and MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Ruling, #91 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite Pending Appeal filed by Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/26/2022.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (WalkerSld, B).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Stephen John Petrany for State of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/25/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE of Appeal Transcript Order Requirement regarding #95 Notice of Appeal. Pursuant to FRAP 10(b), the Appellant must file the transcript order form regardless of whether transcripts are necessary. Access the 5th Circuit site by clicking #here. Hover over the Forms Fees & Guides tab, Forms, Court Reporter Forms, Transcript Order Form.In following the instructions on the form, please note manual notification to the court reporter and the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals is STILL REQUIRED. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
May 25, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-30303 for #92 Notice of Appeal, filed by U S Dept of Justice, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, Ur Jaddou, Executive Off of Immigration, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Tae Johnson, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Joseph R Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, USA, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Merrick Garland, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Xavier Becerra, Rochelle Walensky, U S Border Patrol and #95 Notice of Appeal, filed by Innovation Law Lab. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
May 25, 2022 Set Deadline for Clerk re #92 Notice of Appeal and #95 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record (22-30303) by Clerk to COA 6/9/2022. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
May 25, 2022 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #95 Notice of Appeal. A refund of the initial payment of $505.00, Receipt #ALAWDC-5117477, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
May 24, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #83 Ruling denying Motion for Limited Intervention, #90 Memorandum Ruling and #91 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite by Innovation Law Lab. (Filing fee $505, receipt number ALAWDC-5117478) (aty,Vogel, Matthew) Modified text on 5/25/2022 to more accurately reflect the filing (WalkerSld, B).
May 24, 2022 Filing 94 MOTION for Stephen Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5117274) by State of Georgia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2022 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky for proceedings held on 4/25/2022 and 5/13/2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays to Court Reporter: Court Reporter LaRae Bourque. (aty,Robinson, John)
May 23, 2022 NOTICE of Appeal Transcript Order Requirement regarding #92 Notice of Appeal. Pursuant to FRAP 10(b), the Appellant must file the transcript order form regardless of whether transcripts are necessary. Access the 5th Circuit site by clicking #here. Hover over the Forms Fees & Guides tab, Forms, Court Reporter Forms, Transcript Order Form.In following the instructions on the form, please note manual notification to the court reporter and the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals is STILL REQUIRED. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
May 20, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #90 Memorandum Ruling, #91 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) (aty,Robinson, John)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT no bond is required. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/20/2022. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 20, 2022 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM RULING re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Missouri, State of Mississippi, State of Utah, State of Georgia, State of Kansas, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Oklahoma, State of Alaska, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of West Virginia. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that the Plaintiff States have satisfied each of the requirements for a preliminary injunction under Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the court GRANTS the Plaintiff States' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/20/2022. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 18, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE of Defendants' Weekly Reporting for May 18, 2022 by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (aty,Robinson, John)
May 18, 2022 Filing 88 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. (aty,Vogel, Matthew) Modified to edit docket text on 5/18/2022 (Thomas, T).
May 18, 2022 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky . (aty,DeMott, Joseph)
May 18, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (aty,Robinson, John)
May 18, 2022 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Joseph Scott St John on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming regarding #85 Notice (Other). The original manual attachments will be maintained in the division of the presiding judge, until expiration of appeal delays. (crt,Williams, K)
May 17, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Manual Attachment, #4 Exhibit D)(aty,St John, Joseph) Modified to indicate manual attachment received on 5/18/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified on 5/18/2022 (Williams, K).
May 16, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 5/13/2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter/Transcriber LaRae E Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Total pages: 83. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 6/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2022. (crt,Bourque, L)
May 13, 2022 Filing 83 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Robert R Summerhays: MOTION HEARING held on 5/13/2022 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Missouri, State of Mississippi, State of Utah, State of Georgia, State of Kansas, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, State of Oklahoma, State of Alaska, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Arizona, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Wyoming, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of West Virginia, #62 MOTION for Limited Intervention with opposition filed by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. A written ruling will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter: LaRae E Bourque) (crt,Jordan, P)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Joseph Meyers for Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/13/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Victoria A Neilson for Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Talia Inlender for Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Monika Y Langarica for Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ahilan T Arulanantham for Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Sirine Shebaya for Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Limited Intervention with opposition filed by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky. (aty,DeMott, Joseph)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Thomas Tyler Hydrick for State of South Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Limited Intervention with opposition filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. (aty,St John, Joseph) Modified to correct docket entry relationship and to edit docket text on 5/12/2022 (Thomas, T).
May 12, 2022 Filing 73 MOTION for Joseph Meyers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5102324) by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 72 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Center for Human Rights & Constitutional Law, University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration & Deportation Defense Clinic. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 12, 2022 Filing 70 MOTION for Victoria F. Neilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5101766) by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus of Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law with consent by Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law, University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration & Deportation Defense Clinic. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order allowing Amicus Brief)(Attorney William P Quigley added to party Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law(pty:am), Attorney William P Quigley added to party Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law(pty:am))(aty,Quigley, William) Modified on 5/12/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to add filer on 5/12/2022 (Thomas, T).
May 12, 2022 Filing 68 MOTION for Talia Inlender to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5101525) by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 67 MOTION for Monika Y. Langarica to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5101524) by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 66 MOTION for Ahilan T. Arulanantham to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5101523) by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #69 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus of Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law with consent . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 11, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of Defendants' Weekly Reporting for May 11, 2022 by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky, David Neal, Raul Ortiz (aty,Robinson, John)
May 11, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION for Sirine Shebaya to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5101486) by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION for Thomas Hydrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5101356) by State of South Carolina. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2022 Filing 62 MOTION for Limited Intervention with opposition by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Decl. Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, #2 Decl. Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, #3 Decl. Stephen W. Manning, #4 Proposed order)(crt,Thomas, T)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Limited Intervention. The Proposed Motion for Limited Intervention be filed into the record on this matter. Any opposition to the Motion for Limited Intervention must be filed by May 12, 2022, by 4:00 p.m. Central Time. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/11/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/11/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION for Limited Intervention with opposition. Responses due by 5/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 11, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #62 MOTION for Limited Intervention with opposition. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 10, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order re #37 Order on Motion for TRO, by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Joseph) Modified on 5/10/2022 (Thomas, T).
May 10, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #59 MOTION for to Extend Temporary Restraining Order re #37 Order on Motion for TRO, . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 9, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #57 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Limited Intervention. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 9, 2022 Filing 58 PROPOSED EXHIBIT re #57 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Limited Intervention with opposition Decl. Stephen W. Manning by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. (aty,Vogel, Matthew) Modified to indicate document is proposed on 5/10/2022 (Thomas, T).
May 9, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Limited Intervention with opposition by Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Mot. Leave Proposed Order, #2 Proposed pleading Mot. Limited Intervention, #3 Proposed exhibit Decl. Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon, #4 Proposed exhibit Decl. Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo, #5 Proposed order Mot. Limited Intervention Proposed Order)(Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Kevin Alexi De Leon De Leon(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Alicia De Los Angeles Duran Raymundo(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Innovation Law Lab(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Scott Vogel added to party Innovation Law Lab(pty:intvd))(aty,Vogel, Matthew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of West Virginia, State of Florida, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Wyoming. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/9/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/9/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 9, 2022 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT re #51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of West Virginia, State of Florida, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,St John, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of West Virginia, State of Florida, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Filing 54 AMICI CURIAE MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Joseph Amon, Bonnie Arzuaga, Jennifer Balkus, Lawrence Belcher, Chris Beyrer, Juliana Bol, Parveen Parmar, Anne R Pebley, Katherine R Peeler, Paulina A Rebelledo, Adam Richards, Goleen Samari, John Santelli, Jaime Sepulveda, Joshua M Sharfstein, Leigh H Simmons, Linda P Fried, Lynn R Goldman, Annekathryn Goodman, Lawrence O Gostin, Claire Greene, Kim Griswold, Jill Guernsey de Zapien, Rohini J Haar, Michele Heisler, Maia Ingram, Felipe A Jain, Radhika Jain, Monik Jimenez, S Patrick Kachur, Jennifer Kasper, Michael Nabil Khoury, Craig Spencer, Steffanie Strathdee, Til Stuermer, Sara Casey, Luz Castellanos, Megan Coffee, Adriana Cohen, Joanne Csete, Thomas Csordas, Fiona Danaher, Doctors of the World, Ryan Dodge, Mark Eisenberg, Wafaa El-Sadr, Hope Ferdowsian, Paul Fleming, William D Lopez, Vandana Madhavan, Joseph B McCormick, Terry McGovern, Katherine C McKenzie, Cecilia Menjivar, Michael O Mensah, Katherine Miller, Ranit Mishori, Rahul Nayak, Monette Zard, Amy Zeidan. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Filing 50 AMICI CURIAE MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by A C L U Foundation of Louisiana, A L A S, Advocates for Human Rights, Advocating Opportunity, Al Otro Lado, Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Bridges Faith Initiative, Cameroon American Council, Oasis Legal Services, Refugee & Immigrant Center for Education & Legal Services, Robert F Kennedy Human Rights, S M W Legal L L C, Save the Children, Service Employees International Union, Freedom Network U S A, H I A S, Hispanic Federation, Home is Here N O LA, Human Rights First, Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrants Rights Law Group, Immigration Services & Legal Advocacy, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Justice Action Center, Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Justice in Motion, Kids in Need of Defense, L S N Legal L L C, South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Southern Poverty Law Center, Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Tahirih Justice Center, Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, U C S F Health & Human Rights Initiative, V E C I N A, Voces Unidas Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Community Asylum Seekers Project, Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Doctors for Camp Closure, Doctors of the World, Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Latin America Working Group, Lawyers for Good Government, Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, Migrant Center for Human Rights, National Immigration Law Center, National Justice for Our Neighbors, Womens Refugee Commission, Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/6/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Esther H Sung for A C L U Foundation of Louisiana, Esther H Sung for A L A S, Esther H Sung for Advocates for Human Rights, Esther H Sung for Advocating Opportunity, Esther H Sung for Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Esther H Sung for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Esther H Sung for Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Esther H Sung for Bridges Faith Initiative, Esther H Sung for Cameroon American Council, Esther H Sung for Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Esther H Sung for Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Esther H Sung for Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Esther H Sung for Community Asylum Seekers Project, Esther H Sung for Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Esther H Sung for Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Esther H Sung for Doctors for Camp Closure, Esther H Sung for Doctors of the World, Esther H Sung for Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Esther H Sung for Freedom Network U S A, Esther H Sung for H I A S, Esther H Sung for Hispanic Federation, Esther H Sung for Home is Here N O LA, Esther H Sung for Human Rights First, Esther H Sung for Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Esther H Sung for Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esther H Sung for Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Esther H Sung for Immigrants Rights Law Group, Esther H Sung for Immigration Services & Legal Advocacy, Esther H Sung for International Refugee Assistance Project, Esther H Sung for Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Esther H Sung for Justice Action Center, Esther H Sung for Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Esther H Sung for L S N Legal L L C, Esther H Sung for Latin America Working Group, Esther H Sung for Lawyers for Good Government, Esther H Sung for Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, Esther H Sung for Migrant Center for Human Rights, Esther H Sung for National Immigration Law Center, Esther H Sung for National Justice for Our Neighbors, Esther H Sung for Oasis Legal Services, Esther H Sung for Refugee & Immigrant Center for Education & Legal Services, Esther H Sung for Robert F Kennedy Human Rights, Esther H Sung for S M W Legal L L C, Esther H Sung for Save the Children, Esther H Sung for Service Employees International Union, Esther H Sung for South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Esther H Sung for Southern Poverty Law Center, Esther H Sung for Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Esther H Sung for Tahirih Justice Center, Esther H Sung for Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, Esther H Sung for U C S F Health & Human Rights Initiative, Esther H Sung for V E C I N A, Esther H Sung for Voces Unidas Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Esther H Sung for Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Esther H Sung for Womens Refugee Commission, Esther H Sung for Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/6/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Karen C Tumlin for A C L U Foundation of Louisiana, Karen C Tumlin for A L A S, Karen C Tumlin for Advocates for Human Rights, Karen C Tumlin for Advocating Opportunity, Karen C Tumlin for Al Otro Lado, Karen C Tumlin for Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Karen C Tumlin for Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Karen C Tumlin for Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Karen C Tumlin for Bridges Faith Initiative, Karen C Tumlin for Cameroon American Council, Karen C Tumlin for Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Karen C Tumlin for Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Karen C Tumlin for Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Karen C Tumlin for Community Asylum Seekers Project, Karen C Tumlin for Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Karen C Tumlin for Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Karen C Tumlin for Doctors for Camp Closure, Karen C Tumlin for Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Karen C Tumlin for Freedom Network U S A, Karen C Tumlin for H I A S, Karen C Tumlin for Hispanic Federation, Karen C Tumlin for Home is Here N O LA, Karen C Tumlin for Human Rights First, Karen C Tumlin for Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Karen C Tumlin for Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Karen C Tumlin for Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Karen C Tumlin for Immigrants Rights Law Group, Karen C Tumlin for Immigration Services & Legal Advocacy, Karen C Tumlin for International Refugee Assistance Project, Karen C Tumlin for Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Karen C Tumlin for Justice Action Center, Karen C Tumlin for Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Karen C Tumlin for Justice in Motion, Karen C Tumlin for Kids in Need of Defense, Karen C Tumlin for L S N Legal L L C, Karen C Tumlin for Latin America Working Group, Karen C Tumlin for Lawyers for Good Government, Karen C Tumlin for Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, Karen C Tumlin for Migrant Center for Human Rights, Karen C Tumlin for National Immigration Law Center, Karen C Tumlin for National Justice for Our Neighbors, Karen C Tumlin for Oasis Legal Services, Karen C Tumlin for Refugee & Immigrant Center for Education & Legal Services, Karen C Tumlin for Robert F Kennedy Human Rights, Karen C Tumlin for S M W Legal L L C, Karen C Tumlin for Save the Children, Karen C Tumlin for Service Employees International Union, Karen C Tumlin for South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Karen C Tumlin for Southern Poverty Law Center, Karen C Tumlin for Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Karen C Tumlin for Tahirih Justice Center, Karen C Tumlin for Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, Karen C Tumlin for U C S F Health & Human Rights Initiative, Karen C Tumlin for V E C I N A, Karen C Tumlin for Voces Unidas Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Karen C Tumlin for Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Karen C Tumlin for Womens Refugee Commission, Karen C Tumlin for Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/6/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 6, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief with consent sought but not yet obtained by Doctors of the World, Joseph Amon, Bonnie Arzuaga, Jennifer Balkus, Lawrence Belcher, Chris Beyrer, Juliana Bol, Sara Casey, Luz Castellanos, Adriana Cohen, Megan Coffee, Joanne Csete, Thomas Csordas, Fiona Danaher, Ryan Dodge, Mark Eisenberg, Wafaa El-Sadr, Hope Ferdowsian, Paul Fleming, Linda P. Fried, Lynn R. Goldman, Annekathryn Goodman, Lawrence O. Gostin, Claire Greene, Kim Griswold, Jill Guernsey de Zapien, Rohini J Haar, Michele Heisler, Maia Ingram, Felipe A. Jain, Radhika Jain, Monik Jimenez, S. Patrick Kachur, Jennifer Kasper, Vandana Madhavan, Katherine Miller, Michael Nabil Khoury, William D. Lopez, Joseph B. McCormick, Terry McGovern, Katherine C. McKenzie, Cecilia Menjivar, Michael O. Mensah, Ranit Mishori, Rahul Nayak, Parveen Parmar, Anne R. Pebley, Katherine R. Peeler, Paulina A. Rebelledo, Adam Richards, Goleen Samari, John Santelli, Jaime Sepulveda, Joshua M. Sharfstein, Leigh H. Simmons, Craig Spencer, Steffanie Strathdee, Til Stuermer, Monette Zard, Amy Zeidan. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading - Amici Curiae)(Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Doctors of the World(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Joseph Amon(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Bonnie Arzuaga(pty:selreq), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Jennifer Balkus(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Lawrence Belcher(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Chris Beyrer(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Juliana Bol(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Sara Casey(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Luz Castellanos(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Adriana Cohen(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Megan Coffee(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Joanne Csete(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Thomas Csordas(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Fiona Danaher(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Ryan Dodge(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Mark Eisenberg(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Wafaa El-Sadr(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Hope Ferdowsian(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Paul Fleming(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Linda P. Fried(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Lynn R. Goldman(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Annekathryn Goodman(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Lawrence O. Gostin(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Claire Greene(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Kim Griswold(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Jill Guernsey de Zapien(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Rohini J Haar(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Michele Heisler(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Maia Ingram(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Felipe A. Jain(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Radhika Jain(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Monik Jimenez(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party S. Patrick Kachur(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Jennifer Kasper(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Vandana Madhavan(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Katherine Miller(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Michael Nabil Khoury(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party William D. Lopez(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Joseph B. McCormick(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Terry McGovern(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Katherine C. McKenzie(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Cecilia Menjivar(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Michael O. Mensah(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Ranit Mishori(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Rahul Nayak(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Parveen Parmar(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Anne R. Pebley(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Katherine R. Peeler(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Paulina A. Rebelledo(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Adam Richards(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Goleen Samari(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party John Santelli(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Jaime Sepulveda(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Joshua M. Sharfstein(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Leigh H. Simmons(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Craig Spencer(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Steffanie Strathdee(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Til Stuermer(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Monette Zard(pty:am), Attorney Jacob Kennedy Weixler added to party Amy Zeidan(pty:am))(aty,Weixler, Jacob)
May 6, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #46 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief with consent sought but not yet obtained . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 5, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Esther H. Sung to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5094176) by ACLU Foundation of Louisiana, ALAS, Advocating Opportunity, Al Otro Lado, Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Bridges Faith Initiative, Cameroon American Council, Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Community Asylum Seekers Project, Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Doctors for Camp Closure, Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Freedom Network USA, HIAS, Hispanic Federation, Home is Here NOLA, Human Rights First, Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrants Rights Law Group, Immigration Services and Legal Advocacy, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Justice Action Center, Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Justice in Motion, Kids in Need of Defense, LSN Legal LLC, Lawyers for Good Government, Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, Migrant Center for Human Rights, National Immigration Law Center, National Justice for Our Neighbors, Oasis Legal Services, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Robert F. Kennedy Human Rights, SMW Legal LLC, Save the Children, Service Employees International Union, South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Tahirih Justice Center, The Advocates for Human Rights, The Southern Poverty Law Center, Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, UCSF Health and Human Rights Initiative, VECINA, Voces Unidas: Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Womens Refugee Commission, Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Yanik, Mary)
May 5, 2022 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of Utah, State of Mississippi, State of South Carolina, State of Florida, State of West Virginia, State of Tennessee, State of Wyoming, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of Montana, State of Missouri, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, Commonwealth of Virginia.(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of North Dakota(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Texas(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION for Karen C. Tumlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5094153) by ACLU Foundation of Louisiana, ALAS, Advocating Opportunity, Al Otro Lado, Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Bridges Faith Initiative, Cameroon American Council, Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Community Asylum Seekers Project, Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Doctors for Camp Closure, Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Freedom Network USA, HIAS, Hispanic Federation, Home is Here NOLA, Human Rights First, Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrants Rights Law Group, Immigration Services and Legal Advocacy, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Justice Action Center, Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Justice in Motion, Kids in Need of Defense, LSN Legal LLC, Latin America Working Group, Lawyers for Good Government, Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, Migrant Center for Human Rights, National Immigration Law Center, National Justice for Our Neighbors, Oasis Legal Services, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Robert F. Kennedy Human Rights, SMW Legal LLC, Save the Children, Service Employees International Union, South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Tahirih Justice Center, The Advocates for Human Rights, The Southern Poverty Law Center, Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, UCSF Health and Human Rights Initiative, VECINA, Voces Unidas: Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Womens Refugee Commission, Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Yanik, Mary)
May 5, 2022 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief with consent by ACLU Foundation of Louisiana, Advocating Opportunity, Al Otro Lado, ALAS, Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Black Alliance for Just Immigration, Bridges Faith Initiative, Cameroon American Council, Cleveland Jobs with Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic, Community Asylum Seekers Project, Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim, Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel, Doctors for Camp Closure, Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project, Freedom Network USA, HIAS, Hispanic Federation, Home is Here NOLA, Human Rights First, Human Rights Initiative of North Texas, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrants Rights Law Group, Immigration Services and Legal Advocacy, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice, Justice Action Center, Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso, Justice in Motion, Kids in Need of Defense, Latin America Working Group, Lawyers for Good Government, Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention, LSN Legal LLC, Migrant Center for Human Rights, National Immigration Law Center, National Justice for Our Neighbors, Oasis Legal Services, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Robert F. Kennedy Human Rights, Save the Children, Service Employees International Union, SMW Legal LLC, South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice, Tahirih Justice Center, The Advocates for Human Rights, The Southern Poverty Law Center, Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic, UCSF Health and Human Rights Initiative, VECINA, Voces Unidas: Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition, Volunteer Lawyers for Justice, Womens Refugee Commission, Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party ACLU Foundation of Louisiana(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Advocating Opportunity(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Al Otro Lado(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party ALAS(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Black Alliance for Just Immigration(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Bridges Faith Initiative(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Cameroon American Council(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Cleveland Jobs with Justice(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Community Asylum Seekers Project(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Doctors for Camp Closure(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Freedom Network USA(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party HIAS(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Hispanic Federation(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Home is Here NOLA(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Human Rights First(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Human Rights Initiative of North Texas(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Immigrant Defenders Law Center(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Immigrants Rights Law Group(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Immigration Services and Legal Advocacy(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party International Refugee Assistance Project(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Justice Action Center(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Justice in Motion(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Kids in Need of Defense(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Latin America Working Group(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Lawyers for Good Government(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party LSN Legal LLC(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Migrant Center for Human Rights(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party National Immigration Law Center(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party National Justice for Our Neighbors(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Oasis Legal Services(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Robert F. Kennedy Human Rights(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Save the Children(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Service Employees International Union(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party SMW Legal LLC(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Tahirih Justice Center(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party The Advocates for Human Rights(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party The Southern Poverty Law Center(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party UCSF Health and Human Rights Initiative(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party VECINA(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Voces Unidas: Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Volunteer Lawyers for Justice(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Womens Refugee Commission(pty:am), Attorney Mary Catherine Yanik added to party Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights(pty:am))(aty,Yanik, Mary)
May 5, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief with consent . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 4, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Defendants' Weekly Reporting for May 4, 2022 by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (aty,Robinson, John)
April 29, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Emily Mendrala, #2 Exhibit B, Third Declaration of Blas Nunez-Neto)(aty,Kossak, Jonathan)
April 29, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attachments: #1 Certification of Admin. R., #2 Index to Admin. R., #3 Vol. 1 of Admin. R., #4 Vol. 2 of Admin. R.)(aty,DeMott, Joseph)
April 27, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John DeMott on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph John DeMott added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,DeMott, Joseph)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting #24 Motion for TRO. This order applies nationally, and Defendants are bound by it in all locations and contexts within their respective jurisdictions. No bond is required. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/27/2022. (crt,Jordan, P) Modified on 4/27/2022 (Thomas, T).
April 27, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Status Conference held on 4/25/2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter/Transcriber LaRae E Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Total pages: 18. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 5/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2022. (crt,Bourque, L)
April 26, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing of Second Declaration of Blas Nunez-Neto by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Blas Nunez-Neto, #2 Exhibit Attachment A to Second Declaration of Blas Nunez-Neto)(aty,Kossak, Jonathan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 34 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Robert R Summerhays: STATUS CONFERENCE held via Zoom on 4/25/2022. The Court discussed the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 24] filed by Plaintiffs. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court announced its intent to grant the motion. The parties will confer regarding the specific terms to be contained in the Temporary Restraining Order and attempt to reach agreement. (Court Reporter: LaRae E Bourque) (crt,Jordan, P)
April 25, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Compel Production of Information filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/25/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 25, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez R Reuveni on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Erez R Reuveni added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Reuveni, Erez)
April 25, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Joseph)
April 25, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Drew Ensign for State of Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/22/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Presently before the Court is the Plaintiff States Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and to Compel Production of Information ECF No. #24 . The Court has now received the opposition to the Motion filed by the Defendants. Based on the Court's review of the opposition, IT IS ORDERED THAT if the Plaintiff States wish to respond to the Defendants' opposition, they shall file such response no later than noon Central Time on Monday, April 25, 2022; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties are to promptly confer on an expedited discovery plan that addresses: (1) the discovery identified in the Plaintiff States Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and (2) any discovery in connection with the evidentiary hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court will hold a status conference with counsel for the parties on Monday, April 25, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. Central Time via Zoom. Only counsel of record for the parties will be permitted to attend the status conference.( Replies due by 4/25/2022.) ( District Judge Status Conference set for 4/25/2022 03:00 PM via zoom by before Judge Robert R Summerhays.) Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/22/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 22, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Compel Production of Information filed by Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Blas Nunez-Neto)(aty,Kossak, Jonathan)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Considering the Plaintiff States' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and to Compel Production of Information ECF No. #24 , and in order to avoid possible irreparable harm, IT IS ORDERED THAT Defendants shall file a response to the Motion no later than Friday, April 22, 2022, at noon Central Time. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/21/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 21, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Drew Ensign to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5076933) by State of Arizona. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Compel by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed order, #3 Declaration of Joseph Scott St. John, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(aty,St John, Joseph). Modified to add motion event on 4/21/2022 (Thomas, T).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Robert Henneke for Amicus parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/20/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Autumn Hamit Patterson for Amicus parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/20/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 20, 2022 Filing 21 AMICI CURIAE MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Jodey C Arrington, Brian Babin, Jim Banks, Andy Biggs, Dan Bishop, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Michael C Burgess, Kat Cammack, Ben Cline, Michael Cloud, Rodney Davis, Jeff Duncan, Andrew R Garbarino, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Michael Guest, Vicky Hartzler, Yvette Herrell, Clay Higgins, Ashley Hinson, Ronny L Jackson, Mike Johnson, Mike Kelly, David Kustoff, Doug Lamborn, Debbie Lesko, Nancy Mace, Lisa McClain, Tom McClintock, Dan Meuser, Mary E Miller, Markwayne Mullin, Greg Murphy, Dan Newhouse, Ralph Norman, Steven M Palazzo, Scott Perry, August Pfluger, David Rouzer, Austin Scott, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Victoria Spartz, Elise M Stefanik, Tom Tiffany, William Timmons, Beth Van Duyne, Randy K Weber, Roger Williams, Lee M Zeldin. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/20/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Hearing. Motion day set for 5/13/2022 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/20/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite. Responses due by 4/29/2022. Replies due by 5/9/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 19, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Robert Henneke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5073883) by Jodey C Arrington, Brian Babin, Jim Banks, Andy Biggs, Dan Bishop, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Michael C Burgess, Kat Cammack, Ben Cline, Michael Cloud, Rodney Davis, Jeff Duncan, Andrew R Garbarino, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Michael Guest, Vicky Hartzler, Yvette Herrell, Clay Higgins, Ashley Hinson, Ronny L Jackson, Mike Johnson, Mike Kelly, David Kustoff, Doug Lamborn, Debbie Lesko, Nancy Mace, Lisa McClain, Tom McClintock, Dan Meuser, Mary E Miller, Markwayne Mullin, Greg Murphy, Dan Newhouse, Ralph Norman, Steven M Palazzo, Scott Perry, August Pfluger, David Rouzer, Austin Scott, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Victoria Spartz, Elise M Stefanik, Tom Tiffany, William Timmons, Beth Van Duyne, Randy K Weber, Roger Williams, Lee M Zeldin. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Campbell, John)
April 19, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Autumn Hamit Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5073875) by Jodey C Arrington, Brian Babin, Jim Banks, Andy Biggs, Dan Bishop, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Michael C Burgess, Kat Cammack, Ben Cline, Michael Cloud, Rodney Davis, Jeff Duncan, Andrew R Garbarino, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Michael Guest, Vicky Hartzler, Yvette Herrell, Clay Higgins, Ashley Hinson, Ronny L Jackson, Mike Johnson, Mike Kelly, David Kustoff, Doug Lamborn, Debbie Lesko, Nancy Mace, Lisa McClain, Tom McClintock, Dan Meuser, Mary E Miller, Markwayne Mullin, Greg Murphy, Dan Newhouse, Ralph Norman, Steven M Palazzo, Scott Perry, August Pfluger, David Rouzer, Austin Scott, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Victoria Spartz, Elise M Stefanik, Tom Tiffany, William Timmons, Beth Van Duyne, Randy K Weber, Roger Williams, Lee M Zeldin. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Campbell, John)
April 19, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction with consent by Jodey C Arrington, Brian Babin, Jim Banks, Andy Biggs, Dan Bishop, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Michael C Burgess, Kat Cammack, Ben Cline, Michael Cloud, Rodney Davis, Jeff Duncan, Andrew R Garbarino, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Michael Guest, Vicky Hartzler, Yvette Herrell, Clay Higgins, Ashley Hinson, Ronny L Jackson, Mike Johnson, Mike Kelly, Doug Lamborn, David Kustoff, Debbie Lesko, Nancy Mace, Lisa McClain, Tom McClintock, Dan Meuser, Mary E Miller, Markwayne Mullin, Greg Murphy, Ralph Norman, Dan Newhouse, Steven M Palazzo, Scott Perry, August Pfluger, David Rouzer, Austin Scott, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Victoria Spartz, Elise M Stefanik, Tom Tiffany, William Timmons, Beth Van Duyne, Randy K Weber, Roger Williams, Lee M Zeldin. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Proposed pleading Title 42 Amicus Brief, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Jodey C Arrington(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Brian Babin(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Jim Banks(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Andy Biggs(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Dan Bishop(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Vern Buchanan(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Ted Budd(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Michael C Burgess(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Kat Cammack(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Ben Cline(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Michael Cloud(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Rodney Davis(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Jeff Duncan(pty:selreq), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Andrew R Garbarino(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Louie Gohmert(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Bob Good(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Lance Gooden(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Marjorie Taylor Greene(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Michael Guest(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Vicky Hartzler(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Yvette Herrell(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Clay Higgins(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Ashley Hinson(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Ronny L Jackson(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Mike Johnson(pty:a), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Mike Kelly(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Doug Lamborn(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party David Kustoff(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Debbie Lesko(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Nancy Mace(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Lisa McClain(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Tom McClintock(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Dan Meuser(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Mary E Miller(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Markwayne Mullin(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Greg Murphy(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Ralph Norman(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Dan Newhouse(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Steven M Palazzo(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Scott Perry(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party August Pfluger(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party David Rouzer(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Austin Scott(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Adrian Smith(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Jason Smith(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Lloyd Smucker(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Victoria Spartz(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Elise M Stefanik(pty:selreq), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Tom Tiffany(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party William Timmons(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Beth Van Duyne(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Randy K Weber(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Roger Williams(pty:am), Attorney John S Campbell, III added to party Lee M Zeldin(pty:am))(aty,Campbell, John)
April 19, 2022 Filing 15 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Stipulation Regarding Schedule for Resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming regarding #14 Motion for Hearing filed as a STIPULATION re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #14 Motion for Hearing filed as a STIPULATION re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/14/2022. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing filed as a STIPULATION re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/18/2022 to more accurately identify pleading filed. (Alexander, E)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/14/2022.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed order)(crt,Whidden, C)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/14/2022. (crt,Jordan, P)
April 14, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed order, #10 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky filed by State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of West Virginia, State of South Carolina, State of Florida, State of Mississippi, State of Wyoming, State of Georgia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Utah, State of Tennessee, State of Ohio, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Nebraska, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Kansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Alabama(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Alaska(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Arkansas(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Florida(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Georgia(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Idaho(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Kansas(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party Commonwealth of Kentucky(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Mississippi(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Montana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Nebraska(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Ohio(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Oklahoma(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of South Carolina(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Tennessee(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Utah(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of West Virginia(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Wyoming(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/14/2022. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Kossak on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Kossak, Jonathan)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney John Robinson added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Robinson, John)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Jean Lin added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Lin, Jean)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael Talent for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael Talent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5061335) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for D. John Sauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5061325) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Rochelle Walensky, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, U S Border Patrol, Raul Ortiz, U S Dept of Justice, Merrick Garland, Executive Off of Immigration, David Neal, Joseph R Biden, Jr, USA. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 3, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5054315) filed by State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana et al v.Centers for Disease Control & Prevention et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Joseph Scott St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Drew C Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: D John Sauer
Represented By: Michael Talent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Thomas Tyler Hydrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control & Prevention
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Walensky
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Health & Human Services
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Homeland Security
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Customs & Border Protection
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Magnus
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae Johnson
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Border Patrol
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Ortiz
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Justice
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Off of Immigration
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neal
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Biden, Jr
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Erez R Reuveni
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jodey C Arrington
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Babin
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jim Banks
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andy Biggs
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dan Bishop
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vern Buchanan
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ted Budd
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael C Burgess
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kat Cammack
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ben Cline
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Cloud
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rodney Davis
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeff Duncan
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew R Garbarino
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louie Gohmert
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bob Good
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lance Gooden
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marjorie Taylor Greene
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Guest
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vicky Hartzler
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yvette Herrell
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Clay Higgins
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ashley Hinson
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronny L Jackson
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Johnson
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Kelly
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Doug Lamborn
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Kustoff
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Debbie Lesko
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nancy Mace
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lisa McClain
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom McClintock
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dan Meuser
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mary E Miller
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Markwayne Mullin
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greg Murphy
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ralph Norman
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dan Newhouse
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steven M Palazzo
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Scott Perry
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: August Pfluger
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Rouzer
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Austin Scott
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adrian Smith
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jason Smith
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lloyd Smucker
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Victoria Spartz
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elise M Stefanik
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom Tiffany
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: William Timmons
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Beth Van Duyne
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Randy K Weber
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Roger Williams
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lee M Zeldin
Represented By: John S Campbell, III
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: A C L U Foundation of Louisiana
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Advocating Opportunity
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Al Otro Lado
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: A L A S
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arizona Justice For Our Neighbors
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Black Alliance for Just Immigration
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bridges Faith Initiative
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cameroon American Council
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cleveland Jobs with Justice
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Columbia Law School Immigrants Rights Clinic
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Asylum Seekers Project
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Comunidad Maya Pixan Ixim
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disciples Immigration Legal Counsel
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Doctors for Camp Closure
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Florence Immigrant & Refugee Rights Project
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Freedom Network U S A
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: H I A S
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hispanic Federation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Home is Here N O LA
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Human Rights First
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Human Rights Initiative of North Texas
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Defenders Law Center
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrants Rights Law Group
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Services & Legal Advocacy
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Refugee Assistance Project
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Activists for Immigration Justice
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice Action Center
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice for Our Neighbors El Paso
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Motion
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kids in Need of Defense
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Latin America Working Group
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawyers for Good Government
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louisiana Advocates for Immigrants in Detention
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: L S N Legal L L C
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Migrant Center for Human Rights
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Immigration Law Center
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Justice for Our Neighbors
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Refugee & Immigrant Center for Education & Legal Services
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert F Kennedy Human Rights
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Save the Children
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: S M W Legal L L C
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Student Clinic for Immigrant Justice
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tahirih Justice Center
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Advocates for Human Rights
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tulane Immigrant Rights Clinic
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U C S F Health & Human Rights Initiative
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: V E C I N A
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Voces Unidas Louisiana Immigrants Rights Coalition
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Volunteer Lawyers for Justice
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Womens Refugee Commission
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Young Center for Immigrant Childrens Rights
Represented By: Mary Catherine Yanik
Represented By: Esther H Sung
Represented By: Gabriela Cruz
Represented By: Karen C Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Doctors of the World
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Amon
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bonnie Arzuaga
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jennifer Balkus
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence Belcher
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chris Beyrer
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Juliana Bol
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sara Casey
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Luz Castellanos
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adriana Cohen
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Megan Coffee
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joanne Csete
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas Csordas
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fiona Danaher
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ryan Dodge
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark Eisenberg
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wafaa El-Sadr
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hope Ferdowsian
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul Fleming
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Linda P Fried
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lynn R Goldman
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Annekathryn Goodman
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence O Gostin
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Claire Greene
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kim Griswold
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jill Guernsey de Zapien
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rohini J Haar
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michele Heisler
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maia Ingram
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Felipe A Jain
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Radhika Jain
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Monik Jimenez
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: S Patrick Kachur
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jennifer Kasper
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vandana Madhavan
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Katherine Miller
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Nabil Khoury
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: William D Lopez
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph B McCormick
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Terry McGovern
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Katherine C McKenzie
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cecilia Menjivar
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael O Mensah
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ranit Mishori
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rahul Nayak
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Parveen Parmar
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anne R Pebley
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Katherine R Peeler
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paulina A Rebelledo
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adam Richards
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Goleen Samari
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Santelli
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jaime Sepulveda
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joshua M Sharfstein
Represented By: Jacob Kennedy Weixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]