HAWKINS v. CARTER

Plaintiff: TYLER HAWKINS
Defendant: LAWRENCE SEAN CARTER
Case Number: 1:2018cv00503
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jib)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LAWRENCE SEAN CARTER (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/16/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK:Michelle Thibodeau. (mjlt)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAWRENCE SEAN CARTER (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct filer (jwr).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Filing Fee OR Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 1/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mtm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec District Court, case number PA-2018-457. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LAWRENCE SEAN CARTER. (Service of Process Deadline 3/18/2019) Fee due by 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWKINS v. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE SEAN CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?