CYR v. PELLETIER

Plaintiff: ROSALINE CYR
Defendant: DANIEL PELLETIER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/5/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/12/2019. Motions due by 7/26/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by DANIEL PELLETIER.(BROGAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 2/15/2019 to remove reference that there is a jury demand because it is not contained in the pleading (lrc).
January 30, 2019 Filing Fee Received from ROSALINE CYR: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 0100-1966627. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 01/29/2019 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DANIEL PELLETIER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DANIEL PELLETIER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROSALINE CYR. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2019) Fee due by 1/31/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CYR v. PELLETIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL PELLETIER
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSALINE CYR
Represented By: ARTHUR J. GREIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?