BARRONTON v. LAMBREW, PHD et al

Plaintiff: TONI BARRONTON
Defendant: PATRICK LYNN, NICOLE NORWOOD, JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD, CHRISTY DAVIS, MELODY HAVEY, AAG, AARON M FREY, AG, LYNN KING and MELISSA WITCOMB
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 31 JUDGMENT of dismissal It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE; ORDER DISMISSING CASE #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; #17 Motion to Strike and #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TONI BARRONTON. (WILLEY, EZRA)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECISION AND ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay Discovery. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting without objection #14 Motion to Amend Complaint. The amended complaint is accepted for filing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss filed by JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD. Reply due by 6/25/2019. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD. Reply due by 6/24/2019. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A (State Court Order))(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/11/2019 to clean-up docket text (jwr).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part #19 Motion to Seal. The document filed as an amended complaint at ECF No. 15 shall be sealed. The Court did not discern any information subject to redaction or seal in the original complaint. To the extent Plaintiff believes the complaint contains information that should be sealed, Plaintiff can renew the motion as to the original complaint. Any objections to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 REDACTED Document re #1 Complaint by TONI BARRONTON. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 6/6/2019 to remove link to motion to seal and redacted amended complaint (jwr).
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 Redacted AMENDED COMPLAINT against JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD, PATRICK LYNN filed by TONI BARRONTON. (Service of Process Deadline 9/4/2019)(WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 6/6/2019 to include Patrick Lynn as a defendant (jwr).
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Complaint, Amended Complaint by TONI BARRONTON Responses due by 6/27/2019. (WILLEY, EZRA)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE re #15 Amended Complaint filed by TONI BARRONTON. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document and separately filing a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TONI BARRONTON Responses due by 6/20/2019. (WILLEY, EZRA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss filed by TONI BARRONTON. Reply due by 6/13/2019. (WILLEY, EZRA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 *SEALED per Order 22 * AMENDED COMPLAINT against JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD, PATRICK LYNN filed by TONI BARRONTON. (Service of Process Deadline 8/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 6/6/2019 to seal per Order #22 (jwr).
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by TONI BARRONTON Responses due by 6/20/2019. (WILLEY, EZRA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD Responses due by 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A (Plaintiff's Discovery Requests))(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re Set Answer Deadline. Counsel can disregard this deadline. A Motion to Dismiss has been previously filed. (jwr)
May 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Return Executed for JEANNE LAMBREW, PHD : Answer due by 6/6/2019. (jwr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 Acknowledgment of Service : This docket entry has been modified to reflect it is a Summons Return Executed. (jwr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TONI BARRONTON served on 5/16/2019. (WILLEY, EZRA) Modified on 5/29/2019 to indicate this is summons return (jwr).
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD Responses due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A (State Court Order Denying Request for PFA Order))(TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB on behalf of JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #4 Ex Parte Motion; denying #4 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD) Modified on 5/15/2019 to unseal order (jwr).
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHRISTY DAVIS, AARON M FREY, AG, MELODY HAVEY, AAG, LYNN KING, JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD, PATRICK LYNN, NICOLE NORWOOD, MELISSA WITCOMB. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Jeanne M. Lambrew summons, #2 Christy Davis summons, #3 Melissa Witcomb summons, #4 Melody Havey summons, #5 Aaron M. Frey summons, #6 Patrick Lynn summons, #7 Nicole Norwood summons)(bfa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION FOR TRO (no notice to counsel), MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by TONI BARRONTON (Attachments: # *SEALED*(1) Order of Parental Rights and Responsibilities, #2 proposed order)(bfa) Modified on 5/15/2019 to indicate attachment #1 is sealed (jwr).
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (No PDF Attached. See PDF document #1 ) by TONI BARRONTON (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TONI BARRONTON (bfa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHRISTY DAVIS, AARON M FREY, AG, MELODY HAVEY, AAG, LYNN KING, JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD, PATRICK LYNN, NICOLE NORWOOD, MELISSA WITCOMB, filed by TONI BARRONTON. (Service of Process Deadline 8/12/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARRONTON v. LAMBREW, PHD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK LYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE NORWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE M LAMBREW, PHD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTY DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELODY HAVEY, AAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON M FREY, AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA WITCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI BARRONTON
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?