COUSINS et al v. HIGGINS et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT L COUSINS and JUDY A COUSINS
Defendant: KEITH HIGGINS, HEATH HIGGINS, DUDLEY PORIER, TADD JEWETT, JAMES LAPRADE, DAVID KELLY, WILLIAM WEIR, TRACY PATTON, WAYNE PATTON, MATTHEW TETREAULT, MATTHEW LINDSLEY, COLTON SANBORN, THOMAS CHISOLM, SAMUEL CHISOLM, HUGH GILLEY, JR, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4 and JOHN DOE 5
Case Number: 1:2014cv00515
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Hancock
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1986 Neglect of Duty
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ON SECOND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT denying 99 Motion for Relief from Judgment By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PROCEDURAL ORDER AND COLOCOTRONI MEMORANDUM By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT denying 95 MOTION for Relief from Judgment, MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 85 Report and Recommendations, 77 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 77 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATTHEW LINDSLEY, KEITH HIGGINS, HEATH HIGGINS, TADD JEWETT, TREMONT VOLUNTEER FIRE DEPARTMENT, TOWN OF TREMONT, SAMUEL CHISOLM, MATTHEW TETREAULT, and COLTON SANBORN. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 53 Report and Recommendations for 40 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Multiple Counts and Defendants filed by TADD JEWETT, MATTHEW LINDSLEY, KEITH HIGGINS, HEATH HIGGINS, MATTHEW TETREAULT. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mlm)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Multiple Counts and Defendants filed by TADD JEWETT, MATTHEW LINDSLEY, KEITH HIGGINS, HEATH HIGGINS, MATTHEW TETREAULT. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROCEDURAL ORDER - Set Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 10/21/2016. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - denying 25 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT - granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 16 Motion for Leave to File. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 6 . By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUSINS et al v. HIGGINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT L COUSINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY A COUSINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH HIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATH HIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUDLEY PORIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TADD JEWETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LAPRADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WEIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY PATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE PATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW TETREAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW LINDSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLTON SANBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS CHISOLM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL CHISOLM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUGH GILLEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?