GALVAN v. NELSON
Plaintiff: SABRA GALVAN
Defendant: SHARON NELSON
Case Number: 1:2015cv00285
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Penobscot
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER adopting 35 Report and Recommended Decision for 34 Motion to Dismiss filed by SHARON NELSON; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SHARON NELSON. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2016. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting 29 Report and Recommended Decision for 27 Motion for Sanction of Dismissal filed by SHARON NELSON; denying 27 Motion for Sanction of Dismissal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 27 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHARON NELSON. Objections to R&R due by 7/18/2016.By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION re: 17 Report and Recommendations. ; granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (mjlt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALVAN v. NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRA GALVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?