SULLIVAN v. GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS SULLIVAN
Defendant: GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT and GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS
Case Number: 1:2018cv00369
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS SULLIVAN. (DEANE, DEVIN)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/26/2019. Motions due by 3/12/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS.(HEWEY, MELISSA)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANA M. MCCORMICK on behalf of GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
September 13, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1899499.), filed by GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS.(HEWEY, MELISSA)
September 13, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS : Answer due by 9/20/2018. (bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS. (Attachments: #1 docket record, #2 complaint)(bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maine Superior Court, Hancock County, case number CV-2018-45. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/12/2018) Fee due by 9/17/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS SULLIVAN
Represented By: ROBERT W. BOWER, JR.
Represented By: DEVIN W. DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENBURN SCHOOL DEPARTMENT BOARD OF DIRECTORS
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?