PERFECT FIT LLC v. ARONOWITZ
Plaintiff: PERFECT FIT LLC
Defendant: EDWARD ARONOWITZ
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By Melody Whitten, Deputy Clerk (mnw)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - granting #14 Motion to Compel Arbitration. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by EDWARD ARONOWITZ. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
May 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel Arbitration - Per Order #13: Reply due by 5/6/2019. (mnw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by PERFECT FIT LLC. Reply due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua Randlett, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Joshua Randlett)(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
April 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration: In accordance with the Court's Order dated April 19, 2019 (ECF No. 13): Responses due by 5/1/2019. (mjlt)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration by EDWARD ARONOWITZ Responses due by 5/15/2019. (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/24/2019 (mjlt). Added MOTION to Compel on 4/26/2019 (mjlt).
April 19, 2019 Set Deadlines - Per Order #13: Defendant's Motion to Stay and to Compel Arbitration due by 4/24/2019. Response due by 5/1/2019. Reply due by 5/6/2019. (mnw)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The proposed joint briefing schedule on the Motion to Compel Arbitration is APPROVED. If after briefing the Plaintiff prevails on the Motion to Compel Arbitration, then I will set an expedited schedule for discovery. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Proposed Expedited Discovery Schedule by PERFECT FIT LLC (RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 4/22/2019 to clean up docket text as the document attached is a proposed discovery schedule, not a motion (mnw).
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: intent to file motion to stay this action and compel arbitration by EDWARD ARONOWITZ (ROSENTHAL, DANIEL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. Set Deadlines: Defense counsel to advise the court by 4/19/2019 if they plan to file a Motion to Compel Arbitration. Parties to meet and confer and file a joint proposed discovery schedule or competing proposals by 4/19/2019. Defense counsel to advise the court by 4/19/2019 what the defendant's position is re: standing down on any outreach to former Perfect Fit clients. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (mnw)
April 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for EDWARD ARONOWITZ - Per Waiver of Service Executed #8: Answer due by 6/14/2019. (mnw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 4:00 PM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel for the plaintiff to initiate the conference call to chambers. (mnw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed EDWARD ARONOWITZ waiver sent on 4/15/2019. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
April 15, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2005625.), filed by PERFECT FIT LLC.(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to EDWARD ARONOWITZ. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PERFECT FIT LLC. (bfa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by PERFECT FIT LLC (bfa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on TRO and Preliminary Injunction by PERFECT FIT LLC (bfa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by PERFECT FIT LLC (bfa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDWARD ARONOWITZ PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PERFECT FIT LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/15/2019) Fee due by 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 copy of the P&S, #2 Independent Contractor Agreement, #3 copy of Aronowitzs April 11, 2019 email solicitation)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERFECT FIT LLC v. ARONOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERFECT FIT LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD ARONOWITZ
Represented By: DANIEL L. ROSENTHAL
Represented By: GEORGE J. MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?