SMITH v. ATHENAHEALTH INC
Plaintiff: CHARMANE SMITH
Defendant: ATHENAHEALTH INC, JOHN C NIVISON and GEORGE Z SINGAL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00115
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: ANDREA K JOHNSTONE
Referring Judge: LANDYA B MCCAFFERTY
2 Judge: JOHN H RICH
3 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #2 Motion for Summary Judgment and #13 Motion to Dismiss. The Court construes plaintiff's document filed on April 8, 2019 (doc. no. 13) as a motion to dismiss and request to close her case. The court grants that motion, which renders moot document number 2. The clerk's office shall close the case. By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (lrc)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss as Misfiled by CHARMANE SMITH (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
April 2, 2019 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY and MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANDREA K. JOHNSTONE. (sfw)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROCEDURAL ORDER By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (sfw) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/2/2019) (lrc).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONCURRING ORDER By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (sfw) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/2/2019) (lrc).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Assigning Case to New Hampshire By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (sfw)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (sfw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR recused. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (sfw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (sfw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (sfw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III recused. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (sfw)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (sfw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHARMANE SMITH Responses due by 4/8/2019. (bfa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATHENAHEALTH INC, JOHN C NIVISON, GEORGE Z SINGAL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHARMANE SMITH. (Service of Process Deadline 6/17/2019) Fee due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. ATHENAHEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENAHEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C NIVISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMANE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?