SOLMAN v. ZIMMER US INC et al

Plaintiff: NANCY J SOLMAN
Defendant: ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER US INC and ZIMMER SURGICAL INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney ALEX C. DAVIS shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 3/13/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (akr)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex C. Davis filed by KEVIN M. FITZGERALD on behalf of NANCY J SOLMAN (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1985204.) (FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
March 5, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1984550.), filed by NANCY J SOLMAN.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER SURGICAL INC, ZIMMER US INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Zimmer US, Inc summons, #2 Zimmer, Inc summons, #3 Zimmer-Biomet Holdings, Inc summons)(bfa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER SURGICAL INC, ZIMMER US INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NANCY J SOLMAN. (Service of Process Deadline 5/30/2019) Fee due by 3/7/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOLMAN v. ZIMMER US INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY J SOLMAN
Represented By: KEVIN M. FITZGERALD
Represented By: ALEX C. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER US INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER SURGICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?