MURPHY v. CORIZON et al
Plaintiff: |
CAROL MURPHY |
Defendant: |
MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RICH HALLWORTH, KEN TOPEL, HOPE LEBLANC, PRAVEEN PAVULURU, LARRY RUDZINSKY, JOSEPH PONT, SCOTT BURNHEIMER, STOCKWELL and CORIZON |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00101 |
Filed: |
March 28, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Maine |
Office: |
Bangor Office |
County: |
XX Outside the State |
Presiding Judge: |
MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK |
Presiding Judge: |
JOHN A. WOODCOCK |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
121
ORDER adopting 120 Report and Recommended Decision for for 110 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by KEN TOPEL, PRAVEEN PAVULURU, CORIZON and 118 Notification of Removal filed by CAROL MURPHY; granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 118 Nofication of Removal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
|
June 13, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER terminating 67 Order to Show Cause; denying 69 Motion to Compel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
|
December 21, 2012 |
Filing
60
ORDER adopting 54 Report and Recommended Decision for 48 Motion for Order for Court Intervention / Motion for Sanctions (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by CAROL MURPHY, denying 48 Motion for Order for Court Intervention / Motion for Sanctions (Motion for Prelimimary Injunction). By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
|
October 24, 2012 |
Filing
50
ORDER denying 49 Motion for Further Reconsideration. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommended Decision for 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by JOSEPH PONTE, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, and SCOTT BURNHEIMER; granting with prejudice 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing
32
ORDER denying 26 Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 26 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
|
May 2, 2012 |
Filing
12
ORDER denying 11 Motion for Recusal as to Magistrate Judge Kravchuk only and denying 11 Motion to transfer venue. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
3
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Carol Murphy Prisoner # 85998. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file this action without prepaym ent of fees. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1), plaintiff is ASSESSED the full filing fee of three hundred, fifty dollars ($350.00). A copy of this order shall be forwarded to the Business Office of the Maine Correctional Center, Windham, Maine, to insure compliance with the fee assessment. ORDERED that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Maine at Bangor; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall transmit all relevant papers to the transferee court; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that this matter shall be removed from the docket of this Court. C/M Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 3/27/2012. (FMM ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/28/2012.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?