MCCUE v. CITY OF BANGOR MAINE et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCCUE
Defendant: CITY OF BANGOR MAINE, BANGOR MAINE POLICE DEPARTMENT, KIM DONNELL, RYAN JONES, WADE BETTERS, JOSHUA KUHN, DAVID FARRAR, CHRIS BLANCHARD, BANGOR MAINE RESPONDING POLICE OFFICERS JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES 1 - 10, BANGOR MAINE SUPERVISING POLICE OFFICERS JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES 1 - 10, BANGOR MAINE RESPONDING FIRE DEPARTMENT OFFICERS JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES 1 - 10 and TASER INTERNATIONAL INC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00098
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Penobscot
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 102 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 105 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 67 Amended Motion for Sanctions; granting 70 Motion to Reopen Depositions ; denying 70 Motion for Sanctions. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROCEDURAL ORDER ON EXTRAJUDICIAL COMMENTS denying without prejudice 48 Motion for Order Prohibiting Certain Extrajudicial Comments By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Affirming the Recommended Decision of the Magistrate Judge 44 Report and Recommendations and denying 30 Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Affirming the Recommended Decision of the Magistrate Judge 26 . By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCUE v. CITY OF BANGOR MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCCUE
Represented By: CARL D. MCCUE
Represented By: DAVID J. VAN DYKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BANGOR MAINE
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGOR MAINE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM DONNELL
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN JONES
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WADE BETTERS
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA KUHN
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FARRAR
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS BLANCHARD
Represented By: FREDERICK J. BADGER, JR.
Represented By: JOSHUA AARON RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGOR MAINE RESPONDING POLICE OFFICERS JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGOR MAINE SUPERVISING POLICE OFFICERS JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGOR MAINE RESPONDING FIRE DEPARTMENT OFFICERS JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASER INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: MICHAEL ALLEN BRAVE
Represented By: ISAIAH FIELDS
Represented By: ROY T. PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?