SMITH v. HALE et al

Plaintiff: AMY SMITH
Defendant: STEVEN L HALE and RYAN P COOK
Case Number: 1:2018cv00474
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
0 Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
1 Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by AMY SMITH (WYCOFF, ERIC)
December 14, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for STEVEN L HALE and RYAN P COOK per Order No. 8: Answers due by 12/31/2018. (lrc)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to December 31, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AMY SMITH Responses due by 1/3/2019. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
November 30, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for RYAN P COOK per Summons Returned Executed filed on 11/30/2018, defendants were served on 11/26/2018: Answer due by 12/17/2018. (lrc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMY SMITH. STEVEN L HALE served on 11/26/2018. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMY SMITH. RYAN P COOK served on 11/26/2018. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
November 19, 2018 Filing Fee Received from AMY SMITH: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 0100-1931137. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 11/19/2018. (mtm)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RYAN P COOK, STEVEN L HALE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Ryan P. Cook summons)(bfa)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMY SMITH. (bfa)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RYAN P COOK, STEVEN L HALE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMY SMITH. (Service of Process Deadline 2/14/2019) Fee due by 11/19/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. HALE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY SMITH
Represented By: ERIC J. WYCOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN L HALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN P COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?