BOULANGER v. WESTERN PETROLEUM COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MICHEL BOULANGER
Defendant: WESTERN PETROLEUM COMPANY, PETROLEUM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS, WORLD FUEL SERVICES CORPORATION, RAIL WORLD INC, RAIL WORLD LOCOMOTIVE LEASING, LLC, EDWARD A BURKHARDT, DAKOTA PETROLEUM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC, DPTS MARKETING LLC, TRINITY INDUSTRIES INC, CIT GROUP INC, UNION TANK CAR CO, DAKOTA PLAINS MARKETING LLC and DAKOTA PLAINS TRANSLOADING LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00126
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: XX Outside the State
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 169 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, if Amending a COMPLAINT, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT Document. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (rmb)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER AMENDING AND RESTATING CONSENT ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL IN 1:13-mc-00184-NT re:( Status Report due by 5/22/2015.) By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES granting 155 Motion to Extend Time By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (lrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOULANGER v. WESTERN PETROLEUM COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN PETROLEUM COMPANY
Represented By: PETER J. DETROY, III
Represented By: SCOTT A. EDELMAN
Represented By: MARK FILIP
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: LESLIE M. SMITH
Represented By: RENEE D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETROLEUM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS
Represented By: PETER J. DETROY, III
Represented By: SCOTT A. EDELMAN
Represented By: MARK FILIP
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: LESLIE M. SMITH
Represented By: RENEE D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD FUEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: PETER J. DETROY, III
Represented By: SCOTT A. EDELMAN
Represented By: MARK FILIP
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Represented By: LESLIE M. SMITH
Represented By: RENEE D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAIL WORLD INC
Represented By: TIFFANY L. AMLOT
Represented By: ALAN S. GILBERT
Represented By: PATRICK CARR MAXCY
Represented By: STEVEN LAWRENCE MEROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAIL WORLD LOCOMOTIVE LEASING, LLC
Represented By: TIFFANY L. AMLOT
Represented By: ALAN S. GILBERT
Represented By: PATRICK CARR MAXCY
Represented By: STEVEN LAWRENCE MEROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD A BURKHARDT
Represented By: TIFFANY L. AMLOT
Represented By: ALAN S. GILBERT
Represented By: PATRICK CARR MAXCY
Represented By: STEVEN LAWRENCE MEROUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAKOTA PETROLEUM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT ANDRICHIK
Represented By: CAL R. BURNTON
Represented By: MICHAEL R. DOCKTERMAN
Represented By: DONALD E. FRECHETTE
Represented By: MEGAN COLLEEN HUGO
Represented By: EDWARD TIMOTHY WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPTS MARKETING LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT ANDRICHIK
Represented By: CAL R. BURNTON
Represented By: MICHAEL R. DOCKTERMAN
Represented By: DONALD E. FRECHETTE
Represented By: MEGAN COLLEEN HUGO
Represented By: EDWARD TIMOTHY WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINITY INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: GREGORY PAUL HANSEL
Represented By: MATTHEW KALAS
Represented By: JENNIFER A. KENEDY
Represented By: MICHAEL S. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT GROUP INC
Represented By: ALLISON BROWN
Represented By: THOMAS P. CIMINO
Represented By: DEBRA A. DANDENEAU
Represented By: MARCIA GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: BRIAN LEDEBUHR
Represented By: EDWARD S. MACCOLL
Represented By: ARVIN MASKIN
Represented By: DIANE P. SULLIVAN
Represented By: WILLIAM W. THORSNESS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION TANK CAR CO
Represented By: MAUREEN D. COX
Represented By: JAMES DAVID DUFFY
Represented By: JASON R. GAGNON
Represented By: THOMAS R. MCKEON
Represented By: JAMES K. ROBERTSON
Represented By: JOHN S. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAKOTA PLAINS MARKETING LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL F. COCKSON
Represented By: DANIEL J. CONNOLLY
Represented By: DANIEL FELKEL
Represented By: BRUCE G. JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL J. KANUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAKOTA PLAINS TRANSLOADING LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL F. COCKSON
Represented By: DANIEL J. CONNOLLY
Represented By: DANIEL FELKEL
Represented By: BRUCE G. JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL J. KANUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHEL BOULANGER
Represented By: PETER J. FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?