HOPKINS et al v. CITY OF CALAIS POLICE DEPARTMENT et al

Plaintiff: RICHARD HOPKINS and JAMES HOPKINS
Defendant: CITY OF CALAIS POLICE DEPARTMENT, DAVID RANDALL, DAVID CLARONI, DWAYNE MCLELLON, ROY WISE, THOMAS CHAMBERS and JOHN FULLER
Case Number: 1:2013cv00229
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2016 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE - granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion in Limine. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
January 26, 2016 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT - denying without prejudice 126 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
May 18, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion to Strike; denying 80 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (nwd)
February 26, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS - overruling 32 Objection. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOPKINS et al v. CITY OF CALAIS POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CALAIS POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID RANDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CLARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWAYNE MCLELLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY WISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN FULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?