ATKINS-POULIN et al v. EDDIE BAUER LLC
Plaintiff: RAQUEL ELIASEN and TAMMY ATKINS-POULIN
Defendant: EDDIE BAUER LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00447
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/6/2019. Motions due by 5/20/2019. Ready for Trial on 7/9/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by EDDIE BAUER LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 29, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for EDDIE BAUER LLC per Order No. 15 entered on 11/29/2018: Answer due by 12/10/2018. (lrc)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting without objection #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by December 10, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by EDDIE BAUER LLC Responses due by 12/20/2018. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 15, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for EDDIE BAUER LLC per Order No. 13 entered on 11/15/2018: Answer due by 12/3/2018. (lrc)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting without objection #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by December 3, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by EDDIE BAUER LLC Responses due by 12/5/2018. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 5, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for EDDIE BAUER LLC : Answer due by 11/19/2018. (akr)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by November 19, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by EDDIE BAUER LLC Responses due by 11/26/2018. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by EDDIE BAUER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet [certified], #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons & Notice regarding electronic service, #4 Exhibit Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Order regarding Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal with Exhibit A (Federal Court) Notice of Removal)(CATERINE, MELINDA)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EDDIE BAUER LLC. (CATERINE, MELINDA) Modified on 11/1/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
October 31, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for EDDIE BAUER LLC : Answer due by 11/8/2018. (akr)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This docket entry was modified by the clerk's office to correct two minor typos. (nrg)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by November 8, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct typos (nrg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EDDIE BAUER LLC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by EDDIE BAUER LLC Responses due by 11/21/2018. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
October 26, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1920698.), filed by EDDIE BAUER LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
October 26, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for EDDIE BAUER LLC : Answer due by 11/1/2018. (bfa)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 11/2/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
October 26, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2018. (bfa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number CV-18-164. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by EDDIE BAUER LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/23/2019) Fee due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 summary sheet, #2 complaint, #3 notice of removal, #4 service of process transmittal, #5 summons)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATKINS-POULIN et al v. EDDIE BAUER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL ELIASEN
Represented By: JORDAN PAYNE HAY
Represented By: REBECCA S. WEBBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY ATKINS-POULIN
Represented By: JORDAN PAYNE HAY
Represented By: REBECCA S. WEBBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDIE BAUER LLC
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?