CARSON et al v. HASSON
Plaintiff: ALAN GILLIS, AMY CARSON, ANGELA NELSON, TROY NELSON, DAVID CARSON and JUDITH GILLIS
Defendant: ROBERT G HASSON, JR
Case Number: 1:2018cv00327
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB on behalf of ROBERT G HASSON, JR (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/7/2019. Motions due by 2/21/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by ROBERT G HASSON, JR.(FORSTER, SARAH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH A. FORSTER on behalf of ROBERT G HASSON, JR (FORSTER, SARAH)
August 28, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for Robert Hasson : Answer due by 9/12/2018. (jib)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by ANGELA NELSON, DAVID CARSON, AMY CARSON, JUDITH GILLIS, TROY NELSON, ALAN GILLIS. ROBERT G HASSON, JR served on 8/22/2018. (KELLER, TIMOTHY)
August 27, 2018 Filing Fee Received from AMY CARSON, DAVID CARSON, ALAN GILLIS, JUDITH GILLIS, ANGELA NELSON, TROY NELSON: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 118000310. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 8/22/2018. (jgd)
August 21, 2018 Set Deadlines : Attorneys ARIF PANJU, JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD, & MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 8/28/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw) Modified on 8/22/2018 to remove names of BENJAMIN BULL and LEA PATTERSON as they are registered (mtm).
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lea Patterson filed by JEFFREY T. EDWARDS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1888976.) (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Certification of Michael K. Whitehead, #2 Pro Hac Vice Certification of Timothy D. Keller)(EDWARDS, JEFFREY) Modified on 8/21/2018 to clean up description of attachments (mnw).
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Bull filed by JEFFREY T. EDWARDS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1888952.) (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Certification of Arif Panju, #2 Pro Hac Vice Certification of Jonathan R. Whitehead)(EDWARDS, JEFFREY) Modified on 8/21/2018 to clean up description of attachments (mnw).
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROBERT G HASSON, JR. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT G HASSON, JR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ANGELA NELSON, DAVID CARSON, AMY CARSON, JUDITH GILLIS, TROY NELSON, ALAN GILLIS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/19/2018) Fee due by 8/23/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARSON et al v. HASSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN GILLIS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. KELLER
Represented By: BENJAMIN BULL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: ARIF PANJU
Represented By: MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: JEFFREY T. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY CARSON
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. KELLER
Represented By: BENJAMIN BULL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: ARIF PANJU
Represented By: MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: JEFFREY T. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA NELSON
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. KELLER
Represented By: BENJAMIN BULL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: ARIF PANJU
Represented By: MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: JEFFREY T. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY NELSON
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. KELLER
Represented By: BENJAMIN BULL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: ARIF PANJU
Represented By: MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: JEFFREY T. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CARSON
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. KELLER
Represented By: BENJAMIN BULL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: ARIF PANJU
Represented By: MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: JEFFREY T. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH GILLIS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. KELLER
Represented By: BENJAMIN BULL
Represented By: LEA PATTERSON
Represented By: JONATHAN R. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: ARIF PANJU
Represented By: MICHAEL K. WHITEHEAD
Represented By: JEFFREY T. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT G HASSON, JR
Represented By: SARAH A. FORSTER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?