ARAYOS LLC v. ELLIS et al
Plaintiff: ARAYOS LLC
Defendant: JIMMIE ELLIS, SYDKAL INC, MISTY BURR, CLEOLA LUK, JOHN M VELLIANITIS, JMV INC and PAXOS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00060
Filed: February 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Penobscot
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PROCEDURAL ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER CLARIFICATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT - Set Deadlines: Clarification due by 10/28/2015. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM re: 66 Motion for Default Judgment By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (rmb) Modified on 6/26/2015 to clean up text(rmb).
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM 66 Motion for Default Judgment By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (rmb)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM granting 61 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to MISTY BURR, JMV INC, PAXOS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC, SYDKAL INC, JOHN M VELLIANITIS( Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 2/17/2015.); granting 61 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER mooting 41 Motion to Set Aside ; mooting 18 Motion to Vacate. Defendant to file responsive pleading to amended complaint on or before 8/20/14. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARAYOS LLC v. ELLIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARAYOS LLC
Represented By: JOHN H. BRANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMIE ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYDKAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISTY BURR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEOLA LUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M VELLIANITIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMV INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAXOS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?