HAUSER v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff: TESSA HAUSER
Defendant: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Set Deadlines : Status Report pursuant to ECF #9 due by close of business on 7/10/2019. (akr)
March 27, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES : Answer due by 9/25/2019. (akr)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Following a telephonic hearing held at my request with Attorney Lynch for the plaintiff and Attorneys Eiler and Jennifer Williams (not currently of record) for the defendant, the defendant's deadline to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is extended to September 25, 2019, but the defendant is ORDERED to file a written status report on the preparation of the certified administrative record by MOD by close of business on July 10, 2019. Without prejudice, I also note that counsel agreed that, upon pleadings becoming complete, discovery would likely not be necessary, such that an Administrative Track scheduling order could issue setting deadlines for any motion to supplement the record and the filing of the parties' anticipated motion(s) for judgment on the record. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 3/27/2019 re: ECF No. 6; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint: Telephone Conference set for 3/27/2019 10:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Responses due by 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Angela K. Roach)(EILER, ASHLEY)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E. EILER on behalf of SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (EILER, ASHLEY)
March 8, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES : Answer due by 4/15/2019. (akr)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by TESSA HAUSER. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A Return Receipts for Certified Mail)(LYNCH, SCOTT) Modified on 3/8/2019 to correct served on date to 2/14/2019 (akr).
February 12, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1974736.), filed by TESSA HAUSER.(LYNCH, SCOTT)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TESSA HAUSER. (Service of Process Deadline 5/13/2019) Fee due by 2/14/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAUSER v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TESSA HAUSER
Represented By: SCOTT J. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?