SIBLEY v. ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC
Plaintiff: JUDITH SIBLEY and JUDY SIBLEY
Defendant: ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC re #9 State Court Record, . Main Document: Penobscot County Superior Court Docket Record and Summons Return (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/26/2019 to clean up description of main document (mnw).
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Daniel Schwarz in Support of Filing State Court Record. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/24/2019 to clean up the docket text (mjlt).
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. Main Document: Penobscot County Superior Court Docket Record (Attachments: #1 Notice of appearance, #2 notice of filing of notice of removal to state court, #3 notice of filing of removal, #4 state court complaint, #5 summons, #6 summary sheet, #7 notice of filing of ntc of removal with exhibits)(SCHWARZ, DANIEL) Modified on 4/24/2019 to add description of Main Document (mnw).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/16/2019. Motions due by 9/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JUDITH SIBLEY. (GREIF, ARTHUR)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
April 17, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006959.), filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
April 17, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2019. (bfa)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 4/24/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
April 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INCORPORATED : Answer due by 4/23/2019. (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-46. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/15/2019) Fee due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 summary sheet, #2 complaint, #3 summons, #4 notice of filing removal to State Court)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIBLEY v. ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH SIBLEY
Represented By: ARTHUR J. GREIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY SIBLEY
Represented By: ARTHUR J. GREIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC
Represented By: DANIEL P. SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?