LINDAHL v. WALDO COUNTY
Plaintiff: DAVID LINDAHL
Defendant: WALDO COUNTY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00489
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Confidentiality Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Confidentiality Order by WALDO COUNTY Responses due by 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Draft Confidentiality Order)(MARCHESI, PETER)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/7/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/14/2019. Motions due by 5/28/2019. Ready for Trial on 8/6/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by WALDO COUNTY.(MARCHESI, PETER)
December 11, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for WALDO COUNTY : Answer due by 12/27/2018. (sfw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID LINDAHL. WALDO COUNTY served on 12/6/2018. (HANSEN, CHAD)
November 30, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1937206.), filed by DAVID LINDAHL.(HANSEN, CHAD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WALDO COUNTY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WALDO COUNTY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DAVID LINDAHL. (Service of Process Deadline 2/28/2019) Fee due by 12/3/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDAHL v. WALDO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LINDAHL
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALDO COUNTY
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?