PALENCAR v. THERIAULT et al

Plaintiff: HILARY PALENCAR
Defendant: BRENDA THERIAULT, KEITH THERIAULT, MAINEHOUSING, JOHN GALLAGHER, ALLISON GALLAGHER, LAUREN BUSTERD, DENISE LORD, COLIN WALL and SUE O'CLAIR
Case Number: 1:2015cv00371
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: XX Outside the State
Presiding Judge: JON D. LEVY
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 11 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (nwd)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 11 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (CLC)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),(1)the report and recommendation of Judge Carlson, (Doc. 3), is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY;(2)the plaintiffs objections to the report and recommendation of Judge Carlson, (Doc. 4), are OVERRUL ED;(3)all claims against the Maine defendants in the above-captioned matter are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Maine;(4)the plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an amended complaint solely with respect to the claims agai nst defendant Raijski on or before Monday, September 28, 2015; and(5)the instant action is remanded to Judge Carlson for all further pre-trial proceedings. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/8/15. (bs) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/10/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALENCAR v. THERIAULT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILARY PALENCAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA THERIAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH THERIAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINEHOUSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLISON GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREN BUSTERD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE LORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLIN WALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUE O'CLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?