PENOBSCOT NATION v. SCHNEIDER et al

Plaintiff: PENOBSCOT NATION
Defendant: WILLIAM J SCHNEIDER, CHANDLER WOODCOCK and JOEL T WILKINSON
Case Number: 1:2012cv00254
Filed: August 20, 2012
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Kennebec
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PENDING MOTIONS OF STATE INTERVENORS granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
February 5, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER- Stipulated Record due by 3/16/2015, courtesy copies referred to in Procedural Order due by 3/19/2015, Motions for Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2015, response to Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert/Kumho motions due by 6/8/2015. Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment and response to Daubert/Kumho motions due by 7/8/2015, Reply to Daubert/Kumho motions due 7/27/2015, Reply to Daubert/Kumho motions filed between 6/9/2015 and 7/8/2015 due by 8/10/2015. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
December 10, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER- Parties' proposed schedule for filing motions for summary judgment as well as any related Daubert/kumho motions due by 1/19/2015. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
March 11, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
February 4, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 33 Motion to Intervene; granting 36 Motion to Amend; denying 41 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
June 18, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO INTERVENE granting 12 Motion to Intervene By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENOBSCOT NATION v. SCHNEIDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENOBSCOT NATION
Represented By: KAIGHN SMITH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANDLER WOODCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL T WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?