DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE
Defendant: JOSEPH FITZPATRICK and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2018cv00478
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/6/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/13/2019. Motions due by 6/27/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/10/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.(FORTIN, JAMES)
January 14, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order andFirst MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per telephone conference held on 1/3/19: Reply due by 1/22/2019. (jwr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order andFirst MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Reply due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brian Libby, #2 Exhibit Incident Report 1, #3 Exhibit Incident Report 2, #4 Affidavit Pamela Richards)(FORTIN, JAMES)
January 9, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and JOSEPH FITZPATRICK : Answer due by 1/17/2019. (jwr)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting without objection #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS Responses due by 1/30/2019. (FORTIN, JAMES)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order andFirst MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2019 10:00 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
January 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order andFirst MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per Telephone Conference held this date: Responses due by 1/11/2019. Reply due by 1/22/2019. (jwr)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Telephone Conference held re: briefing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Response due 1/11/19, Reply due 1/22/19 and oral argument set for 1/30/19. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg) (jwr)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/3/2019 01:00 PM before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER re: briefing schedule on motion for temporary restraining order. (jwr)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. FORTIN on behalf of JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (FORTIN, JAMES)
December 27, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed, for JOSEPH FITZPATRICK and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS : Answer due by 1/10/2019. (jwr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE as to JOSEPH FITZPATRICK and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Defendants served on 12/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Complaint on MDOC #2 Proof of Service of Motion for TRO on Fitzpatrick, #3 Proof of Service of Motion for TRO on MDOC)(RICE, PETER) Modified on 12/27/2018 to clarify docket text (jwr).
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE Responses due by 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo of Law, #2 Affidavit Ariel Linet, Esq., #3 Affidavit Jeffrey Skakalski, Esq., #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10)(RICE, PETER)
November 21, 2018 Filing Fee Received from DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 119000045. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 11/21/2018. (mtm)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Joseph Fitzpatrick summons)(bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE. (Service of Process Deadline 2/19/2019) Fee due by 11/21/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH FITZPATRICK
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: JAMES E. FORTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISABILITY RIGHTS MAINE
Represented By: PETER M. RICE
Represented By: MARK C. JOYCE
Represented By: JEFFREY M. SKAKALSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?