BABER et al v. DUNLAP

Plaintiff: TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRUCE POLIQUIN, MARY HARTT and BRETT BABER
Defendant: MATTHEW DUNLAP and PAUL LEPAGE
Intervenor Defendant: JARED GOLDEN, KAYLEE MICHAUD, TIFFANY BOND and RACHEL WOLLSTADT
Amicus Curiae: CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER
Case Number: 1:2018cv00465
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 71 MANDATE of USCA as to #66 Notice of Appeal filed by MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRETT BABER (jwr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 70 JUDGMENT of USCA re #66 Notice of Appeal (jwr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 69 USCA Case Number 18-2250 for #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRETT BABER. (bfa)
December 17, 2018 Abbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #66 Notice of Appeal (jwr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 68 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #66 Notice of Appeal, Documents sent to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (jwr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 67 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #66 Notice of Appeal (jwr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #65 Judgment, #64 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN . ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0100-1944953.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (WOODSON, ANDREW)
December 13, 2018 Filing 65 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECISION AND ORDER on #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
December 7, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by EAMONN HART on behalf of JARED GOLDEN (HART, EAMONN)
December 7, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on December 5, 2018 before Judge Lance E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Julie G. Edgecomb, Telephone Number: (207) 945-5856. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2019. (EDGECOMB, JULIE)
December 7, 2018 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PAUL LEPAGE. Reply due by 12/21/2018. (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
December 7, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE on behalf of PAUL LEPAGE (STRAWBRIDGE, PATRICK)
December 6, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for PAUL LEPAGE : Answer due by 1/28/2019. (jwr)
December 6, 2018 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PAUL LEPAGE waiver sent on 11/29/2018. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
December 6, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for MATTHEW DUNLAP : Answer due by 1/28/2019. (jwr)
December 6, 2018 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MATTHEW DUNLAP waiver sent on 11/29/2018. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
December 5, 2018 Filing 57 Court Witness List from Preliminary/Permanent Injunction held on 12/5/2018. (jwr)
December 5, 2018 Filing 56 Court Exhibit List from Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 12/5/2018 (Exhibits listed on the Court Exhibit List are not remotely electronically available). (jwr)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Oral ORDER granting 54 Motion to Consolidate Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Request By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
December 5, 2018 Filing 54 Oral MOTION to Consolidate Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Request by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN (jwr)
December 5, 2018 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Motion Hearing held re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Julie Edgecomb) (jwr)
December 2, 2018 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 30, 2018 Filing 51 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN re #37 Affidavit, . Main Document: Supplement to Affidavit in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 37. (GOODMAN, LEE)
November 29, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS A. KNOWLTON on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP (KNOWLTON, THOMAS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 49 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (BRUNETTI, PAUL)
November 29, 2018 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW DUNLAP, PAUL LEPAGE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Paul LePage)(jwr)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, counsel are required to separately file the Amicus Brief By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
November 29, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #39 Notice of Appearance, #42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, #40 and #41 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : All of these docket entries have been modified to reflect that appearances are being entered on behalf of amicus party CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER and that it is also the filer of the motion for leave. (jwr)
November 29, 2018 Set Deadlines Regarding Certifications for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Attorney MOLLY DANAHY and MARK P. GABER shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 12/3/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jwr)
November 29, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per Order #30: Reply due by 12/2/2018. (jwr)
November 28, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TIFFANY BOND, KAYLEE MICHAUD, RACHEL WOLLSTADT. Reply due by 12/12/2018. (MONTELEONE, JAMES)
November 28, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MATTHEW DUNLAP. Reply due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Julie Flynn, #2 Exhibit F-1 Summary Report - General Election CD 2, #3 Exhibit F-2 Updated summary report CD2, #4 Exhibit G - Official Tabulation.General Election.CD2)(GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
November 28, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JARED GOLDEN. Reply due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State of Michigan Opinion of the Court, #2 Ex. B - Declaration of Yolande Dionne)(KILBRETH, JAMES)
November 28, 2018 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER Responses due by 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief of CLC)(BRUNETTI, PAUL) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct filer (jwr).
November 28, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Gaber filed by PAUL J. BRUNETTI on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1935484.) (BRUNETTI, PAUL) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct party being represented (jwr).
November 28, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Molly Danahy filed by PAUL J. BRUNETTI on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1935446.) (BRUNETTI, PAUL) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct party being represented (jwr).
November 28, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J. BRUNETTI on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (BRUNETTI, PAUL) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct party being represented (jwr).
November 28, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #37 Affidavit : This docket entry as been modified to add TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT and BRUCE POLIQUIN as filing parties. (jwr)
November 28, 2018 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of James G. Gimpel with Exhibit A filed by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's expert witness disclosure)(GOODMAN, LEE) Modified on 11/28/2018 to reference Exhibit A and add all plaintiff's as filers(jwr).
November 27, 2018 Filing 36 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARY HARTT, BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRUCE POLIQUIN. (Service of Process Deadline 2/25/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint)(RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 11/28/2018 to remove duplicative attachment description (jwr).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess of Page Limits By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Reply in Excess of Page Limits by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN Responses due by 12/18/2018. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 11/27/2018 to change motion type (jwr).
November 21, 2018 Filing 33 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN re #4 Affidavit . Main Document: Curriculum Vitae for Jason Sorens, Ph.D.. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Attorney Lee E. Goodman shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 11/23/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jgd)
November 17, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 11/14/2018 before Judge Lance E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melissa Merenberg, Telephone Number: (207) 945-5856. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2019. (MERENBERG, MELISSA)
November 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 10:00 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per Order #30: Responses due by 5:00 p.m. on 11/28/2018. Reply due by 5:00 p.m. on 12/2/2018. (jgd)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion To Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION To Expedite Briefing and Argument Schedule With Respect to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN Responses due by 12/6/2018. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Intervene. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Consolidate Motion and Hearing With Respect to Permanent Injunction with the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order denying #13 Motion for TRO. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Motion Hearing held re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRETT BABER. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg) (jgd)
November 14, 2018 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Julie L. Flynn filed by MATTHEW DUNLAP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Chapter 535 Rules for RCV Elections, #2 Exhibit B: Summary Report Democratic Primary Election Cong. Dist. 2, #3 Exhibit C: Official Tabulation for June 2018 Primary, #4 Exhibit D: Letter from Clerk of US House with enclosures, #5 Exhibit E: Certificate of Election Congress 2016)(GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by TIFFANY BOND, KAYLEE MICHAUD, RACHEL WOLLSTADT Responses due by 12/5/2018. (MONTELEONE, JAMES)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #21 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene: This docket entry was modified to add RACHEL WOLLSTADT and KAYLEE MICHAUD as filing parties. (jgd)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 ***Per counsel to be refiled***Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by TIFFANY BOND, RACHEL WOLLSTADT, KAYLEE MICHAUD Responses due by 12/5/2018. (MONTELEONE, JAMES) Modified on 11/14/2018 to add Rachel Wollstadt and Kaylee Michaud as filing parties (jgd). Modified on 11/14/2018 to indicate to be refiled (jgd).
November 14, 2018 Set Deadlines: Attorneys MARC E. ELIAS, ELISABETH C. FROST and JOHN M. GEISE shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 11/16/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jgd)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION To Consolidate Motion and Hearing With Respect to Permanent Injunction with the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by JARED GOLDEN. Reply due by 11/28/2018. (BRANN, PETER)
November 14, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1928315.), filed by TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRETT BABER, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN.(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION To Consolidate Motion and Hearing With Respect to Permanent Injunction with the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN Responses due by 12/5/2018. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JARED GOLDEN. Reply due by 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Ellyn Smith Affidavit, #2 Zafra Whitcomb Affidavit, #3 Jean Hay Bright Affidavit)(BRANN, PETER) Modified on 11/14/2018 to remove extra text (jgd).
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marc E. Elias, Elisabeth C. Frost, John Geise filed by JAMES T. KILBRETH on behalf of JARED GOLDEN (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1928279.) (Attachments: #1 Elisabeth C. Frost, #2 John Geise)(KILBRETH, JAMES)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. CAREY on behalf of JARED GOLDEN (CAREY, MICHAEL)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN re #13 Motion for TRO . Main Document: Affidavit of Bruce Poliquin in Support of Motion for TRO. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 09:00 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff Brett Baber)(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PHYLLIS GARDINER on behalf of MATTHEW DUNLAP (GARDINER, PHYLLIS)
November 13, 2018 Set Deadlines: Attorney ANDREW G. WOODSON and ERIC WANG shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 11/16/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jgd)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Intervene. Mr. Golden shall file a responsive pleading on the same schedule that will apply to Defendant Dunlap. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee E. Goodman filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1928039.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Wang filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1928038.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew G. Woodson filed by JOSHUA A. RANDLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1928035.) (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. KILBRETH on behalf of JARED GOLDEN (KILBRETH, JAMES)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. KALLIN on behalf of JARED GOLDEN (KALLIN, DAVID)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by JARED GOLDEN Responses due by 12/4/2018. (BRANN, PETER)
November 13, 2018 Set Deadlines : Attorney LEE E GOODMAN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 11/16/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 11/16/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Jason P Sorens filed by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN (See Additional Attachment #33 ). (bfa) Modified on 11/21/2018 to include link to #33 (jwr).
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRETT BABER, TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN Responses due by 12/4/2018. (bfa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW DUNLAP PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TERRY HAMM-MORRIS, BRETT BABER, MARY HARTT, BRUCE POLIQUIN. (Service of Process Deadline 2/11/2019) Fee due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - sample ballot)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BABER et al v. DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY HAMM-MORRIS
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: LEE E. GOODMAN
Represented By: ANDREW G. WOODSON
Represented By: ERIC WANG
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE POLIQUIN
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: LEE E. GOODMAN
Represented By: ANDREW G. WOODSON
Represented By: ERIC WANG
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HARTT
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: LEE E. GOODMAN
Represented By: ANDREW G. WOODSON
Represented By: ERIC WANG
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT BABER
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Represented By: LEE E. GOODMAN
Represented By: ANDREW G. WOODSON
Represented By: ERIC WANG
Represented By: JOSHUA A. TARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: JARED GOLDEN
Represented By: MICHAEL E. CAREY
Represented By: JAMES T. KILBRETH
Represented By: PETER J. BRANN
Represented By: DAVID M. KALLIN
Represented By: MARC E. ELIAS
Represented By: EAMONN HART
Represented By: JOHN M. GEISE
Represented By: ELISABETH C. FROST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: KAYLEE MICHAUD
Represented By: JAMES G. MONTELEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TIFFANY BOND
Represented By: JAMES G. MONTELEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: RACHEL WOLLSTADT
Represented By: JAMES G. MONTELEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DUNLAP
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Represented By: THOMAS A. KNOWLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL LEPAGE
Represented By: PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER
Represented By: PAUL J. BRUNETTI
Represented By: MARK P. GABER
Represented By: MOLLY DANAHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?