FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC v. TEXAS RUSTIC INC
Plaintiff: FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC
Defendant: TEXAS RUSTIC INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00154
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TEXAS RUSTIC INC. (SILVER, RICHARD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TEXAS RUSTIC INC Responses due by 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carolyn Davis, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(SILVER, RICHARD) Modified on 7/2/2019 to amend ecf entry descriptions (nrg).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC. TEXAS RUSTIC INC served on 6/11/2019. (DORR, GREGORY)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1 by FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC. (DORR, GREGORY)
April 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004529.), filed by FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC.(HADDOW, JON)
April 11, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/18/2019. (bfa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TEXAS RUSTIC INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEXAS RUSTIC INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/10/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - summary sheet and invoices, #2 Exhibit B - letter dated 12/28/18 from Lyon Collection Services, Inc, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Rejection, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Revocation)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2019: #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs inventory of nonconforming furniture) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC v. TEXAS RUSTIC INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXAS RUSTIC INC
Represented By: RICHARD SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC
Represented By: GREGORY P. DORR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?