KENNEBEC COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Plaintiff: KENNEBEC COUNTY
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, WALGREEN CO, PURDUE PHARMA LP, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, CVS PHARMACY INC, DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO, ALLERGAN PLC, CEPHALON INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WALMART INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, PURDUE PHARMA INC, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ACTAVIS LLC and ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 48 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Ohio has been opened on 4/16/2019 as case 1:19-op-45257. (jwr)
April 8, 2019 Filing 47 Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (jgd) Modified on 4/8/2019 to add MDL text (jgd).
April 8, 2019 Filing 46 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. (jgd)
April 5, 2019 Filing 45 MDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (mnw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER)
March 25, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC by 4/1/2019. (mnw)
March 15, 2019 SET Deadlines : Attorney Ethan Severance shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 3/22/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mnw)
March 14, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan Severance filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1989773.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
March 14, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1989768.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
March 14, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1989766.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA)
March 13, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS and MARK G. LAVOIE on behalf of MICHAEL B BRUEHL and MD, MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 3/14/2019 to clean up text (mnw).
March 13, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC by 3/22/2019. (mnw)
March 12, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
March 12, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #35 Notice of Appearance of James M. Campbell, Esq. : Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (mnw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
March 8, 2019 Filing 44 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #34 State Court Record. Main Document: Kennebec County Superior Court Docket Record for Case AUGSC-CV-2019-00013. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint : Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Allergan PLC, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Dr. Bruehl, #7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Cardinal Health 101 LLC, #8 Exhibit 7 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Cephalon Inc, #9 Exhibit 8 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #10 Exhibit 9 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 10 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 11 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #13 Exhibit 12 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmecutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 13 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 14 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #17 Exhibit 16 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #18 Exhibit 17 to Complaint: Demand Letter to McKesson Corp, #19 Exhibit 18 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #20 Exhibit 19 to Complaint: Demand Letter to The Purdue Frederick Co, #21 Exhibit 20 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, #22 Exhibit 21 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma LP, #23 Exhibit 22 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #24 Exhibit 23 to Complaint: Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories, #25 McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion to Extend Deadlines, #26 Notice of Entry of Appearance Hanlon, #27 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #28 Entry of Appearance Petruccelli, #29 Order Granting AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Consent Motion, #30 Order Granting McKesson Corp's Assented to Motion, #31 Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion to Extend Deadline, #32 Entry of Appearance Cahoon, #33 Order Granting Bruehl and Cieniawski's Consented to Motion, #34 Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadlines, #35 Entry of Appearance of Sturtevant, #36 Order Granting Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Assented to Motion, #37 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(mnw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 35 **FILED IN ERR0R** NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. CAMPBELL on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CAMPBELL, JAMES) Modified on 3/12/2019 to add filed in error notation - counsel to re-file. (mnw).
March 8, 2019 Filing 34 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
March 8, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Lifland filed by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1986884.) (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (SCHAFFER, MICHELLE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1986780.) (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting without objection #24 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended for all Defendants to (1) 30 days after this Court rules on any motion to remand that might be filed, or (2) 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a final decision as to whether to transfer the case to the Multidistrict Litigation, whichever date is later. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo filed by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1986116.) (BERGER, RITCHIE)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP. (BERGER, RITCHIE)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by RITCHIE E. BERGER on behalf of PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE PHARMA LP (BERGER, RITCHIE)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 3/28/2019. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MAINE INC, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD)
March 6, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC. (MALONE, KELLY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALMART INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WALMART INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1985611.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice -Brien T. O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #14 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Docket entries modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect that they were filed in error in the wrong case. Counsel to re-file. (mnw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1985281.) (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Brien T. O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 3/6/2019 to add filed in error notation as the document was filed in the wrong case. Counsel to re-file. (mnw).
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 3/6/2019 to add filed in error notation as the document was filed in the wrong case. Counsel to re-file. (mnw).
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (GOLDMAN, JEFF)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Zane Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1985194.) (WOLF, KAREN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service-Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, #2 Acceptance of Service-Allergan Finance, #3 Acceptance of Service-AmerisourceBergen, #4 Acceptance of Service-Drs. Bruehl and Cieniawski, #5 Acceptance of Service-Cardinal, #6 Acceptance of Service-CVS, #7 Acceptance of Service-Endo Health and Endo Pharm, #8 Acceptance of Service-Insys, #9 Acceptance of Service-Janssen Pharm'a, Janssen Pharm'ls, Johnson, OMJ Pharm, #10 Acceptance of Service-Jorgensen, #11 Acceptance of Service-Mallinckrodt, #12 Acceptance of Service-McKesson, #13 Acceptance of Service-Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Frederick, #14 Acceptance of Service-Rite Aid Corp, Rite Aid of ME, Rite Aid of MD, #15 Acceptance of Service-Walgreens, #16 Acceptance of Service-Walmart)(BELLEAU, JAMES)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1984822.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA)
March 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1983923.), filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.(DUNLAP, JOSHUA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 3/11/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa)
March 4, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from PURDUE PHARMA LP, PURDUE PHARMA INC, PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, CEPHALON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC, MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC WALMART INC, RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC, RITE AID OF MAINE INC due by 3/11/2019. (bfa)
March 4, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate from MARK CHEFFO, CHARLES C. LIFLAND, DONNA WELCH, CONOR B. O'CROININ due by 3/11/2019. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (bfa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number CV-19-13. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 5/30/2019) Fee due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Dunlap, #2 Complaint, #3 Demand Letter to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #4 Demand Letter to Actavis LLC, #5 Demand Letter to Actavis Pharma Inc, #6 Demand Letter to Allergan plc, #7 Demand Letter to Dr. Bruehl, #8 Demand Letter to Cardinal Health 101 LLC, #9 Demand Letter to Cephalon, Inc, #10 Demand Letter to Dr. Cieniawski, #11 Demand Letter to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #12 Demand Letter to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Demand Letter to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #14 Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #15 Demand Letter to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #16 Demand Letter to Johnson & Johnson, #17 Demand Letter to Dr. Jorgensen, #18 Demand Letter to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #19 Demand Letter to McKesson Corporation, #20 Demand Letter to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #21 Demand Letter to The Purdue Frederick Company, #22 Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma Inc, #23 Demand Letter to Purdue Pharma L.P, #24 Demand Letter to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #25 Demand Letter to Watson Laboratories)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEBEC COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: MELISSA M. HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA LP
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY INC
Represented By: GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ
Represented By: CONOR B. O'CROININ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO
Represented By: MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MAINE INC
Represented By: GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC
Represented By: DONNA WELCH
Represented By: SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC
Represented By: KELLY MARTIN MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC
Represented By: MARK CHEFFO
Represented By: RITCHIE E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: ETHAN SEVERANCE
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER D. HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Represented By: RYAN ZANE WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSHUA D. DUNLAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B BRUEHL, MD
Represented By: MARK G. LAVOIE
Represented By: DAVID R. GEIGER
Represented By: ETHAN SEVERANCE
Represented By: K. NEIL AUSTIN
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Represented By: ANDREW J. O'CONNOR
Represented By: BRIEN T. O'CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CHARLES C. LIFLAND
Represented By: JAMES M. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHELLE I. SCHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Represented By: JEFF GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNEBEC COUNTY
Represented By: ADAM R. LEE
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?