HALL v. FERRELL
Appellee: FELICITY FERRELL
Appellant: KEVIN R HALL
Case Number: 1:2018cv00328
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 10/24/2018. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Trial held on 6/22/2018 in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court before Judge Michael A. Fagone. Any request for this transcript is to be made to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (jwr) Modified on 9/24/2018 to restrict document (jwr).
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received along with trial exhibits in paper. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record and Statement of Issues to be presentend on Appeal)(jwr)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS APPELLEE'S COUNSEL re: #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Attorney James F. Molleur to Withdraw as Attorney by FELICITY FERRELL Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, #2 Certificate of service)(MOLLEUR, JAMES)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to the parties. The Appellee, Felicity Ferrell, has filed a Notice of Pro Se Appearance, the record reflects Attorney Molleur is currently counsel of record. Should counsel wish to withdraw a motion must be filed in accordance with Local Rule 83.2(c). (jwr)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by FELICITY FERRELL (jwr)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10052., filed by KEVIN R HALL. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 10/4/2018.) (Attachments: #1 appeal transmittal form, #2 order, #3 docket sheet)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. FERRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FELICITY FERRELL
Represented By: JAMES F. MOLLEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KEVIN R HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?