O'HALLORAN v. BORDETSKY et al

Appellee: ROBERT LAROCHELLE, DAVID BORDETSKY and JUDITH MORRISON
Appellant: GREGORY O'HALLORAN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00431
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by GREGORY O'HALLORAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LOGAN, J.)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of Supplemental Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Notice Recipients)(jwr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on General Motiona and Motion of Relief from Stay held on 09/20/2018 before Judge Michael Fagone. This transcript is restricted and any request for a copy should be directed to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (jwr)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 12/5/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Michelle Thibodeau. (mjlt)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Record on Appeal, #2 Notice of Recipients)(mjlt)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10470-MAF., filed by GREGORY O'HALLORAN. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 12/3/2018.) (Attachments: #1 BAP transmittal form, #2 BK transmittal form, #3 BK supplemental transmittal form, #4 BAP order for transfer of appeal, #5 BK order, #6 BAP docket sheet, #7 BK docket sheet)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'HALLORAN v. BORDETSKY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROBERT LAROCHELLE
Represented By: ADAM J. SHUB
Represented By: BODIE B. COLWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVID BORDETSKY
Represented By: ADAM J. SHUB
Represented By: BODIE B. COLWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JUDITH MORRISON
Represented By: ADAM J. SHUB
Represented By: BODIE B. COLWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GREGORY O'HALLORAN
Represented By: J. SCOTT LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?