CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON v. C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC et al
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON
Defendant: C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC, CITY OF BANGOR, MAINE and PD INDUSTRIES INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for CITY OF BANGOR, MAINE: Answer due by 6/11/2019. (jgd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CITY OF BANGOR, MAINE waiver sent on 4/12/2019. (HARROW, SETH)
April 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC : Answer due by 6/3/2019. (jwr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC waiver sent on 4/3/2019. (SMITH, MACKENZIE)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Sky Bahamas Airlines LTD. by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON. (HARROW, SETH)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON. (HARROW, SETH)
March 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/15/2019 from CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON. (jgd)
March 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Attorney Gary A. Gardner and Attorney Mackenzie W. Smith shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 3/15/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jgd)
March 8, 2019 Set Deadlines: Attorney Gary A. Gardner and Attorney Mackenzie W. Smith shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 3/12/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jgd)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mackenzie W. Smith, Esq. filed by SETH D. HARROW on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1986456.) (HARROW, SETH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary A. Gardner, Esq. filed by SETH D. HARROW on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1986450.) (HARROW, SETH) Modified on 3/8/2019 to change total admission fee from $200 to $100 as $100 was refunded on 3/8/2019 (jgd).
March 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1983375.), filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON.(HARROW, SETH)
March 4, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON due by 3/11/2019. (sfw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC, CITY OF BANGOR, MAINE, PD INDUSTRIES INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to City of Bangor, Maine, #2 Summons Issued as to PD Industries Inc)(sfw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC, CITY OF BANGOR, MAINE, PD INDUSTRIES INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON. (Service of Process Deadline 5/30/2019) Fee due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indenture of Lease, #2 Exhibit B: Quote, #3 Exhibit C: 3/26/2009 Written Agreement, #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Claim)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON v. C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&L AEROSPACE HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BANGOR, MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PD INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON
Represented By: SETH D. HARROW
Represented By: GARY A. GARDNER
Represented By: MACKENZIE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?