GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE v. NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC

Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE
Defendant: NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00304
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Aroostook
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 Reply to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE.(FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AS AMENDED by NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC. (SMITH, WILLIAM)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC. (SMITH, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/5/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/12/2019. Motions due by 2/26/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr)
September 17, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC due by 9/21/2018. (lrc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A - Insurance Policy.. (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 Northern Timber Trucking, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE by NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance, #2 Counterclaim of Defendant, #3 Exhibit A for Counterclaim)(SMITH, WILLIAM)
August 31, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC : Answer due by 9/14/2018. (akr)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE. NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC served on 8/24/2018. (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE. (FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 9, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE by 8/16/2018. (jwr)
August 9, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1882808.), filed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE.(FLANAGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jwr)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC filed by GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/7/2018) Fee due by 8/13/2018.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE v. NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES INSURANCE SE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN TIMBER TRUCKING INC
Represented By: THEODORE M. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?