STEVENS et al v. MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JESSICA STEVENS and JUSTIN STEVENS
Defendant: J D IRVING LIMITED and MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00395
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 Joint OBJECTION to #14 Scheduling Order, filed by J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. Responses due by 12/10/2018. (REICHL, NOLAN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Count II filed by JESSICA STEVENS, JUSTIN STEVENS. Reply due by 11/29/2018. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/22/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/29/2019. Motions due by 4/12/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/4/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties - Amended by J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (REICHL, NOLAN)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties by J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (REICHL, NOLAN)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(REICHL, NOLAN)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Count II by J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY Responses due by 11/15/2018. (REICHL, NOLAN)
October 17, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for J D IRVING LIMITED : Answer due by 10/31/2018. (akr)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS. J D IRVING LIMITED served on 10/10/2018. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS. J D IRVING LIMITED served on 10/10/2018. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
October 12, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY : Answer due by 10/25/2018. (akr)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS. MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 10/4/2018. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS. MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 10/4/2018. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). Main Document: Summons - Maine Northern Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Summons- J.D. Irving, Limited)(jib)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/31/2018)(WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
September 28, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1906528.), filed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS.(WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J D IRVING LIMITED and MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons- J.D. Irving, Limited)(jgd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J D IRVING LIMITED, MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JUSTIN STEVENS, JESSICA STEVENS. (Service of Process Deadline 12/26/2018) Fee due by 10/1/2018.(jgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEVENS et al v. MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D IRVING LIMITED
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA STEVENS
Represented By: ALISON A. WHOLEY BRIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN STEVENS
Represented By: ALISON A. WHOLEY BRIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?