UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $10,332 IN US CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $10,332 IN US CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00485
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 United States Marshals Service Process Receipt and Return (slg)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT In Rem Issued By Robert Allen, DEPUTY CLERK. (bfa) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/31/2018) (bfa). Modified on 12/31/2018 (bfa)to replace poor quality scanned document.
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $10,332 IN US CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 2/26/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $10,332 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,332 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DONALD E. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?