FRANCHINI, DPM v. PIPES et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM
Defendant: SALLY PIPES, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP and PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE
Case Number: 1:2018cv00477
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for SALLY PIPES and PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE per Order No. 12 entered on 1/8/2019: Answer due by 2/8/2019. (lrc)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Pipes and Pacific Research Institute shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by February 8, 2019, the same date as previously granted to co-defendant Philadelphia Media Network. Defendants should not expect any further extensions, absent unusual circumstances. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE, SALLY PIPES Responses due by 1/28/2019. (HOLBROOK, ANDREA)
January 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP per Order No. 10 entered on 1/4/2019: Answer due by 2/8/2019. (lrc)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Philadelphia Media Network shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by February 8, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #5 Notice of Appearance : This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in the wrong case. (lrc)
January 3, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Eli Segal shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 1/11/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (lrc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eli Segal filed by ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV on behalf of PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1951787.) (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP Responses due by 1/24/2019. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP. (FRAWLEY, ALFRED)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Appearance by ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV on behalf of PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP (FRAWLEY, ALFRED) Modified on 1/4/2019 to reflect that this document was filed in the wrong case (lrc).
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP, SALLY PIPES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP Summons, #2 PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE Summons)(lrc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raymond W. Belair filed by JENS-PETER W. BERGEN on behalf of THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1938612.) (BERGEN, JENS-PETER)
November 30, 2018 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 12/7/2018. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
November 28, 2018 Filing Fee Received from THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM: Amount Paid: $400.00 Receipt Number: 219000270. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 11/28/2018 (lrc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP, SALLY PIPES with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM. (Service of Process Deadline 2/19/2019) Fee due by 11/21/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANCHINI, DPM v. PIPES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLY PIPES
Represented By: ANDREA T. HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK LLP
Represented By: ALFRED CECIL FRAWLEY, IV
Represented By: ELI SEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE
Represented By: ANDREA T. HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS C FRANCHINI, DPM
Represented By: JENS-PETER W. BERGEN
Represented By: RAYMOND W. BELAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?