WOODLANDS SENIOR LIVING LLC v. MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION
Plaintiff: WOODLANDS SENIOR LIVING LLC
Defendant: MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00230
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH TULL JOHNSTON on behalf of MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION (JOHNSTON, ELIZABETH)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Confidentiality Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION Responses due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ALVAREZ, TAWNY)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/24/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/31/2019. Motions due by 11/14/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/7/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WOODLANDS SENIOR LIVING LLC. (MORGAN, MATTHEW)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION re #3 State Court Record. Main Document: answer to crossclaim. (bfa)
May 22, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2023943.), filed by MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION.(ALVAREZ, TAWNY)
May 22, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/29/2019. (bfa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION. (bfa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 Answer, #5 Scheduling Order)(bfa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number 2019-CV-75. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 8/20/2019) Fee due by 5/24/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODLANDS SENIOR LIVING LLC v. MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOODLANDS SENIOR LIVING LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW D. MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAS MEDICAL STAFFING CORPORATION
Represented By: TAWNY L. ALVAREZ
Represented By: ELIZABETH TULL JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?