SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. JACKSON

Plaintiff: SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Defendant: OLANIAN JACKSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00095
Filed: March 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (no PDF document is attached to this docket entry. To view the order, see Order No. 15) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND RECOMMENDED DISMISSAL OF CASE, MOOTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2019 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by OLANIAN JACKSON. Reply due by 4/18/2019. (lrc)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (BALTES, AARON)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Responses due by 4/16/2019. (BALTES, AARON)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Party by SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Responses due by 4/16/2019. (BALTES, AARON)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (BALTES, AARON)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement : This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (lrc)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (BALTES, AARON) Modified on 3/25/2019 to reflect that this filing was made in error and will be re-filed (lrc).
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON KENNETH BALTES on behalf of SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (BALTES, AARON)
March 9, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by OLANIAN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Skowhegan District Court Rejection of Notice of Filing of Removal Package, #2 Notice of Incomplete Filing, #3 Notice of Address Change, #4 District Court Docket Record, #5 Transcript of Eviction Hearing, #6 Appellant Brief for Jury Trial, #7 Order on Request for Jury Trial, #8 Motion for Reconsideration, #9 Amendment to Motion for Reconsideration, #10 Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #11 Statement of Material Facts, #12 Order on Motion to reconsider, #13 Amendment to Reconsideration, #14 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #15 Notice of Appeal, #16 Notice of Docketing in Law Court, #17 Federal Complaint, #18 Docket Record, #19 Court Letter, #20 Letter from Attorney Baltes to Law Court, #21 Law Court Decision, #22 Writ of Possession, #23 Attorney Baltes Letter re: no Objection, #24 Appellant Brief, #25 Appellant Certificate of Service, #26 Letter to Court with Appendix, #27 Appellee Brief, #28 Cover Letter for Appellee Brief, #29 Appellant Cover Letter for Reply Brief, #30 Affidavit of Large Attachments)(lrc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 3/11/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
March 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by OLANIAN JACKSON (sfw)
March 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by OLANIAN JACKSON (Attachments: #1 Affidavit to Accompany Motion for IFP, #2 Proposed Order to Proceed IFP)(sfw)
March 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
March 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint from Skowhegan District Court, case number SKODC-SA-2017-169., filed by OLANIAN JACKSON. (Service of Process Deadline 6/3/2019) (Attachments: #1 Complaint of Discrimination, #2 MHRC Complaint of Discrimination Sherwood Associates, #3 MHRC Complaint of Discrimination Monroe Group, #4 Judgment Forcible Entry and Detainer, #5 Law Court Decision, #6 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Order on Defendant's Request for a Jury Trial)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: AARON K. BALTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLANIAN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?