KEERAN v. DISCOVERY HOUSE-BR INC et al

Plaintiff: LYNN M KEERAN
Defendant: DISCOVERY HOUSE-BR INC and ACADIA HEALTH CARE INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00227
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROL GARVAN on behalf of LYNN M KEERAN (GARVAN, CAROL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. WEBBERT on behalf of LYNN M KEERAN (WEBBERT, DAVID)
May 21, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2022577.), filed by LYNN M KEERAN.(WICKS, VALERIE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACADIA HEALTH CARE INC, DISCOVERY HOUSE-BR INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LYNN M KEERAN. (Service of Process Deadline 8/19/2019) Fee due by 5/22/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEERAN v. DISCOVERY HOUSE-BR INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOVERY HOUSE-BR INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACADIA HEALTH CARE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN M KEERAN
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?