NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. SPRUCE et al

Plaintiff: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ROSEMARY THATCH and SUZANNE SPRUCE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00074
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SUZANNE SPRUCE : Answer due by 4/18/2019. (akr)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Acceptance of Service by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (MCCORMICK, JEANA) Modified on 4/4/2019 to remove "Agreement of" (akr).
March 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ROSEMARY THATCH : Answer due by 4/18/2019. (akr)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (MCCORMICK, JEANA) Modified on 3/29/2019 to remove "Agreement of" (akr).
February 14, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1976075.), filed by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCCORMICK, JEANA)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SUZANNE SPRUCE, ROSEMARY THATCH. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Rosemary Thatch summons)(bfa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUZANNE SPRUCE, ROSEMARY THATCH PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 5/15/2019) Fee due by 2/19/2019.(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #1 Policy, #2 Absolute Assignment, #3 Second Absolute Assignment, #4 Roach Beneficiary Agreement Request, #5 Thatch Beneficiary Agreement Request) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. SPRUCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARY THATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE SPRUCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?